California Central District Court
Judge:Jesus G Bernal
Referred: Shashi H Kewalramani
Case #: 5:22-cv-02175
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Dec 07, 2022
Terminated:Oct 11, 2023
Case in other court:San Bernardino County Superior Court, CIVSB2213604
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 06, 2023 1:43 AM PDT
Defendant
Cal Cartage Customs Exam Station, LLC
Represented By
Christian J Keeney
Jackson Lewis
contact info
Sarah E Christenson
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Defendant
Does
Defendant
NFI Industries, Inc.
Represented By
Christian J Keeney
Jackson Lewis
contact info
Sarah E Christenson
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Defendant
National Distribution Centers, LLC
Represented By
Christian J Keeney
Jackson Lewis
contact info
Sarah E Christenson
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Phyllis Cheng
Represented By
Phyllis Wei-Erh Cheng
Phyllis Cheng
contact info
Plaintiff
Jimmy Escalante
Represented By
Jeffrey T Gwynn
Verve Law Group LLP
contact info
Alexander J Chang
Verve Law Group PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
30 30 stip Dismiss Case Tue 11/21 12:21 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to settlement filed by Plaintiff Jimmy Escalante.(Gwynn, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
29 29 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 10/11 2:32 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. In light of the Mediation Report filed October 10, 2023 (Dkt. No. 28 ), indicating that the case has settled in its entirety, this action is placed in inactive status. By December 4, 2023, the parties shall file either (1) a proper stipulation and order for dismissal or judgment or (2) a motion to reopen if settlement has not been consummated. Upon the failure to timely comply with this Order, this action shall be deemed dismissed as of December 5, 2023. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party. All previously set deadlines and dates are hereby VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JS-6) THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
28 28 adr Mediation Report (ADR-3) Completely Settled Tue 10/10 1:36 PM
MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Phyllis Cheng: Mediation held on October 10, 2023 and the case has been completely settled. With the filing of this Report, the parties are advised that they must notify the trial judge's deputy courtroom clerk of the fact of settlement and to promptly file documents regarding the final disposition of the case. Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link:[LINK:MediationParticipantSurvey] (Cheng, Phyllis)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Mon 07/10 8:33 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kelli Dreger counsel for Defendants Cal Cartage Customs Exam Station, LLC, NFI Industries, Inc., National Distribution Centers, LLC. Adding Kelli M. Dreger as counsel of record for Defendants NFI Industries, Inc.; National Distribution Centers, LLC; and Cal Cartage Customs Exam Station, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Defendants NFI Industries, Inc.; National Distribution Centers, LLC; and Cal Cartage Customs Exam Station, LLC. (Attorney Kelli Dreger added to party Cal Cartage Customs Exam Station, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kelli Dreger added to party NFI Industries, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kelli Dreger added to party National Distribution Centers, LLC(pty:dft))(Dreger, Kelli)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
26 26 order Substitute Attorney Thu 06/29 10:31 AM
ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting25 Request to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Sarah E Christenson terminated. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
25 25 motion Substitute Attorney (G-01) Tue 06/20 7:56 PM
REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Christian J. Keeney in place of attorney Sarah Christenson filed by Defendants Cal Cartage Customs Exam Station, LLC, NFI Industries, Inc., National Distribution Centers, LLC. (Keeney, Christian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
24 24 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 05/24 2:43 PM
ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue All Trial Related Dates23 . ( Amended Pleadings due by 7/29/2023., Discovery cut-off 3/29/2024., Motions due by 6/10/2024., Last date to conduct settlement conference is 12/11/2023., Final Pretrial Conference continued to 7/9/2024 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal., Jury Trial continued to 7/23/2024 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal.) SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
23 23 stip Continue Mon 05/15 12:32 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Trial from February 27, 2024 to July 24, 2024 Re: Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only,18 filed by Defendants Cal Cartage Customs Exam Station, LLC, NFI Industries, Inc., National Distribution Centers, LLC.(Christenson, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, May 04, 2023
22 22 adr Notice of Mediation Date (ADR-13) Thu 05/04 12:30 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATION DATE filed. Mediation set for October 10, 2023.(Cheng, Phyllis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
21 21 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form Wed 03/29 8:39 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Phyllis Cheng has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
20 20 adr Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2) Tue 03/28 2:09 PM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Phyllis Cheng may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Plaintiff Jimmy Escalante(Gwynn, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
19 19 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12) Wed 03/08 4:21 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 11/20/2023. (mga)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Wed 03/08 4:20 PM
CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Amended Pleadings due by 3/24/2023. Discovery cut-off 10/16/2023. Motions cut-off 12/18/2023. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 11/20/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2024 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Jury Trial set for 2/27/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. See order for details. (mga)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2023
17 17 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 03/03 3:10 PM
The Court hereby vacates the Scheduling Conference set for 3/6/2023. The Court will issue a separate trial scheduling order setting forth a trial schedule. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
16 16 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Thu 02/16 9:50 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-5 days, filed by Defendants Cal Cartage Customs Exam Station, LLC, NFI Industries, Inc., National Distribution Centers, LLC.. (Christenson, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2023
15 15 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Thu 01/19 1:59 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 3/6/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (npo)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2022
14 14 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Mon 12/19 3:21 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Cal Cartage Customs Exam Station, LLC, NFI Industries, Inc., National Distribution Centers, LLC, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only13 served on December 19, 2022. (Christenson, Sarah)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 12/19 9:38 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2022
12 12 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 12/09 3:55 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Cal Cartage Customs Exam Station, LLC, NFI Industries, Inc., National Distribution Centers, LLC, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form9 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form11 served on December 9, 2022. (Christenson, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
11 11 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 12/07 4:36 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
10 10 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 12/07 4:35 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 12/07 4:34 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (car)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc For Judicial Notice Wed 12/07 12:07 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Defendants Cal Cartage Customs Exam Station, LLC, NFI Industries, Inc., National Distribution Centers, LLC.(Christenson, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice
7 7 notice Related Case(s) Wed 12/07 11:59 AM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Cal Cartage Customs Exam Station, LLC, NFI Industries, Inc., National Distribution Centers, LLC. Related Case(s): None (Christenson, Sarah)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Declaration Wed 12/07 11:58 AM
DECLARATION of Sarah E. Christenson re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Defendants Cal Cartage Customs Exam Station, LLC, NFI Industries, Inc., National Distribution Centers, LLC. (Christenson, Sarah)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Declaration Wed 12/07 11:57 AM
DECLARATION of Sarah E. Pontoski re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Defendants Cal Cartage Customs Exam Station, LLC, NFI Industries, Inc., National Distribution Centers, LLC. (Christenson, Sarah)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 12/07 11:54 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Cal Cartage Customs Exam Station, LLC, NFI Industries, Inc., National Distribution Centers, LLC identifying none as Corporate Parent. (Christenson, Sarah)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 12/07 11:53 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Cal Cartage Customs Exam Station, LLC, NFI Industries, Inc., National Distribution Centers, LLC, identifying NFI Industries, Inc., National Distribution Centers, LLC (erroneously sued as National Distribution Centers, LP), Cal Cartage Customs Exam Station, LLC (erroneously sued as California Cartage Company), Jimmy Escalante, law firm of Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C., Verve Law Group, LLP. (Christenson, Sarah)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 12/07 11:47 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Cal Cartage Customs Exam Station, LLC, NFI Industries, Inc., National Distribution Centers, LLC. (Christenson, Sarah)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 12/07 11:46 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino, case number CIVSB2213604 Receipt No: ACACDC-34437804 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Cal Cartage Customs Exam Station, LLC, National Distribution Centers, LLC, NFI Industries, Inc.. (Attorney Sarah E Christenson added to party Cal Cartage Customs Exam Station, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah E Christenson added to party NFI Industries, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah E Christenson added to party National Distribution Centers, LLC(pty:dft))(Christenson, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 State Court Complaint,
Att: 4 State Court Answer,
Att: 5 State Court Notice of Errata re Complaint
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Cal Cartage Customs Exam Station, LLC, Does 1-10, incluwive, NFI Industries, Inc., National Distribution Centers, LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Jimmy Escalante. Filed in State Court on 6/29/2022 Submitted with Attachment 5 to Notice of Removal1 (car) Modified on 12/7/2022 (car).
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Wed 12/07 4:33 PM
NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Cal Cartage Customs Exam Station, LLC, NFI Industries, Inc., National Distribution Centers, LLC. Submitted with Attachment 4 to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Wed 12/07 4:30 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Cal Cartage Customs Exam Station, LLC, Does 1-10, incluwive, NFI Industries, Inc., National Distribution Centers, LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Jimmy Escalante. Filed in State Court on 6/29/2022 Submitted with Attachment 5 to Notice of Removal1 (car) Modified on 12/7/2022 (car)
Related: [-]