Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:22-bk-70615

Illinois Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mary P Gorman
Case #: 3:22-ap-07026
Nature of Suit63 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(8), student loan
Case Filed:Dec 07, 2022
Terminated:Apr 05, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
US Department of Education
PO Box 69184
Harrisburg, PA 17106
Represented By
US Department of Education
contact info
Plaintiff
Christy L Holdman
5939 State Rt. 97
Pleasant Plains, IL 62677
Represented By
Joseph Camiel Pioletti
Pioletti Pioletti & Nichols
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
14 14 court Close Adversary Case Wed 04/05 8:42 AM
Adversary Case 3:22-ap-7026 Closed (court, apas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
13 13 utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 03/21 12:19 PM
Disposition of Adversary 22-07026 Judgment For Dismissed. Close Adversary: 4/4/2023. (court, apas)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 03/21 12:19 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. Check for Closing: 4/4/2023. (court, apas)
Related: [-] 11
11 11 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 03/21 9:22 AM
Joint Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Joseph Camiel Pioletti of Pioletti Pioletti & Nichols, Hinal A Patel of DOJ-USAO on behalf of Christy L Holdman, US Department of Education (Patel, Hinal)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Attorney Filer - Text Only) Tue 03/21 9:21 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Hinal A Patel of DOJ-USAO on behalf of US Department of Education. (Patel, Hinal)
Related: [-]
9 9 crtntc Entry of Appearance Deficiency Notice (MPG) Tue 03/21 9:17 AM
Deficiency re: Entry of Appearance - Attorney for Party Related [+] Entry of Appearance to be filed by 3/28/2023. (court, apas)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant US Department of Education, Plaintiff Christy L Holdman
8 8 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 03/21 8:47 AM
Joint Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Joseph Camiel Pioletti of Pioletti Pioletti & Nichols, Hinal A Patel of DOJ-USAO on behalf of Christy L Holdman, US Department of Education (Patel, Hinal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
7 7 order Extending Time to Answer (Text Order) Wed 12/21 3:04 PM
(Text-only order, no associated pdf) Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer Related [+]. Deadline for US Department of Education to Answer extended to 4/11/2023. (court, apas)
Related: [-] 6 Joint Motion to Extend/Shorten Time filed by Defendant US Department of Education
6 6 motion Extend/Shorten Time Wed 12/21 2:41 PM
Joint Motion to Extend/Shorten Time to /90 day extension of the Defendant's January 11, 2023 Response Deadline so that the parties may exchange and review information in an informal attempt to resolve this litigation., Filed by David H Hoff of U.S. Attorney's Office on behalf of US Department of Education (Hoff, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Attorney Filer - Text Only) Tue 12/20 9:30 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by David H Hoff of U.S. Attorney's Office on behalf of US Department of Education. (Hoff, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 12/07 2:09 PM
Summons Service Executed on US Department of Education 12/7/2022 (Pioletti, Joseph)
Related: [-]
3 3 crtntc Notice re: Filing of Complaint, Service of Summons and Default (Text Only) Wed 12/07 1:25 PM
(Text-only notice, no associated pdf) NOTICE RE: FILING OF COMPLAINT, SERVICE OF SUMMONS, AND DEFAULT. An adversary complaint has been filed. Selection of the proper "nature of suit" when docketing the complaint is important. Please verify that you have selected all actions that apply to your complaint and no others. For more information about selecting the appropriate "nature of suit" when filing a complaint, see the Court's procedures available on the Court's website or click the link below. A summons has been issued for service on the Defendant(s). The Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint within 7 days of issuance. If not served within 7 days, an alias summons must be requested. It is the sole responsibility of the Plaintiff to determine whether an alias summons is needed. Failure to effectuate proper service within 90 days of the filing of the complaint may result in dismissal. Proof of service is required and should be filed using the "Summons Service Executed" docket event. In the event the Defendant fails to appear and respond to the complaint, the Court will enter a default only upon the filing of a motion for default judgment and satisfaction of all other requirements under the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. The Court will no longer request motions for default or default judgment from parties. For more information about the service of summons and complaint and obtaining default judgments, see the Court's procedures for[LINK:Adversary Proceedings: Filing Complaint, Service of Summons, and Motions for Default Judgments] available on the Court's website. (court, apas)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 12/07 1:25 PM
Summons Issued on US Department of Education. Answer Due 1/11/2023 (court, apas)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/07 12:43 PM
Adversary case 22-07026 (63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan)): Complaint by Christy L Holdman against US Department of Education c/o FedLoan Servicing (Pioletti, Joseph)
Related: [-]