Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:22-bk-11554

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Theodor Albert
Case #: 8:22-ap-01105
Nature of Suit65 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - other
67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2022
Terminated:May 16, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Masoud Mohammadi
Represented By
Masoud Mohammadi
contact info
Plaintiff
NextGear Capital, Inc., a Delaware corporation
11799 North College Ave.
Carmel, IN 46032
Represented By
Tom Roddy Normandin
contact info
Trustee
Thomas H Casey (TR)
26400 La Alameda, Suite 210
Mission Viejo, CA 92691
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
33 33 court Close Adversary Case Tue 05/16 12:38 PM
Adversary Case 8:22-ap-1105 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (AM)
Related: [-] 15 Notice of Hearing (AP Case) filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc.,24 Notice of Hearing (AP Case) filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc.
Sunday, May 07, 2023
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 05/07 9:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/07/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 31 DEFAULT JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF)
Friday, May 05, 2023
31 31 order DEFAULT JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF) Fri 05/05 1:34 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT - Judgment shall be entered in favor of Plaintiff: NEXTGEAR CAPITAL, INC. Against Defendant: MASOUD MOHAMMADI - Plaintiff is awarded damages in the following amount: $303,226.76; Plaintiff is awarded costs in the following amount: $667.15; Plaintiff is awarded attorney fees in the following amount: $9,664.53 (BNC-PDF) - Please See Order For Further Ruling Signed on 5/5/2023 Related [+]. (GD)
Related: [-] 17 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc.
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
30 30 misc Notice of Lodgment Wed 05/03 4:58 PM
Notice of lodgment Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc. Related [+]. (Normandin, Tom)
Related: [-] 17 Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc. Default Judgment Motion due by 04/3/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Normandin, Tom) - Warning: See docket entry no.: 19 for corrections Modified on 3/3/2023 (GD). filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc.
Thursday, April 27, 2023
29 29 court Hearing Held (Other) Thu 04/27 2:16 PM
Hearing Held Re: Status Conference Related [+] Off Calendar (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc.
28 28 court Hearing Held (Motion) Thu 04/27 1:07 PM
Hearing Held Related [+] - Motion is granted. Movant to submit order. (GD)
Related: [-] 17 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc.
Thursday, March 16, 2023
27 27 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 03/16 1:09 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued Status Conference Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 4/27/2023 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - Continued to April 27, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc.
Friday, March 10, 2023
26 26 misc Status report Fri 03/10 11:18 AM
Status report (Unilateral) Filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc. Related [+]. (Normandin, Tom)
Related: [-] 25 Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case)
Thursday, March 09, 2023
25 25 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 03/09 2:49 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued Status Conference Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 3/16/2023 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - Continued To 3-16-23 at 10:00 A.M. Per Court's Own Motion (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc.
Monday, March 06, 2023
24 24 notice Notice of Hearing (AP Case) Mon 03/06 4:22 PM
Notice of Hearing (CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE) Filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc.. (Normandin, Tom)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2023
23 23 court Hearing Set (Motion) (AP Case) Fri 03/03 12:11 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 4/27/2023 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (GD)
Related: [-] 17 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc.
22 22 notice Notice of Hearing (AP Case) Fri 03/03 11:16 AM
Notice of Hearing Supplemental Notice of Hearing To Be Held Remotely Using ZoomGov Audio and Video Filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc. Related [+]. (Normandin, Tom)
Related: [-] 17 Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc. Default Judgment Motion due by 04/3/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Normandin, Tom) - Warning: See docket entry no.: 19 for corrections Modified on 3/3/2023 (GD). filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc.
21 21 misc Notice of Lodgment Fri 03/03 11:14 AM
Notice of lodgment Proposed Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc. Related [+]. (Normandin, Tom)
Related: [-] 17 Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc. Default Judgment Motion due by 04/3/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Normandin, Tom) - Warning: See docket entry no.: 19 for corrections Modified on 3/3/2023 (GD). filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc.
20 20 notice Notice of Hearing (AP Case) Fri 03/03 11:12 AM
Notice of Hearing (Amended Notice) Filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc. Related [+]. (Normandin, Tom)
Related: [-] 17 Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc. Default Judgment Motion due by 04/3/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Normandin, Tom) - Warning: See docket entry no.: 19 for corrections Modified on 3/3/2023 (GD). filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc.
19 19 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Fri 03/03 10:14 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect hearing date/time/location was selected. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE AN AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION/HEARING WITH THE CORRECT HEARING INFORMATION. YOU HAVE THE WRONG HEARING DATE & TIME LISTED ON THIS MOTION - CORRECT HEARING DATE & TIME IS APRIL 27, 2023 AT 11:00 A.M.- ALSO PLEASE FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL ZOOM/GOV NOTICE WITH THE CORRECT ZOOM MEETING ID AND ZOOM PASSWORD - PLEASE CORRECT ASAP - THANK YOU FOR YOUR ATTENTION TO THIS MATTER Related [+] (GD)
Related: [-] 17 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc.
18 18 misc Declaration Fri 03/03 9:49 AM
Declaration re: Filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc. Related [+]. (Normandin, Tom)
Related: [-] 17 Motion for Default Judgment
Att: 1 Exhibit
17 17 motion Default Judgment (motion) Fri 03/03 9:46 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc. Default Judgment Motion due by 04/3/2023. (Normandin, Tom) - Warning: See docket entry no.: 19 for corrections Modified on 3/3/2023 (GD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 02, 2023
16 16 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 03/02 9:47 AM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued Status Conference Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 3/9/2023 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - Continued To 3-09-23 At 10:00 A.M. Per Court's Own Motion (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc.
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of Hearing (AP Case) Wed 02/15 1:15 PM
Notice of Hearing (CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE Filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc.. (Normandin, Tom)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 22, 2023
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 01/22 9:14 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 01/22/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Notice that Clerk Has Entered Default (BNC)
Saturday, January 21, 2023
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 01/21 9:14 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 01/21/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Notice that Clerk Has Not Entered Default (BNC)
Friday, January 20, 2023
12 12 misc Notice That Clerk Has Entered Default (BNC) Fri 01/20 11:42 AM
Notice That Clerk Has Entered Default Against Defendant(s) MASOUD MOHAMMADI Related [+] (AM)
Related: [-] 11 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc.
11 11 misc Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) Fri 01/20 9:55 AM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to MOSOUD MOHAMMADI Filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc.. (Normandin, Tom) [A typo in the spelling of the first name in this entry. Correct spelling MASOUD] Modified on 1/20/2023 (AM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2023
10 10 misc Notice That a Default Has Not Been Entered by the Clerk (BNC) Thu 01/19 6:01 PM
Notice That a Default Has Not Been Entered by the Clerk Against Defendant(s) Masoud Mohammadi Related [+] (SD8)
Related: [-] 9 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc.
9 9 misc Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) Thu 01/19 3:19 PM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to MASOUD MOHAMMADI Filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc.. (Normandin, Tom)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 08, 2022
8 8 misc Proof of service Thu 12/08 11:37 AM
Proof of service Filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc. Related [+]. (Normandin, Tom)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Corporate Ownership Statement,3 Statement,5 Summons Issued,7 Statement
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
7 7 misc Statement Wed 12/07 2:40 PM
Statement Amended Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet Filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc.. (Normandin, Tom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
6 6 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Tue 12/06 5:14 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect/incomplete/unreadable PDF was attached to the docket entry. Incorrect Nature of Suit [41-Objection/revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)] checked THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITH THE CORRECT PDF IMMEDIATELY. Related [+] (SD8)
Related: [-] 3 Statement filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc.
5 5 court Summons Issued Tue 12/06 5:03 PM
Summons Issued on Masoud Mohammadi Date Issued 12/6/2022, Answer Due 1/5/2023 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 3/2/2023 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (SD8)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc.
4 4 court Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required Tue 12/06 5:00 PM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Incorrect case data/statistical information was entered at the time of filing. Incorrect demand amount entered at time of filing. It has been corrected from 303226000 to 303000 THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS INFORMATION. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. Related [+] (SD8)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc.
3 3 misc Statement Tue 12/06 3:31 PM
Statement Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet Filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc.. (Normandin, Tom)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Tue 12/06 3:27 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc.. (Normandin, Tom)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/06 3:22 PM
Adversary case 8:22-ap-01105. Complaint by NextGear Capital, Inc. against Masoud Mohammadi. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) (Normandin, Tom) Warning: See docket entry no: 4 for corrections made Modified on 12/6/2022 (SD8)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E