Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referred: Janis Van Meerveld
Case #: 2:22-cv-05102
Nature of Suit340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine
Cause33:0933 Longshore and Harbor Workers' Compensation Act
Case Filed:Dec 07, 2022
Terminated:Nov 02, 2023
Last checked: Monday Jun 05, 2023 4:23 AM CDT
Defendant
Baywater Drilling, LLC
Represented By
Tarryn Elizabeth Walsh
Murphy, Rogers, Sloss & Gambel (new Orleans)
contact info
Peter B. Tompkins
Murphy, Rogers, Sloss & Gambel (new Orleans)
contact info
Plaintiff
Anthony Roberts
Represented By
Charles Clarence Bourque, Jr.
St. Martin & Bourque
contact info
Joseph G. Jevic, III
St. Martin & Bourque
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
32 32 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 11/29 3:57 PM
ORDER granting31 Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims in the above captioned matter are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on November 29, 2023. (mp)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Dismiss Wed 11/29 11:42 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff, Anthony Roberts and by Baywater Drilling, LLC.(Tompkins, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, November 02, 2023
30 30 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 11/02 10:37 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 11/1/2023.(mmm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
29 29 minutes Settlement Conference Tue 10/31 2:58 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld: Settlement Conference held on 10/31/2023. Negotiations were successful and resulted in the settlement of all claims. (NEF: Sec G) (rt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/25 10:24 AM
ORDER granting27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert Colten Chapman. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on October 24, 2023. (mp) (mp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (10/25/2023) Notice to Visiting Attorneys
Monday, October 23, 2023
27 27 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 10/23 4:07 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert Colten Chapman (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-10234277) by Zurich American Insurance Company.(McKeough, Jade) Modified text on 10/23/2023 (mp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit efile privileges consent form,
Att: 2 Exhibit Affidavit of Robert Colten Chapman,
Att: 3 Exhibit certificate of good standing,
Att: 4 Proposed Order proposed order
Friday, October 20, 2023
26 26 order Scheduling Order Fri 10/20 8:56 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadline 2/12/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/11/2024 04:00 PM before Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Bench Trial set for 4/29/2024 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Issued by Clerk.(mp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice Form,
Att: 2 Standing Order
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/17 9:49 AM
ORDER denying19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert C. Chapman. A motion on Mr. Chapman's behalf may be re-filed once he is prepared to comply with the actions necessary to become an e-filer with this Court. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on October 16, 2023. (mp)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
24 24 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 10/16 10:20 AM
NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference RESET for 10/19/2023 03:00 PM before case manager by telephone. Call-in instructions provided here. Issued by Clerk. (mp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
23 23 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 09/27 9:00 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 10/19/2023 02:30 PM before case manager by telephone. Call-in instructions provided herein. Issued by Clerk. (mp)
Related: [-]
22 22 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines Wed 09/27 8:59 AM
ORDER granting20 Joint Motion and Incorporated Memorandum to Continue Trial, Pre-trial Conference, and Pre-trial Deadline. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on September 26, 2023.(mp)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
21 21 4 pgs order Order Set Hearings Mon 09/25 1:49 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: A settlement conference in the above matter is hereby scheduled for Tuesday, October 31, 2023, at 10:00 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. The required settlement memoranda, more fully described on Pages 2-3, are due no later than 11:59 p.m. on Tuesday, October 24, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 9/25/2023. (rt)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Continue Mon 09/25 12:05 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Continue Trial Pre-trial Conference, and Pre-trial Deadlines by Baywater Drilling, LLC, Zurich American Insurance Company and by Anthony Roberts.(Bourque, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, September 21, 2023
19 19 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 09/21 1:04 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert Colton Chapman (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-10167240) by Zurich American Insurance Company.(McKeough, Jade) Modified on 9/21/2023 (mp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Efile consent form,
Att: 2 Affidavit,
Att: 3 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Friday, September 15, 2023
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Fri 09/15 11:23 AM
NOTICE: As previously set forth in the scheduling order, counsel for the parties are instructed to contact the assigned Magistrate Judge six weeks prior to the pretrial conference for purposes of scheduling a settlement conference which should be held within two weeks prior to the pretrial conference. Issued by Clerk. (mp)
Related: [-]
17 17 cmp Intervenor Complaint Fri 09/15 10:22 AM
PETITION OF INTERVENTION filed by Zurich American Insurance Company.(mp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
16 16 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Fri 09/15 10:21 AM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Leave to File Petition of Intervention. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on September 14, 2023. (mp)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
15 15 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Fri 09/08 3:39 PM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re14 MOTION for Leave to File Petition of Intervention . The deficiency notice previously issued has been retracted by the Clerk. A Local Rule 7.6 Certificate of Counsel accompanied the motion. (mp)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Leave to File Document Fri 09/08 2:08 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Petition of Intervention by Zurich American Insurance Company.Attorney Jade C. McKeough added to party Zurich American Insurance Company(pty:intv).(McKeough, Jade) Modified on 9/8/2023 (mp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Notice of Submission,
Att: 3 Proposed Pleading,
Att: 4 Exhibit
Friday, August 11, 2023
13 13 trial Witness and Exhibit List Fri 08/11 3:44 PM
Witness and Exhibit List by Anthony Roberts. (Bourque, Charles)
Related: [-]
12 12 trial Witness and Exhibit List Fri 08/11 2:55 PM
Witness and Exhibit List by Baywater Drilling, LLC. (Tompkins, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 14, 2023
11 11 misc Status Report Fri 04/14 9:12 AM
STATUS REPORT by Baywater Drilling, LLC and by Anthony Roberts (Bourque, Charles)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
10 10 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Wed 03/01 4:20 PM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re9 Scheduling Order. Document filed in incorrect case. Please disregard R. Doc. 9. Refer to R. Doc. 8 for correct Scheduling Order. (mp)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Scheduling Order Wed 03/01 4:14 PM
**FILED IN INCORRECT CASE **: SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadline 1/19/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/29/2024 03:00 PM before Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Jury Trial set for 3/25/2024 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Issued by Clerk.(mp) Modified on 3/1/2023 (mp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice Form,
Att: 2 Standing Order
8 8 order Scheduling Order Wed 03/01 4:12 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadline 9/1/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2023 03:00 PM before Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Bench Trial set for 11/6/2023 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Issued by Clerk.(mp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice Form,
Att: 2 Standing Order
Friday, February 17, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 02/17 8:06 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 3/1/2023 03:00 PM before case manager by telephone. Call-in instructions provided herein. Issued by Clerk. (mp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
6 6 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Thu 02/16 5:00 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Baywater Drilling, LLC identifying Corporate Parent JDH Capital I, L.P. for Baywater Drilling, LLC (Tompkins, Peter)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/16 4:58 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Baywater Drilling, LLC.Attorney Peter B. Tompkins added to party Baywater Drilling, LLC(pty:dft).(Tompkins, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2022
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 12/09 3:37 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Baywater Drilling, LLC served on 12/9/2022, answer due 12/30/2022. (Jevic, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 08, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 12/08 11:23 AM
Summons Issued as to Baywater Drilling, LLC. (jls)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Wed 12/07 3:36 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/07 3:21 PM
COMPLAINT against Baywater Drilling, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9690667) filed by Anthony Roberts.Attorney Charles Clarence Bourque, Jr added to party Anthony Roberts(pty:pla).(Bourque, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons