District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Randolph D Moss
Case #: 1:22-cv-03668
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
CauseNotice of Filing Arbitration Award
Case Filed:Dec 07, 2022
Terminated:Apr 07, 2023
Last checked: Monday Jun 05, 2023 5:22 AM EDT
Petitioner
SYLVAN LEARNING LLC
Represented By
Eric L. Yaffe
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Respondent
EDUCASIAN, LTD.
Respondent
CHERYL RAPER
Respondent
TREVOR RAPER


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 07, 2023
order .Order Fri 04/07 9:44 AM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Court's order granting Petitioner's motion for confirmation of arbitration award, Dkt.9 , the Clerk of Court shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/7/2023. (lcrdm3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
9 9 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Confirm Wed 04/05 2:01 PM
ORDER: For the reasons explained herein, it is hereby ORDERED that Petitioner's motion for confirmation of arbitral award, Dkt.7 , is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Final Award dated August 25, 2022 in International Centre for Dispute Resolution Case Number 02 21-0003 6401, is RECOGNIZED and CONFIRMED. It is further ORDERED that judgment in favor of Petitioner and against Respondents, jointly and severally is hereby ENTERED in the amount of (1) $251,050.38 for past due royalty and other fees; (2) $380,496.61 for attorneys' fees and expenses incurred; and (3) $14,415.00 for fees paid to the arbitration tribunal. It is further ORDERED that Respondents shall comply with the Final Award and that post-judgment interest in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1961 from the date of this Order is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that this Court will retain jurisdiction for the purposes of further proceedings if necessary to enforce this Court's Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/5/2023. (lcrdm3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 02, 2023
8 8 service Certificate of Service Thu 03/02 5:16 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SYLVAN LEARNING LLC re Order,, Set Deadlines, . (Yaffe, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2023
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Mon 02/13 9:09 AM
NOTICE - Request for Confirmation of Arbitral Award by SYLVAN LEARNING LLC (Yaffe, Eric)
Related: [-]
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 02/13 6:30 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Petitioner's request for confirmation of arbitral award, Dkt.7 , it is hereby ORDERED that Respondents shall respond to the request on or before March 3, 2023. It is further ORDERED that Petitioners shall ensure that Respondents receive a copy of this order as soon as possible. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/13/2023. (lcrdm3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
6 6 service Summons Returned as to private individual or business Tue 01/17 1:56 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. EDUCASIAN, LTD. served on 12/21/2022, answer due 1/11/2023; CHERYL RAPER served on 12/23/2022, answer due 1/13/2023; TREVOR RAPER served on 12/23/2022, answer due 1/13/2023(Yaffe, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit HWL-1 - Screenshot of Cyber Search Centre,
Att: 2 Exhibit HWL-2 - 2021 Annual Return,
Att: 3 Exhibit HWL-3 - Cover letter issued by Messrs. Ribeiro Hui,
Att: 4 Exhibit HWL-4 - Cover letter issued by Messrs. Ribeiro Hui,
Att: 5 Exhibit HWL-5 - Screenshot of Hongkong Post's website,
Att: 6 Exhibit HWL-6 - Cover letter issued by Messrs. Ribeiro Hui,
Att: 7 Exhibit HWL-7 - Cover letter issued by Messrs. Ribeiro Hui,
Att: 8 Exhibit HWL-8 - Screenshot of Hongkong Post's website,
Att: 9 Exhibit HWL-9 - Cover letter issued by Messrs. Ribeiro Hui
Thursday, January 12, 2023
notice Notice of Error Thu 01/12 10:54 AM
ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE OF ERROR regarding5 Affidavit,,. The following error(s) need correction: Please refile using event: Service of Process - Summons returned Executed - Select parties that have been served and enter date of delivery (not date mailed). (zjm) Modified on 1/12/2023 (zjm)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
5 5 misc Affidavit Mon 01/09 4:39 PM
AFFIDAVIT re1 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award,, served on EDUCASIAN, LTD., CHERYL RAPER, and TREVOR RAPER by SYLVAN LEARNING LLC.(Yaffe, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit HWL-1 - Screenshot of Cyber Search Centre,
Att: 2 Exhibit HWL-2 - 2021 Annual Return,
Att: 3 Exhibit HWL-3 - Cover letter issued by Messrs. Ribeiro Hui,
Att: 4 Exhibit HWL-4 - Cover letter issued by Messrs. Ribeiro Hui,
Att: 5 Exhibit HWL-5 - Screenshot of Hongkong Post's website,
Att: 6 Exhibit HWL-6 - Cover letter issued by Messrs. Ribeiro Hui,
Att: 7 Exhibit HWL-7 - Cover letter issued by Messrs. Ribeiro Hui,
Att: 8 Exhibit HWL-8 - Screenshot of Hongkong Post's website
Thursday, December 08, 2022
4 4 order .Order Thu 12/08 4:14 PM
STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/8/2022. (lcrdm3)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 12/08 11:15 AM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to EDUCASIAN, LTD., CHERYL RAPER, TREVOR RAPER.(zljn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 12/08 9:26 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zljn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
2 2 notice LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Wed 12/07 5:59 PM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SYLVAN LEARNING LLC (Yaffe, Eric)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award Wed 12/07 5:53 PM
PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD against EDUCASIAN, LTD., CHERYL RAPER, TREVOR RAPER ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9719786) filed by SYLVAN LEARNING LLC.(Yaffe, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 7 pgs Exhibit 1 - Excerpts License Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - ICDRs letter,
Att: 3 10 pgs Exhibit 3 - Final Award of Arbitrator,
Att: 4 2 pgs Exhibit 4 - Deposition of Request for Modification of Final Award,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 6 Summons - Educasian, LTD.,
Att: 7 Summons - Trevor Raper,
Att: 8 Summons - Cheryl Raper,
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet