Texas Western District Court
Judge:Alan D Albright
Case #: 1:22-cv-01290
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Dec 08, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 06, 2023 3:29 AM CDT
Defendant
Hi Tech Imports North, LLC
Represented By
Donald W. Gould, II
Johnson Deluca Kurisky & Gould, P.C.
contact info
Aaron E. Pannell
Johnson Deluca Kurisky & Gould, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Debbie McNeilly
Represented By
Nathan E. Inurria
Ross Scalise Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Daniel B. Ross
The Ross Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
19 19 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 08/21 3:44 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Debbie McNeilly. (Inurria, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
18 18 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 01/30 9:02 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Consent to Trial by Magistrate due by 9/15/2023, Jury Selection set for 2/3/2025 at 9:30AM before Judge Alan D Albright, Jury Trial set for 2/4/2025 at 9:30 AM before Judge Alan D Albright, Amended Pleadings due by 7/21/2023, Discovery due by 8/26/2024, and Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2024. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
17 17 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Fri 01/26 12:24 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Debbie McNeilly. (Inurria, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 11/22 9:34 AM
Text Order GRANTING16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Alan D Albright. On this day, came to be considered Counsel's Motion for Withdrawal. AfterConsidering the evidence and hearing the arguments of counsel, if any, it appears tothe Court that the Motion is meritorious and is therefore GRANTED.IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Aaron Pannell be removed as counsel of record for the Defendant; it is further,ORDERED that Donald W. Gould, II and the firm of Johns DeLuca Kurisky& Gould, P.C. will remain as Counsel for Defendant. Donald W. Gould, II shall be designated as Lead Counsel, if necessary. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (walc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
16 16 3 pgs motion Withdraw As Attorney Tue 11/21 2:11 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Hi Tech Imports North, LLC.(Pannell, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
15 15 motion Entry of Scheduling Order Wed 08/30 9:25 AM
MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order Deadlines by Debbie McNeilly. (Inurria, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
14 14 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 06/07 2:58 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Alan D Albright for all proceedings. Judge Docket II - Austin no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (klw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
13 13 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Thu 05/25 11:29 AM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Debbie McNeilly. (Inurria, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
12 12 misc Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge Mon 05/15 3:52 PM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Debbie McNeilly. (Inurria, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2023
11 11 10 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 05/12 3:47 PM
Defendant Hi Tech Imports North, LLC's ANSWER to8 Amended Complaint . Attorney Aaron E. Pannell added to party Hi Tech Imports North, LLC(pty:dft) by Hi Tech Imports North, LLC.(Pannell, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2023
10 10 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 05/12 2:52 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Docket II - Austin for all proceedings. Judge Lee Yeakel no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (bot1)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 03/20 3:15 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Debbie McNeilly as to Hi Tech Imports North, LLC. Waiver sent on 3/13/2023, answer due 5/12/2023. (Inurria, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
8 8 10 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/13 4:27 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hi Tech Imports North, LLC amending1 Complaint., filed by Debbie McNeilly.(Inurria, Nathan)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Party Order on Motion to Amend Complaint Mon 03/13 4:20 PM
ORDER GRANTING6 Motion to Substitute Party. ; GRANTING6 Motion to Amend Complaint Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2023
6 6 motion Substitute Party Amend Complaint Fri 03/10 12:49 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party , Unopposed MOTION to Amend Complaint by Debbie McNeilly.(Inurria, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 1 pgs Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 01/10 3:57 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Debbie McNeilly as to All Defendants. (Ross, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2022
4 4 2 pgs service Summons Issued Fri 12/09 11:45 AM
Summons Issued as to Hi Tech Motorcars, LLC. (cr5)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 08, 2022
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 12/08 2:49 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Debbie McNeilly. (Ross, Daniel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate of Interested Parties Thu 12/08 2:48 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties by Debbie McNeilly. (Ross, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 12/08 2:47 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16837766), filed by Debbie McNeilly.(Ross, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 12/09 10:32 AM
Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cr5)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Fri 12/09 10:34 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower. (cr5)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Fri 12/09 10:35 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Debbie McNeilly. (cr5)
Related: [-]