Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Leslie Abrams Gardner
Case #: 1:22-cv-00207
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act, et seq
Case Filed:Dec 08, 2022
Terminated:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 06, 2023 4:36 AM EDT
Defendant
SUMTER COUNTY GEORGIA
SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS 500 WEST LAMAR STREET
AMERICUS, GA 31709
Represented By
HENRY THOMAS SHAW
contact info
Plaintiff
RHONDA JACKSON
PO BOX 161
AMERICUS, GA 31709
Represented By
WILLIAM GREG DOBSON
contact info
A DANIELLE MCBRIDE
contact info
GREGORY O WIGGINS
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS
Terminated: 04/05/2023
Represented By
HENRY THOMAS SHAW
contact info

GPO Mar 17 2025
ORDER GRANTED and ORDER LIFTING STAY 36 Renewed Motion to Substitute. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 3/3/2025. (mdp)
GPO Mar 31 2025
ORDER granting 19 Motion for Summary Judgment. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 3/31/2025 (mdp)
GPO Mar 31 2025
JUDGMENT (mdp)

Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
43 43 appeal USCA Case Number Mon 05/05 4:00 PM
USCA Case Number 25-11488 re40 Notice of Appeal, filed by RHONDA JACKSON. (mdp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
42 42 appeal Transcript Information Form Thu 05/01 10:18 AM
TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by RHONDA JACKSON. re40 Notice of Appeal, NO TRANSCRIPTS ORDERED (WIGGINS, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
41 41 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Wed 04/30 4:15 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:38 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,39 Judgment,40 Notice of Appeal. Judge Appealed: Leslie A. Gardner. Fee: Paid. (mdp)
Related: [-]
40 40 appeal Notice of Appeal Wed 04/30 9:49 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to38 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,39 Judgment by RHONDA JACKSON. Filing fee $ 605, Receipt No.: AGAMDC-4931850.(WIGGINS, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Order of March 31, 2025,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Judgment of March 31, 2025,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-Order of March 17, 2025
appeal Appeal Instructions Wed 04/30 3:50 PM
Appeal Instructions re40 Notice of Appeal. The Transcript Information Form and instructions are available on the District Court website under Forms & Guides. **PLEASE NOTE** Separate forms must be filed for each court reporter. Transcript Order Form due by 5/19/2025 (mdp)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
39 39 order Judgment Mon 03/31 2:08 PM
JUDGMENT (mdp)
Related: [-]
38 38 21 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Mon 03/31 10:44 AM
ORDER granting19 Motion for Summary Judgment. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 3/31/2025 (mdp)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
37 37 4 pgs order Order Order Lifting Stay Mon 03/17 11:23 AM
ORDER GRANTED and ORDER LIFTING STAY36 Renewed Motion to Substitute. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 3/3/2025. (mdp)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
36 36 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 10/18 9:06 AM
MOTION Renewed Motion to Substitute Widow as Plaintiff re35 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by RHONDA JACKSON filed by GREGORY O WIGGINS.(WIGGINS, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Letter of Testamentary from Probate Court
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
35 35 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 09/18 4:14 PM
ORDER denying34 Motion to Substitute Plaintiff. William Jackson or the proper party pursuant to Rule 25 may, within ninety (90) days of this Order file a renewed motion and submit evidence to the Court that they are Plaintiffs personal representative or successor. The Court STAYS this case pending the filing of a motion to substitute by a party with standing. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 09/18/2024. (mdm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
34 34 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 06/20 2:56 PM
MOTION Substitute Plaintiff re33 Suggestion of Death by RHONDA JACKSON filed by GREGORY O WIGGINS.(WIGGINS, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Suggestion of Death Thu 06/20 2:49 PM
SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Rhonda Jackson by RHONDA JACKSON (WIGGINS, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 06/20 12:32 PM
***FILED CORRECTLY AT34 *** MOTION to Substitute Widow, William Jackson, for Deceased Plaintiff, Rhonda Jackson by RHONDA JACKSON filed by GREGORY O WIGGINS.(WIGGINS, GREGORY) Modified on 6/20/2024 to edit docket text.(mdm)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Suggestion of Death Thu 06/20 12:25 PM
SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Rhonda Jackson by RHONDA JACKSON (WIGGINS, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Thu 06/20 2:23 PM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]; Document must be converted into text-searchable PDF format and re-filed. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures.(mdm)
Related: [-] 31 Suggestion of Death filed by RHONDA JACKSON,32 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by RHONDA JACKSON
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
30 30 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Tue 04/16 3:50 PM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER denying as moot28 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 4/16/2024 (emo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
29 29 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 03/26 3:47 PM
REPLY to Response filed by SUMTER COUNTY GEORGIA re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment (SHAW, HENRY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
28 28 motion File Excess Pages Thu 03/21 2:14 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply by SUMTER COUNTY GEORGIA filed by HENRY THOMAS SHAW.(SHAW, HENRY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exceed Page Limitation
Friday, March 08, 2024
27 27 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 03/08 11:08 AM
ORDER granting26 Motion for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 03/08/2024. (mdm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
26 26 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection Wed 03/06 1:07 PM
CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File REPLY TO RESPONSE as to19 MOTION for Summary Judgment by SUMTER COUNTY GEORGIA filed by HENRY THOMAS SHAW.(SHAW, HENRY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
notice Notice of Clerk's Granting of Extension Thu 02/15 8:05 AM
Notice of Clerk's Granting of Extension Pursuant to Local Rule 6.2 re:19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SUMTER COUNTY GEORGIA (bcl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
25 25 misc Request for Local Rule 6.2/9.4 Clerk's Extension Wed 02/14 2:52 PM
Request for Local Rule 6.2 Clerks Extension re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment by SUMTER COUNTY GEORGIA (SHAW, HENRY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
24 24 respm Response to Motion Tue 02/13 4:57 PM
RESPONSE filed by RHONDA JACKSON re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment(WIGGINS, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Motion and Memorandum in Support of SJ
23 23 discov Certificate of Need to File Discovery Tue 02/13 9:44 AM
Certificate of Need to File Discovery and Cure Noice of Deficiency (Plaintiff's Evidentiary Submission in Opposition to Summary Judgment) by RHONDA JACKSON. Related document:19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SUMTER COUNTY GEORGIA.(WIGGINS, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit #1-Deposition of R Volley,
Att: 2 Exhibit #2-Deposition of D Harris,
Att: 3 Exhibit #3-Declaration of R Jackson,
Att: 4 Exhibit #4-June 23, 2017 Write Up and PIP,
Att: 5 Exhibit #5-R Jackson FMLA Request Form
Monday, February 12, 2024
notice Notice of Deficiency Mon 02/12 1:05 PM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]; Documents should be filed as attachments to your Response to Motion for Summary Judgment or can be refiled as attachment to a Certificate of Need to Filed Discovery. Notice of Deficiency; All document must be converted into a text-searchable PDF format prior to filing. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (mdm)
Related: [-] 22 Notice (Other), filed by RHONDA JACKSON 22 Notice (Other), filed by RHONDA JACKSON
Friday, February 09, 2024
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/09 12:51 PM
NOTICE Filing Evidentiary Submission Evidence by RHONDA JACKSON(WIGGINS, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit #1-Deposition of R Volley,
Att: 2 Exhibit #2-Deposition of D Harris,
Att: 3 Exhibit #3-Declaration of R Jackson,
Att: 4 Exhibit #4-June 23, 2017 Write Up and PIP,
Att: 5 Exhibit #5-R Jackson FMLA Request Form
Thursday, January 18, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 01/18 10:15 AM
ORDER granting20 Motion for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE re20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE as to19 MOTION for Summary Judgment,19 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 1/18/2024 (bcl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection Tue 01/16 12:57 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE as to19 MOTION for Summary Judgment by RHONDA JACKSON filed by GREGORY O WIGGINS.(WIGGINS, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
19 19 motion Summary Judgment Tue 01/02 3:49 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by SUMTER COUNTY GEORGIA filed by HENRY THOMAS SHAW.(SHAW, HENRY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Material Facts DEFENDANTS STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS,
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT,
Att: 3 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF RAYETTA VOLLEY,
Att: 4 Exhibit EXHIBIT A TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF RAYETTA VOLLEY - PERSONNEL POLICIES,
Att: 5 Exhibit EXHIBIT B TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF RAYETTA VOLLEY - JOB DUTIES,
Att: 6 Exhibit EXHIBIT C TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF RAYETTA VOLLEY- APRIL 12 LETTER,
Att: 7 Exhibit EXHIBIT D TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF RAYETTA VOLLEY - INVESTIGATION MEMORANDUM,
Att: 8 Exhibit EXHIBIT E TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF RAYETTA VOLLEY- JIMENEZ EMAILS,
Att: 9 Exhibit EXHIBIT F TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF RAYETTA VOLLEY - MARCH 21 EMAIL,
Att: 10 Exhibit EXHIBIT G TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF RAYETTA VOLLEY - MCCANTS STATEMENT,
Att: 11 Exhibit EXHIBIT H TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF RAYETTA VOLLEY- PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE,
Att: 12 Exhibit EXHIBIT I TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF RAYETTA VOLLEY - MCLENDON MD NOTE,
Att: 13 Exhibit EXHIBIT J TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF RAYETTA VOLLEY - SMITH MD LETTER,
Att: 14 Exhibit EXHIBIT K TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF RAYETTA VOLLEY - GRIEVANCE LETTER,
Att: 15 Exhibit EXHIBIT L TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF RAYETTA VOLLEY - APRIL 22 EMAIL,
Att: 16 Exhibit EXHIBIT M TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF RAYETTA VOLLEY - APRIL 25 MEMORANDUM,
Att: 17 Exhibit EXHIBIT N TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF RAYETTA VOLLEY - APRIL 26 EMAIL,
Att: 18 Exhibit EXHIBIT O TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF RAYETTA VOLLEY - RESIGNATION LETTER,
Att: 19 Exhibit EXHIBIT P TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF RAYETTA VOLLEY - DISMISSAL LETTER,
Att: 20 Exhibit EXHIBIT Q TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF RAYETTA VOLLEY - SEPARATION NOTICE,
Att: 21 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF DEATRICE HARRIS,
Att: 22 Exhibit EXHIBIT A TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF DEATRICE HARRIS - PERSONNEL POLICIES,
Att: 23 Exhibit EXHIBIT B TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF DEATRICE HARRIS - JIMENEZ EMAILS,
Att: 24 Exhibit EXHIBIT C TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF DEATRICE HARRIS - JOB DUTIES,
Att: 25 Exhibit EXHIBIT D TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF DEATRICE HARRIS - NOTES FROM MEETING WITH JIMENEZ,
Att: 26 Exhibit EXHIBIT E TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF DEATRICE HARRIS - NOTES FROM MEETING WITH WILLIAMS,
Att: 27 Exhibit EXHIBIT F TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF DEATRICE HARRIS - NOTES FROM MEETING WITH MCCANTS,
Att: 28 Exhibit EXHIBIT G TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF DEATRICE HARRIS - MCCANTS STATEMENT,
Att: 29 Exhibit EXHIBIT H TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF DEATRICE HARRIS - MARCH 21 EMAIL,
Att: 30 Exhibit EXHIBIT I TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF DEATRICE HARRIS - NOTES FROM MARCH 28 MEETING,
Att: 31 Exhibit EXHIBIT J TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF DEATRICE HARRIS - INVESTIGATION MEMORANDUM,
Att: 32 Exhibit EXHIBIT K TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF DEATRICE HARRIS - PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE,
Att: 33 Exhibit EXHIBIT L TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF DEATRICE HARRIS - APRIL 12 LETTER,
Att: 34 Exhibit EXHIBIT M TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF DEATRICE HARRIS - GRIEVANCE LETTER,
Att: 35 Exhibit EXHIBIT N TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF DEATRICE HARRIS - APRIL 22 EMAIL,
Att: 36 Exhibit EXHIBIT O TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF DEATRICE HARRIS - NOTES FROM APRIL 25 MEETING,
Att: 37 Exhibit EXHIBIT P TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF DEATRICE HARRIS - APRIL 25 MEMORANDUM,
Att: 38 Exhibit EXHIBIT Q TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF DEATRICE HARRIS - APRIL 26 EMAIL,
Att: 39 Exhibit EXHIBIT R TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF DEATRICE HARRIS - DISMISSAL LETTER,
Att: 40 Exhibit EXHIBIT S TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF DEATRICE HARRIS - RESIGNATION LETTER,
Att: 41 Exhibit EXHIBIT T TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF DEATRICE HARRIS - SEPARATION NOTICE,
Att: 42 Required Form CERTIFICATION OF USE IN PROCEEDING AND NOTICE OF FILING OF DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT,
Att: 43 Exhibit DEPOSITION OF RHONDA JACKSON
Monday, October 16, 2023
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 10/16 4:00 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.Discovery to be complete by 11/30/2023. Dispositive motions due by 1/2/2024. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 10/16/2023. (mdm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
17 17 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 10/12 11:16 AM
JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by SUMTER COUNTY GEORGIA filed by HENRY THOMAS SHAW.(SHAW, HENRY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 08/16 11:26 AM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery to be complete by 10/16/2023. Dispositive motions due by 11/17/2023. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 8/16/2023 (dht)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Wed 08/16 9:00 AM
NOTICE Notice of Consent by RHONDA JACKSON (WIGGINS, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2023
14 14 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 07/21 10:34 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by SUMTER COUNTY GEORGIA filed by HENRY THOMAS SHAW.(SHAW, HENRY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
13 13 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 07/19 8:13 AM
ANSWER to9 Amended Complaint/Petition by SUMTER COUNTY GEORGIA with Jury Demand.(SHAW, HENRY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 04/05 4:17 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 4/5/2023 (bcl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
11 11 order Scheduling/Discovery Order Thu 02/16 2:05 PM
SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER :Discovery to be complete by 8/17/2023. Dispositive motions due by 9/18/2023. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 02/16/2023.(mdm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Scheduling & Discovery Order
Monday, February 13, 2023
10 10 respm Response to Motion Mon 02/13 12:35 PM
RESPONSE filed by RHONDA JACKSON re7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (WIGGINS, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint/Petition Mon 02/13 12:34 PM
AMENDED1 Complaint, against SUMTER COUNTY GEORGIA by RHONDA JACKSON (WIGGINS, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2023
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/30 11:42 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by SUMTER COUNTY GEORGIA with Jury Demand.(SHAW, HENRY)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 01/30 11:19 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS filed by HENRY THOMAS SHAW.(SHAW, HENRY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss
Thursday, January 19, 2023
6 6 6 pgs order Order - Rules 16/26 Thu 01/19 1:11 PM
RULES 16/26 ORDER :Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 2/21/2023. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 1/19/2023.(fad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Required Form
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 01/10 10:14 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SUMTER COUNTY GEORGIA as to SUMTER COUNTY GEORGIA. (SHAW, HENRY)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
4 4 misc Attorney Admission Fee Met Fri 12/16 10:29 AM
Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by GREGORY O WIGGINS (nop)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2022
3 3 misc Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/15 3:58 PM
PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by RHONDA JACKSON Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # BGAMDC-4253636, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: A Danielle McBride, 800824.(WIGGINS, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
Friday, December 09, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 12/09 11:06 AM
Summons Issued as to SUMTER COUNTY GEORGIA. (mdm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 08, 2022
1 1 misc Complaint Thu 12/08 4:24 PM
COMPLAINT against SUMTER COUNTY GEORGIA Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4247787, $402 filed by RHONDA JACKSON(DOBSON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Summons to Sumter County, Georgia