California Northern District Court
Judge:William H Orrick
Case #: 3:22-cv-07781
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:77 Securities Fraud
Case Filed:Dec 08, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 06, 2023 2:22 AM PDT
Defendant
AH Capital Management, LLC
Represented By
Douglas Kent Yatter
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Benjamin Naftalis
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Matthew Rawlinson
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Benjamin A. Naftalis
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Susan E. Engel
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bain Capital Ventures (GP), LLC
Represented By
Benjamin T. Hand
Jenner & Block
contact info
Benjamin Thorman Halbig
Jenner & Block LLP
contact info
Kayvan B. Sadeghi
Jenner & Block LLP
contact info
Defendant
Compound DAO
Defendant
Gauntlet Networks, Inc.
Represented By
Ellen London
London & Stout P.C.
contact info
Vani Upadhyaya
contact info
Jason P Gottlieb
Morrison Cohen LLP
contact info
Michael A Mix
Morrison Cohen LLP
contact info
Edward P Gilbert
Morrison Cohen, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Geoffrey Hayes
Represented By
Ellen London
London & Stout P.C.
contact info
Vani Upadhyaya
contact info
Jason P Gottlieb
Morrison Cohen LLP
contact info
Michael A Mix
Morrison Cohen LLP
contact info
Edward P Gilbert
Morrison Cohen, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Robert Leshner
Represented By
Ellen London
London & Stout P.C.
contact info
Vani Upadhyaya
contact info
Jason P Gottlieb
Morrison Cohen LLP
contact info
Michael A Mix
Morrison Cohen LLP
contact info
Edward P Gilbert
Morrison Cohen, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Paradigm Operations LP
Represented By
Alexander C. Drylewski
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher Flom LLP
contact info
Peter Bradley Morrison
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher And Flom LLP
contact info
Zachary Marc Faigen
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Defendant
Polychain Alchemy, LLC
Represented By
Samuel Levander
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Roger Allen Cooper
Cleary Gottlieb Steen And Hamilton LLP
contact info
Jennifer Kennedy Park
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Jared Mitchell Gerber
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles Douglas
Represented By
Jason Seth Harrow
Gerstein Harrow LLP
contact info
Charles L Gerstein
Gerstein Harrow LLP
contact info
Jamie Crooks
Fairmark Partners, LLP
contact info
Michael Dallas Lieberman
Fairmark Partners LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan Franklin
Represented By
Jason Seth Harrow
Gerstein Harrow LLP
contact info
Charles L Gerstein
Gerstein Harrow LLP
contact info
Jamie Crooks
Fairmark Partners, LLP
contact info
Michael Dallas Lieberman
Fairmark Partners LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Amanda Houghton
Represented By
Jason Seth Harrow
Gerstein Harrow LLP
contact info
Jamie Crooks
Fairmark Partners, LLP
contact info
Michael Dallas Lieberman
Fairmark Partners LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 13 2023
ORDER APPOINTING LEAD PLAINTIFF AND LEAD COUNSEL by Judge William H. Orrick granting 47 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel. Case Management Statement due by 4/4/2023. Case Management Conference set for 4/11/2023 02:00 PM via Videoconference. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2023)
GPO Aug 20 2024
ORDER granting 171 STIPULATION to resent deadlines re: 169 MOTION to Compel. Responses due by 9/16/2024. Replies due by 10/11/2024. Motion Hearing set for 10/30/2024 02:00 PM via Videoconference before Judge William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/20/2024. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2024)
GPO Oct 08 2024
ORDER granting 188 STIPULATION to extend deadlines re: 186 MOTION for Alternative Service on the Compound DAO: Responses due by 10/22/2024 and Replies due by 10/25/2024. The hearing as to the 186 Motion for Alternative Service and 169 MOTION to Compel Arbitration is reset for 11/13/2024 02:00 PM via Videoconference before Judge William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/8/2024. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2024) Modified on 10/8/2024 to clarify that the briefing deadlines apply only to 186 Motion (jmd, COURT STAFF).
GPO Dec 26 2024
ORDER GRANTING 228 STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME WITH RESPECT TO LEAD PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF 220 MOTION FOR CHUMAN CERTIFICATION. Reply due by 12/30/2024. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/26/2024. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2024)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, March 21, 2025
246 246 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/21 2:19 PM
NOTICE by AH Capital Management, LLC of Change of Sponsoring Local Attorney (Whitworth, Morgan)
Related: [-]
245 245 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 03/21 2:17 PM
NOTICE of Change in Counsel: Attorney Matthew Rawlinson no longer representing AH Capital Management, LLC in this case (Whitworth, Morgan)
Related: [-]