Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:John M Gallagher
Case #: 5:22-cv-04873
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Dec 07, 2022
Terminated:Oct 20, 2023
Last checked: Monday Jun 05, 2023 5:00 AM EDT
Defendant
HAYM SALOMON MEMORIAL PARK
200 Moores Road
Malvern, PA 19355
Represented By
Samantha Wolfe
Scaringi & Scaringi, P.C.
contact info
ANTHONY F. ANDRISANO, JR.
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Defendant
JOSEPH LEVINE & SON MEMORIAL CHAPEL, INC.
200 Moores Road
Malvern, PA 19355
Represented By
Samantha Wolfe
Scaringi & Scaringi, P.C.
contact info
ANTHONY F. ANDRISANO, JR.
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Defendant
JOSEPH LEVINE & SON, INC.
200 Moores Road
Malvern, PA 19355
Represented By
Samantha Wolfe
Scaringi & Scaringi, P.C.
contact info
ANTHONY F. ANDRISANO, JR.
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Defendant
ADAM LEVINE
200 Moores Road
Malvern, PA 19355
Represented By
Samantha Wolfe
Scaringi & Scaringi, P.C.
contact info
ANTHONY F. ANDRISANO, JR.
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Plaintiff
CLARENCE FANNING
339 Birmingham Way
Exton, PA 19341
Represented By
M. FRANCES RYAN
Wusinich, Sweeney & Ryan, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
HUNTER MITCHELL
425 South Baumstown Road
Birdsboro, PA 19508
Represented By
M. FRANCES RYAN
Wusinich, Sweeney & Ryan, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DILLON OWAD
3206 Walnut Ridge Estates
Pottstown, PA 19464
Represented By
M. FRANCES RYAN
Wusinich, Sweeney & Ryan, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Raymond Bowman
146 Morris Avenue
Woodlyn, PA 19094
Represented By
M. FRANCES RYAN
Wusinich, Sweeney & Ryan, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, October 20, 2023
19 19 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Fri 10/20 4:22 PM
ORDER THAT THIS ACTION IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 10/20/23. 10/20/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
18 18 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 08/30 11:34 AM
AMENDED ORDER THAT MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS, IF ANY, SHALL BE FILED BY SEPTEMBER 20, 2023. RESPONSES SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN OCTOBER 4, 2023. MOTIONS AND RESPONSES SHALL BE FILED IN THE FORM PRESCRIBED IN JUDGE GALLAGHERS POLICIES AND PROCEDURES. ALL OTHER PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES IN ECF NO.16 REMAIN IN FULL FORCE AND EFFECT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 8/29/23. 8/30/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines Thu 08/31 12:08 PM
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: MOTIONS DUE BY 9/20/2023. (tjd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
17 17 minutes Status Conference Tue 06/13 2:06 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER. Status Conference held on 6/13/23. (mas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
16 16 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Wed 04/05 5:14 PM
ORDER THAT FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/10/2024 09:30 AM IN Cahn 4B BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER; STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/13/2023 10:00 AM IN Cahn 4B BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER; DISCOVERY DUE BY 8/23/2023; JURY SELECTION SET FOR 1/19/2024 09:00 AM IN Courtroom TBD BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER; MOTIONS DUE BY 5/4/2023; MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 12/20/2023; MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 9/6/2023; PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 12/13/2023; DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 12/13/2023; TRIAL DATE SET FOR 1/22/2024 09:00 AM IN Cahn 4B BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 4/5/23. 4/5/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
15 15 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 04/04 3:35 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER. Pretrial Conference held on 4/4/23. (mas)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
14 14 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 04/03 10:36 AM
AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing that the Rule 16 Conference, in the above case has been rescheduled as follows: 1. The in-person Rule 16 Conference in the above-captioned matter in Chambers before Judge John M. Gallagher on Tuesday, April 4, 2023 at 2:00 PM, (ECF No. 13) is Cancelled. 2. Lead counsel shall appear VIA TELEPHONE for a Rule 16 conference in the above-captioned matter on Tuesday, April 4, 2023 at 2:00 PM, by calling into the United States District Court located at 504 West Hamilton Street, Suite 4701, Allentown, Pennsylvania. (mas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 02/22 1:23 PM
NOTICE of Hearing that a Rule 16 Conference, in the above case has been set as follows:Lead counsel shall appear for a Rule 16 conference in the above-captioned matter on Tuesday, April 4, 2023 at 2:00 PM, at the United States District Court located at 504 West Hamilton Street, Courtroom 4B, Allentown, Pennsylvania. Counsel are required to meet and confer pursuant to Rule 26(f) and to complete and submit to the Court the Joint Rule 26(f) Report no later than Monday, March 27, 2023. The Parties are advised that the United States Magistrate Judge assigned to this Court is the Honorable Pamela A. Carlos. (mas)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2023
12 12 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 02/17 3:39 PM
ANSWER to11 Amended Complaint with affirmative defenses by HAYM SALOMON MEMORIAL PARK, JOSEPH LEVINE & SON MEMORIAL CHAPEL, INC., JOSEPH LEVINE & SON, INC., ADAM LEVINE.(ANDRISANO, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 02/03 4:34 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by CLARENCE FANNING.(RYAN, M.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, January 27, 2023
10 10 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Fri 01/27 4:16 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by JOSEPH LEVINE & SON MEMORIAL CHAPEL, INC..(ANDRISANO, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
9 9 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Fri 01/27 4:15 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by JOSEPH LEVINE & SON, INC..(ANDRISANO, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order Fri 01/20 1:54 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT IS TO FILE ITS DISCLOSURE STATEMENT2 WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. THIS ORDER ALSO SERVES AS A REMINDER TO THE PARTIES OF THEIR CONTINUING OBLIGATION PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1(B)(2) TO PROMPTLY FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT OF ANY CHANGES TO THE INFORMATION REQUIRED BY FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1(A). SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 1/20/23. 1/20/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 01/04 5:02 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against HAYM SALOMON MEMORIAL PARK, JOSEPH LEVINE & SON MEMORIAL CHAPEL, INC., JOSEPH LEVINE & SON, INC., ADAM LEVINE, filed by CLARENCE FANNING, DILLON OWAD, HUNTER MITCHELL, Raymond Bowman.(RYAN, M.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/14 11:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Wolfe on behalf of HAYM SALOMON MEMORIAL PARK, JOSEPH LEVINE & SON MEMORIAL CHAPEL, INC., JOSEPH LEVINE & SON, INC., ADAM LEVINE with Certificate of Service(Wolfe, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/13 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY F. ANDRISANO, JR on behalf of HAYM SALOMON MEMORIAL PARK, JOSEPH LEVINE & SON MEMORIAL CHAPEL, INC., JOSEPH LEVINE & SON, INC., ADAM LEVINE with Certificate of Service(ANDRISANO, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 12/13 3:40 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ADAM LEVINE, JOSEPH LEVINE & SON, INC., HAYM SALOMON MEMORIAL PARK, JOSEPH LEVINE & SON MEMORIAL CHAPEL, INC.. All Defendants. (ANDRISANO, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 08, 2022
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Thu 12/08 2:21 PM
NOTICE by CLARENCE FANNING Revised Designation Form (RYAN, M.)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 12/08 1:13 PM
Summons Issued as to HAYM SALOMON MEMORIAL PARK, JOSEPH LEVINE & SON MEMORIAL CHAPEL, INC., JOSEPH LEVINE & SON, INC., ADAM LEVINE. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 12/8/22 (JL)
Related: [-]
misc Attorney Required Forms Thu 12/08 10:29 AM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED Designation Form in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Related Case section is incomplete. The Yes/No questions have to be answered. (sbt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
1 1 COMPLAINT against HAYM SALOMON MEMORIAL PARK, JOSEPH LEVINE & SON MEMORIAL CHAPEL, INC., JOSEPH LEVINE & SON, INC., ADAM LEVINE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16358420.), filed by CLARENCE FANNING, DILLON OWAD, HUNTER MITCHELL.(RYAN, M.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form
misc Jury Demand Thu 12/08 3:18 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CLARENCE FANNING, HUNTER MITCHELL, DILLON OWAD. (JL)
Related: [-]