Ohio Southern District Court
Case #: 2:22-cr-00231
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2022
Last checked: Friday Dec 09, 2022 2:24 AM EST
Defendant
Paul Christian Welch (1)
Represented By
Kathryn S. Wallrabenstein
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
David H Thomas
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
Diane M Menashe
Ice Miller LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Michael J. Hunter
U.S. Attorneys Office
contact info

GPO Jan 11 2023
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilt be accepted as to Paul Christian Welch; Objections to R&R due by 1/25/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 1/11/23. (sh)
GPO Jan 27 2023
ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 49 Report and Recommendations on Plea of Guilty as to Paul Christian Welch (1). Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 1/27/23. (ds)

Docket last updated: 12/09/2022 4:00 AM EST
Wednesday, October 13, 2021
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Paul Christian Welch (1). (agm) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 22, 2021
Arrest of Paul Christian Welch in District of Colorado. (jr) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 26, 2021
3 3 Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Paul Christian Welch (jr) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Rule 5 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Waiver,
Att: 3 Personal Recognizance Bond,
Att: 4 Order Setting Conditions of Release,
Att: 5 Order to Appear in District Where Charges are Pending
Thursday, October 28, 2021
4 4 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Paul Christian Welch - Preliminary Hearing set for 11/10/2021 @ 2:00 PM in GoToMeeting before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 29, 2021
5 5 CJA 20 as to Paul Christian Welch: Appointment of Attorney Diane M Menashe for Paul Christian Welch Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/29/21. (jr) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 08, 2021
6 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict New date requested 12/10/2021. by USA as to Paul Christian Welch. (Hunter, Michael) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTATION ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Paul Christian Welch (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/8/21. (jr) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Paul Christian Welch Preliminary Hearing reset for 12/10/2021 11:00 AM in GoToMeeting before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 15, 2021
9 9 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Paul Christian Welch (Thomas, David) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David H Thomas appearing for Paul Christian Welch (Thomas, David) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kathryn S. Wallrabenstein appearing for Paul Christian Welch (Wallrabenstein, Kathryn) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 16, 2021
Attorney update in case as to Paul Christian Welch. Attorney Diane M Menashe terminated. (agm) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 07, 2021
12 12 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict New date requested 1/14/2022. (Second Joint Motion for Extension of Time During Which Indictment/Information Must be Filed) by USA as to Paul Christian Welch. (Hunter, Michael) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 08, 2021
13 13 NOTATION ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Paul Christian Welch (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/8/21. (jr) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
14 14 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Paul Christian Welch - Preliminary Hearing reset for 1/14/2022 11:00 AM in GoToMeeting before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
15 15 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict New date requested 2/17/2022. (Third Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Indict) by USA as to Paul Christian Welch. (Hunter, Michael) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
16 16 NOTATION ORDER granting15 Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Paul Christian Welch (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/11/22. (jr) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
17 17 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Paul Christian Welch - Preliminary Hearing RESET for 2/17/2022 11:00 AM in GoToMeeting before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 15, 2022
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Paul Christian Welch: Preliminary Hearing RE-SET for 3/17/2022 at 2:00 PM via GoToMeeting before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
18 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict New date requested 03/17/2022. by USA as to Paul Christian Welch. (Hunter, Michael) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
19 19 NOTATION ORDER granting18 Motion for Extension of Time to Indict by 3/17/2022 as to Paul Christian Welch (1). By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 2/15/2022. (agm) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
20 20 NOTATION ORDER Granting18 Joint Motion for Extension of Time until 3/17/2022 to Indict as to Paul Christian Welch. By Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 2/15/2022. (sln) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
21 21 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict New date requested 4/28/2022. (Fifth Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Indict) by USA as to Paul Christian Welch. (Hunter, Michael) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 16, 2022
22 22 NOTATION ORDER granting21 Motion for Extension of Time to Indict by 4/28/2022 as to Paul Christian Welch (1). By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 3/16/2022. (agm) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
23 23 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Paul Christian Welch Preliminary Hearing set for 4/28/2022 11:00 AM in GoToMeeting before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 25, 2022
24 24 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict New date requested 6/2/2022. (Sixth Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Indict) by USA as to Paul Christian Welch. (Hunter, Michael) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
25 25 NOTATION ORDER granting24 Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Paul Christian Welch (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/25/22. (jr) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
26 26 NOTATION ORDER as to Paul Christian Welch - The Preliminary Hearing set for 4/28/2022 is VACATED and will be reset before Judge Deavers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/26/22. (jr) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
27 27 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Paul Christian Welch. Preliminary Hearing reset to 6/2/2022 11:00 AM in Courtroom 220 - Columbus before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 26, 2022
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Paul Christian Welch: Preliminary Hearing RE-SET for 6/2/2022 01:00 PM in Courtroom 183 - Columbus before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. ***This is a time, location, and judicial officer change*** (agm) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
28 28 Seventh MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict New date requested 7/7/2022. (Seventh Joint Motion for Extension of Time) by USA as to Paul Christian Welch. (Hunter, Michael) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
29 29 NOTATION ORDER granting28 Motion for Extension of Time to Indict by 7/7/2022 as to Paul Christian Welch (1). By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 6/1/2022. (agm) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
30 30 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Paul Christian Welch - Preliminary Hearing set for 7/7/2022 11:00 AM in Courtroom 203 before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
31 31 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict New date requested 9/8/2022. by USA as to Paul Christian Welch. (Hunter, Michael) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
32 32 ORDER granting31 Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Paul Christian Welch (1). For the reasons set forth in the parties' joint motion, the Court finds that there is good cause to grant an extension of time in which to return an indictment or file an information, that the extension would best serve the interests of justice, and that the time is excludable pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(A). Accordingly, the Court GRANTS an extension until 9/8/22 to return an Indictment or Information pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/5/22. (jr) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
33 33 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Paul Christian Welch Preliminary Hearing set for 9/8/2022 02:00 PM in Courtroom 183 - Columbus before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (jr) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
34 34 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict New date requested 11/10/2022. by USA as to Paul Christian Welch. (Hunter, Michael) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
35 35 NOTATION ORDER granting34 Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Paul Christian Welch (1). For the reasons set forth in the parties joint motion, the Court finds that there is good cause to grant an extension of time in which to return an indictment or file an information, that the extension would best serve the interests of justice, and that the time is excludable pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(A). Accordingly, the Court GRANTS an extension until 11/10/2022 to return an Indictment or Information pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161(b). By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 9/7/2022. (agm) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 08, 2022
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Paul Christian Welch. Preliminary Hearing set for 11/10/2022 01:00 PM in Courtroom 220 - Columbus before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
NOTICE OF CHANGE IN HEARING as to Paul Christian Welch. Preliminary Hearing reset for 12/8/2022 01:30 PM in Courtroom 183 - Columbus before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (Previously set for 11/10/2022.) (sln) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
36 36 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict New date requested 12/8/2022. by USA as to Paul Christian Welch. (Hunter, Michael) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
37 37 Notation ORDER : The Court hereby finds that there is good cause shown to grant an extension of time to return an Indictment or file an Information, that the extension would best serve the interests of justice and that the time would be excludable pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(7)(A). Accordingly, the Court hereby GRANTS an extension where an Indictment or Information may be filed pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3161(b). By Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 11/9/2022. (sln) [2:21-mj-00666-CMV]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
38 38 INFORMATION as to Paul Christian Welch (1) count(s) 1. (ds)
Related: [-]
39 39 PLEA AGREEMENT as to Paul Christian Welch. (ds)
Related: [-]