Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 3:22-cr-00465
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2022
Last checked: Friday Dec 09, 2022 1:51 AM CST
Defendant
Francisco Ramon Puente (1)
Represented By
Brady T Wyatt, III
Law Office Of Brady Wyatt
contact info
Defendant
Tony J West (2)
Represented By
Amanda Fisher Moore
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
John Kull-DOJ
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Mar 21 2023
Report and Recommendation on Guilty Plea as to Tony J West. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 3/21/2023) (mcrd)
GPO Apr 05 2023
Order Accepting Re: 65 Report and Recommendation on Guilty Plea as to Tony J West. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 4/5/2023) (ndt)
GPO Jan 23 2024
Report and Recommendation on Guilty Plea as to Ever Uriel Gomez-Garcia. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 1/23/2024) (kaf)
GPO Feb 13 2024
Order Accepting 133 Report and Recommendation on Guilty Plea as to Ever Uriel Gomez-Garcia. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 2/13/2024) (cfk)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 2:09 AM CDT
Monday, November 14, 2022
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Francisco Ramon Puente (1). (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until the defendant has been arrested/appeared.)In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (mcrd) [3:22-mj-01061-BN]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION for Pretrial Detention and Continuance of Detention Hearingfiled by USA as to Francisco Ramon Puente. (mcrd) [3:22-mj-01061-BN]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
4 4 ELECTRONIC ORDER As to Francisco Ramon Puente: by this order -- issued to the prosecution and defense counsel -- the court confirms the disclosure obligation of the prosecutor under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and the possible consequences of violating such order under applicable law. This written order is entered pursuant to Rule 5(f)(1) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, and is in addition to the oral order entered by the court on the first scheduled court date when both the prosecutor and defense counsel were present. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/16/2022) (mcrd) [3:22-mj-01061-BN]
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David L. Horan: Initial Appearance as to Francisco Ramon Puente held on 11/16/2022. Date of Arrest: 11/16/2022. The judge issued the oral order required by Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)(1). Written order to follow. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Dimitri Rocha; Defense - Brady Wyatt. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :04. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (Interpreter N/A.) (mcrd) [3:22-mj-01061-BN]
Related: [-]
6 6 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Francisco Ramon Puente. (mcrd) [3:22-mj-01061-BN]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brady T Wyatt, III appearing for Francisco Ramon Puente (If sealed documents that you are authorized to see were previously filed by U.S. Pretrial Services or U.S. Probation, you will require assistance to gain access to them and any related filings. Please call the clerk at 214.753.2240 during business hours to request access.) (mcrd) [3:22-mj-01061-BN]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Francisco Ramon Puente:. PC and Detention Hearing set for 11/21/2022 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1561, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Magistrate Judge David L. Horan. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/16/2022) (mcrd) [3:22-mj-01061-BN]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
9 9 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 11/10/22 as to Francisco Ramon Puente. (mcrd) [3:22-mj-01061-BN]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
1 1 5 pgs SEALED COMPLAINT as to Tony J West (1). (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until the defendant has been arrested/appeared.)In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (mcrd) [3:22-mj-01086-BN]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION for Pretrial Detention and Continuance of Detention Hearing filed by USA as to Tony J West. (mcrd) [3:22-mj-01086-BN]
Related: [-]
10 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David L. Horan: Preliminary and Detention Hearing as to Francisco Ramon Puente held on 11/21/2022. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Michelle Winters; Defense - Brady Wyatt. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :01. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (Interpreter N/A.) (mcrd) [3:22-mj-01061-BN]
Related: [-]
11 11 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Francisco Ramon Puente: The defendant has been charged with a felony offense in a criminal complaint filed in this court. At a proceeding held on 11/21/2022 before Magistrate Judge David Horan, at which the defendant appeared in person and represented by counsel, the Magistrate Judge informed the defendant of the right to a preliminary hearing under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5 and explained that a preliminary hearing is a hearing before the judge where the government must establish probable cause to believe the charges contained in the complaint. The defendant represented that he had discussed this right to a preliminary hearing with counsel, that the defendant understood this right, and that the defendant wanted to waive the right to a preliminary hearing. The Magistrate Judge found the defendant's waiver was knowing and voluntary, and, based on that waiver, the Magistrate Judge found probable cause to believe the charges contained in the complaint. (mcrd) [3:22-mj-01061-BN]
Related: [-]
12 12 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Francisco Ramon Puente: The defendant has been charged with a felony offense in a criminal complaint filed in this court, and the government filed a motion for detention. At a proceeding held on 11/21/2022 before Magistrate Judge David Horan, at which the defendant appeared in person and represented by counsel, the defendant stated he had discussed his right to a detention hearing with counsel, that the defendant understood this right, and that he wanted to waive the right to a detention hearing while reserving the right to request a hearing on any basis permitted by the Bail Reform Act. The defendant represented that he understood that waiving the right to a detention hearing would mean he would be ordered into custody while this case is pending. The Magistrate Judge found the defendant's waiver subject to the reservation of rights was knowing and voluntary, and, based on that waiver and subject to the reservation of rights, the Magistrate Judge entered an order of detention. (mcrd) [3:22-mj-01061-BN]
Related: [-]
13 13 DETENTION ORDER as to Francisco Ramon Puente (1). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/21/2022) (mcrd) Modified on 11/22/2022 (mcrd). [3:22-mj-01061-BN]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
4 4 ELECTRONIC ORDER As to Tony J West: by this order -- issued to the prosecution and defense counsel -- the court confirms the disclosure obligation of the prosecutor under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and the possible consequences of violating such order under applicable law. This written order is entered pursuant to Rule 5(f)(1) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, and is in addition to the oral order entered by the court on the first scheduled court date when both the prosecutor and defense counsel were present. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/23/2022) (mcrd) [3:22-mj-01086-BN]
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David L. Horan: Initial Appearance as to Tony J West held on 11/23/2022. Date of Arrest: 11/23/2022. The judge issued the oral order required by Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)(1). Written order to follow. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Michelle Winters; Defense - Amanda Moore. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :04. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (Interpreter N/A.) (mcrd) [3:22-mj-01086-BN]
Related: [-]
6 6 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Tony J West. (mcrd) [3:22-mj-01086-BN]
Related: [-]
7 7 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Amanda Fisher Moore for Tony J West appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/23/2022) (mcrd) [3:22-mj-01086-BN]
Related: [-]
8 8 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Tony J West: The defendant has been charged with a felony offense in a criminal complaint filed in this court. At a proceeding held on 11/23/2022 before Magistrate Judge David Horan, at which the defendant appeared in person and represented by counsel, the Magistrate Judge informed the defendant of the right to a preliminary hearing under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5 and explained that a preliminary hearing is a hearing before the judge where the government must establish probable cause to believe the charges contained in the complaint. The defendant represented that he had discussed this right to a preliminary hearing with counsel, that the defendant understood this right, and that the defendant wanted to waive the right to a preliminary hearing. The Magistrate Judge found the defendant's waiver was knowing and voluntary, and, based on that waiver, the Magistrate Judge found probable cause to believe the charges contained in the complaint. (mcrd) [3:22-mj-01086-BN]
Related: [-]
9 9 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Tony J West: The defendant has been charged with a felony offense in a criminal complaint filed in this court, and the government filed a motion for detention. At a proceeding held on 11/23/2022 before Magistrate Judge David Horan, at which the defendant appeared in person and represented by counsel, the defendant stated he had discussed his right to a detention hearing with counsel, that the defendant understood this right, and that he wanted to waive the right to a detention hearing while reserving the right to request a hearing on any basis permitted by the Bail Reform Act or if he is released from state custody. The defendant represented that he understood that waiving the right to a detention hearing would mean he would be ordered into custody while this case is pending. The Magistrate Judge found the defendant's waiver subject to the reservation of rights was knowing and voluntary, and, based on that waiver and subject to the reservation of rights, the Magistrate Judge entered an order of detention. (mcrd) [3:22-mj-01086-BN]
Related: [-]
10 10 DETENTION ORDER as to Tony J West (1). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/23/2022) (mcrd) [3:22-mj-01086-BN]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
Indictment Unsealed as to Francisco Ramon Puente, Tony J West. (ykp)
Related: [-]
14 14 SEALED INDICTMENT with Forfeiture Notice as to Francisco Ramon Puente (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Tony J West (2) count(s) 1, 4, Fidencio Gonzales (3) count(s) 1, 4, Frank Jose Alvarado, Jr (4) count(s) 1. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (ykp)
Related: [-]