Indiana Northern District Court
Case #: 3:22-cr-00077
Case Filed:Nov 09, 2022
Last checked: Friday Dec 09, 2022 2:46 AM EST
Defendant
Opediah Barnett (1)
Represented By
Scott J Frankel - FCD
Federal Community Defenders Inc - Sb/in
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
John M Maciejczyk - AUSA
Us Attorney'S Office - Sb/in
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/17/2023 8:33 PM EST
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
1 1 7 pgs UNSEALED INDICTMENT as to Opediah Barnett (1) count(s) 1-2, 3, 4. (rmc) (rmc). Modified on 11/15/2022 (rmc).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (11/10/2022) Restricted ink signature
2 2 MOTION to Seal Indictment by United States of America as to Opediah Barnett. (rmc) (rmc).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (11/10/2022) Restricted ink signature
3 3 ORDER granting2 Motion to Seal Case as to Opediah Barnett (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 11/9/2022. (rmc)
Related: [-]