Frishberg v. Celsius Network LLC et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10964
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10964
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Martin Glenn |
Case #: | 1:22-ap-01179 |
Nature of Suit | 11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Dec 09, 2022 |
Terminated: | Feb 05, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Celsius Network LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Celsius Keyfi LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Celsius Mining LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Celsius Network Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Celsius Network Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Celsius Networks Lending LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Celsius US Holding LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Frishberg
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 64 minutes ago |
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 02/05 10:53 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1179 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Anderson, Deanna) |
||
Friday, February 02, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice, Dismissal
Mon 02/05 9:29 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Complaint filed by Daniel Frishberg. (Bush, Brent) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2023 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Affidavit of Service
Tue 06/20 7:15 PM
Affidavit of Service re: Joint Stipulation and Agreed Order by and Among the Debtors, Daniel Frishberg and Immanuel Herrmann Staying Deadlines (Docket No. 34) filed by Stretto.(Klamser, Robert) |
|
35 | 35
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Tue 06/20 1:55 PM
Joint Stipulation and Agreed Order, Signed on 6/20/2023, By and Among the Debtors, Daniel Frishberg and Immanuel Herrmann Staying Deadlines. (Anderson, Deanna) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2023 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Stipulation
Fri 06/16 7:24 PM
Stipulation / Joint Stipulation and Agreed Order by and among the Debtors, Daniel Frishberg and Immanuel Herman Staying Deadlines Filed by Joshua Sussberg on behalf of Celsius Network LLC. (Sussberg, Joshua) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
67
pgs
misc
Transcript
Thu 06/15 9:01 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 05/17/2023 At 10:00 AM RE: Pre-Trial Conference. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 9/13/2023. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 6/22/2023. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 7/6/2023. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 7/17/2023. Transcript access will be restricted through 9/13/2023. (Ramos, Jonathan) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Affidavit of Service
Tue 05/23 6:20 PM
Affidavit of Service re: Joint Stipulation and Agreed Order by and Among the Debtors, Daniel Frishberg and Immanuel Herrmann Staying Deadlines (Docket No. 30) filed by Stretto.(Klamser, Robert) |
|
31 | 31
misc
Affidavit of Service
Tue 05/23 6:17 PM
Affidavit of Service re: Joint Stipulation and Agreed Order by and Among the Debtors, Daniel Frishberg and Immanuel Herrmann Staying Deadlines (Docket No. 28) filed by Stretto.(Klamser, Robert) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Fri 05/19 9:38 AM
Joint Stipulation and Agreed Order by and Among the Debtors, Daniel Frishberg and Immanuel Herrmann Staying Deadline Signed on 5/19/2023. (Anderson, Deanna) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 05/18 6:53 PM
Affidavit of Service re: Notice Of Status Conference (Docket No. 27) filed by Stretto.(Klamser, Robert) |
|
28 | 28
misc
Stipulation
Thu 05/18 2:33 PM
Stipulation / Joint Stipulation and Agreed Order by and Among the Debtors, Daniel Frishberg and Immanuel Herrmann Staying Deadline Filed by Joshua Sussberg on behalf of Celsius Network LLC. (Sussberg, Joshua) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice, Hearing
Mon 05/15 10:29 AM
Notice of Hearing / Notice of Status Conference filed by Joshua Sussberg on behalf of Celsius Network LLC. with hearing to be held on 5/17/2023 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG) (Sussberg, Joshua) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Tue 05/02 2:16 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing filed by Joshua Sussberg on behalf of Celsius Network LLC. with hearing to be held on 6/28/2023 (check with court for location) (Sussberg, Joshua) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Affidavit of Service
Tue 04/25 6:44 PM
Affidavit of Service re: Joint Stipulation and Agreed Order by and Among the Debtors, Daniel Frishberg and Immanuel Herrmann Staying Deadlines (Docket No. 24) filed by Stretto.(Klamser, Robert) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Fri 04/21 2:12 PM
Joint Stipulation and Agreed Order signed on 4/21/2023 By and Among the Debtors, Daniel Frishberg and Immanuel Herrmann Staying Deadlines. (Anderson, Deanna) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Affidavit of Service
Tue 04/18 9:53 PM
Affidavit of Service re: Joint Stipulation and Agreed Order by and Among the Debtors, Daniel Frishberg and Immanuel Herrmann Staying Deadlines (Docket No. 22) filed by Stretto.(Klamser, Robert) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Stipulation
Mon 04/17 2:29 PM
Stipulation / Joint Stipulation and Agreed Order By and Among the Debtors, Daniel Frishberg and Immanuel Herrmann Staying Deadlines Filed by Joshua Sussberg on behalf of Celsius Network LLC. (Sussberg, Joshua) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Tue 03/14 1:20 PM
Joint Stipulation and Agreed Order, Signed on 3/14/2023, by and Among the Debtors and Daniel Frishberg Regarding Debtors' Time to Respond to Mr. Frishberg's Complaint. (Anderson, Deanna) |
|
20 | 20
62
pgs
misc
Transcript
Tue 03/14 8:57 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 3/8/2023 at 11:02am RE: Pre-Trial Conference. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 6/12/2023. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 3/21/2023. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 4/4/2023. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 4/14/2023. Transcript access will be restricted through 6/12/2023. (Garcia, Pedro) |
|
Saturday, March 11, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 03/13 10:56 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Daniel Frishberg. (Suarez, Aurea) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 03/10 10:02 AM
Amended Complaint against all defendants Filed by Daniel Frishberg. (Suarez, Aurea) |
|
17 | 17
ans
Statement
Fri 03/10 9:54 AM
Statement /Demand For Trial By Jury Under Rule 38 filed by Daniel Frishberg. (Suarez, Aurea) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Wed 03/08 3:56 PM
SECOND Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/17/2023 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG), Answer due by 4/7/2023, (Porter, Minnie) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Letter
Wed 03/08 8:32 AM
Letter Requesting Second Summons Filed by Daniel Frishberg. (Porter, Minnie) |
|
Sunday, March 05, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Certificate of Mailing PDF notice
Mon 03/06 12:09 AM
Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 03/05/2023. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 03, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
misc
PDF Notice
Fri 03/03 3:23 PM
Notice RE: Order Waiving Filing Fee (Anderson, Deanna) |
|
12 | 12
order
~Generic~ Order
Fri 03/03 3:21 PM
Order Signed on 3/3/2023 Waiving Filing Fee. (Anderson, Deanna) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Under Seal Document
Fri 02/17 3:21 PM
Document Under Seal Per Court Order . Financial Information for Daniel Frishberg Filed by Daniel Frishberg. (Acosta, Annya) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order, Seal
Fri 02/17 1:52 PM
Order, Signed on 2/17/2023, Granting Request to Seal Financial Information. |
|
9 | 9
124
pgs
misc
Transcript
Fri 02/17 7:13 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 2/15/2023 at 10:14am RE: Pretrial Conference. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 5/18/2023. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 2/24/2023. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 3/10/2023. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 3/20/2023. Transcript access will be restricted through 5/18/2023. (Garcia, Pedro) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Wed 02/15 10:04 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing filed by Joshua Sussberg on behalf of Celsius Keyfi LLC, Celsius Mining LLC, Celsius Network Inc., Celsius Network LLC, Celsius Network Limited, Celsius Networks Lending LLC, Celsius US Holding LLC. with hearing to be held on 3/8/2023 (check with court for location) (Sussberg, Joshua) |
|
Sunday, February 12, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Mailing PDF notice
Mon 02/13 12:08 AM
Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 02/12/2023. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order, Show Cause (Will Generate PDF Notice to BNC)
Fri 02/10 8:05 AM
Order to Show Cause signed on 2/10/2023 Why the Action Should not be Dismissed for Failure to Pay the Filing Fee. (Anderson, Deanna) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment
Wed 02/01 10:26 AM
Notice of Proposed Order /Proposed Joint Stipulation Extending Debtors' Deadline to respond to the forthcoming Amended Adversary Complaint to 45 days following the filing of the Amended Adversary Complaint. filed by Daniel Frishberg. (Suarez, Aurea) |
|
Friday, December 23, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order RE: Motion to Allow
Fri 12/23 10:28 AM
Order, Signed on 12/23/2022, Denying Motion Seeking a Waiver of the Filing Fee for Adversary Proceeding Complaint . (Anderson, Deanna) |
|
Thursday, December 22, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Motion to Allow
Thu 12/22 4:49 PM
Motion to Allow /Motion to Waive Filing Fee filed by Daniel Frishberg. (Suarez, Aurea) |
|
Friday, December 16, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Fri 12/16 3:12 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/24/2023 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG), Answer due by 1/17/2023, (Porter, Minnie) |
|
Friday, December 09, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Fri 12/09 8:34 AM
Adversary case 22-01179 Complaint against Celsius Network LLC, Celsius Keyfi LLC, Celsius Mining LLC, Celsius Network Inc., Celsius Network Limited, Celsius Networks Lending LLC, Celsius US Holding LLC (Fee Amount $ 350.) . Nature(s) of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Daniel Frishberg. (Porter, Minnie) |