Connecticut District Court
Judge:Robert M Spector
Referred: Thomas O Farrish
Case #: 3:22-cv-01570
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Dec 10, 2022
Terminated:Apr 30, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jun 08, 2023 4:46 AM EDT
Defendant
Greater Bridgeport Transit / ATU-1336 Pension Plan
Represented By
Francis D. Burke
Mangines & Burke
contact info
Plaintiff
Markeya Hall
56 Essex Avenue
Waterbury, CT 06704
Represented By
James C. Riley
Whitman, Breed, Abbott & Morgan Llc - Ct
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
notice Judicial Evaluation Program Survey Tue 04/30 11:58 AM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Langello, N)
Related: [-]