Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:22-cv-24534
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Dec 12, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Jun 10, 2023 6:15 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
DENIS RONALD MUJUNI
Represented By
TAYLOR CHRISTOPHER BARTLETT
Heninger Garrison Davis Llc - Birmingham Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
misc Docket Annotation Tue 12/13 9:47 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Filer - For future reference: regarding Complaint filed against, "All Defendants" in the docket text. For reporting purposes when filing the complaint please choose the one defendant listed on the Complaint, 3M COMPANY. (no action needs to be taken) (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2022
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Mon 12/12 6:59 AM
NOTICE of Designated Forum - District of Minnesota by DENIS RONALD MUJUNI (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 12/12 6:58 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/12 6:57 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7596349.), filed by DENIS RONALD MUJUNI. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]