MUKISA v. 3M COMPANY
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Hope T Cannon |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-24570 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Dec 12, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 10, 2023 5:21 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
|
Plaintiff
JOSEPH JACKSON MUKISA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, December 13, 2022 | ||
5 | 5 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The wrong pdf is attached. Refile with the correct document. Re3 NOTICE OF DESIGNATED FORUM filed by JOSEPH JACKSON MUKISA (djb) | |
4 | 4 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Filer - For future reference: regarding Complaint filed against, "All Defendants" in the docket text. For reporting purposes when filing the complaint please choose the one defendant listed on the Complaint, 3M COMPANY. (no action needs to be taken) (djb) | |
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 12/13 9:47 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Filer - For future reference: regarding Complaint filed against, "All Defendants" in the docket text. For reporting purposes when filing the complaint please choose the one defendant listed on the Complaint, 3M COMPANY. (no action needs to be taken) (djb) |
||
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 12/13 11:05 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The wrong pdf is attached. Refile with the correct document. Re3 NOTICE OF DESIGNATED FORUM filed by JOSEPH JACKSON MUKISA (djb) |
||
Monday, December 12, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Mon 12/12 12:05 PM
NOTICE of Designated Forum - District of Minnesota by JOSEPH JACKSON MUKISA (BARTLETT, TAYLOR) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 12/12 12:05 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 12/12 12:04 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7597097.), filed by JOSEPH JACKSON MUKISA. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR) |