Idaho District Court
Judge:Amanda K Brailsford
Case #: 2:22-cv-00500
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Dec 12, 2022
Terminated:Oct 19, 2023
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 5:24 PM MDT
Defendant
Dirt Kart, Inc.
Plaintiff
Joshua M Burzynski
904 E Singing Hills Dr
Post Falls, ID 83854

GPO May 12 2023
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment (Dkt. 11) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Any renewed motion for default judgment must be supported by argument and evidence as specified inthis Order. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)

Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Thursday, October 19, 2023
16 16 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 10/19 9:04 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE - IT IS ORDERED this matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is directed to close this case and to mail a copy of this order to Burzynski. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
15 15 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 09/06 4:14 PM
NOTICE OF PROSPECTIVE DISMISSAL - ACCORDINGLY, if no action is taken in this case by October 6, 2023, the Court will dismiss the case with prejudice for lack of prosecution, without further notice. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this notice to Burzynski. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
14 14 order Order Reassigning Case Mon 06/05 9:59 PM
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE AND NOTICE OF CASE NUMBER CHANGE. Due to the appointment of United States District Judge Amanda K. Brailsford, this case is hereby reassigned to United States District Judge Amanda K. Brailsford. Judge B Lynn Winmill is no longer assigned to case. Please use case number 2:22-cv-500-AKB on all future pleadings. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (km)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2023
13 13 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Entry of Default Fri 05/12 1:44 PM
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment (Dkt.11 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Any renewed motion for default judgment must be supported by argument and evidence as specified inthis Order. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
12 12 2 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 04/27 3:57 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge B Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (hs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
11 11 motion Entry of Default Wed 04/05 8:48 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Joshua M Burzynski. Responses due by 4/26/2023 (lm) (Main Document 11 replaced on 4/5/2023) (lm)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
10 10 order Clerks Entry of Default Mon 04/03 9:13 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Dirt Kart, Inc. re9 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Joshua M Burzynski. Mailed to the Plaintiff; Joshua M Burzynski 904 E Singing Hills Dr Post Falls, ID 83854 and defendant Brycen Tarr, 5208 W. Decatur Ave, Spokane WA, 99208 (lm) [9:25 AM] Laura McInnes Brycen Tarr, 5208 W. Decatur Ave, Spokane WA, 99208 PLease (lm) Modified on 4/3/2023 (lm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
9 9 motion Entry of Default Fri 03/31 3:27 PM
REQUEST for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Joshua M Burzynski. Responses due by 4/21/2023 (lm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 02/21 2:44 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua M Burzynski. Dirt Kart, Inc. served on 2/13/2023, answer due 3/6/2023. (lm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 02, 2023
7 7 service Summons Reissued Thu 02/02 1:44 PM
Summons Reissued as to Dirt Kart, Inc.. (lm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
6 6 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Tue 01/24 12:15 PM
ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT - ACCORDINGLY, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs Request for Entry of Default (Dkt.4 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2023
5 5 misc Supplement Mon 01/23 3:47 PM
Proof of Service by Plaintiff Joshua M Burzynski re3 Summons Returned Executed. (lm)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Default Judgment Mon 01/23 3:24 PM
Request to Enter Default Judgment as to by Plaintiff Joshua M Burzynski. Responses due by 2/13/2023(lm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 12/13 3:53 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua M Burzynski. Dirt Kart, Inc. served on 12/12/2022, answer due 1/3/2023. (lm)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 12/12 3:27 PM
Summons Issued as to Dirt Kart, Inc.. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/12 3:27 PM
COMPLAINT against Dirt Kart, Inc. Summons Issued, filed by Joshua M Burzynski.(alw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet