Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:22-cv-24737
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Jun 11, 2023 4:50 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
WILLIAM NIX
Represented By
TAYLOR CHRISTOPHER BARTLETT
Heninger Garrison Davis Llc - Birmingham Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 26 minutes ago
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
4 4 2 pgs order Order Thu 02/02 9:07 AM
ORDER - Despite the Court's warnings, the 609 plaintiffs identified in Exhibits A and B have more than one case filed on the active docket. The law firms representing these plaintiffs are directed to confer with one another and move to dismiss the case that is deemed to be the duplicate case within 21 days of the date of this Order. To the extent the law firms fail to dismiss the duplicate case by the deadline, the Court will dismiss the later filed case. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/1/2023. (djb) Modified on 2/2/2023 (djb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 12/13 12:34 PM
NOTICE of Designated Forum - Kentucky Western by WILLIAM NIX (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 12/13 12:33 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/13 12:33 PM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7599445.), filed by WILLIAM NIX. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]