New Jersey District Court
Judge:Madeline Cox Arleo
Referred: Andre M Espinosa
Case #: 2:22-cv-07258
Nature of Suit160 Contract - Stockholders’ Suits
Cause28:1332 - Diversity: Securities Fraud
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2022
Terminated:Mar 21, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Jun 11, 2023 6:25 AM EDT
Defendant
MARK L KAY
Represented By
JONATHAN M. KORN
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info
Defendant
ROMARAO PEMMARAJU
Represented By
JONATHAN M. KORN
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info
Defendant
GEORGE WALLER
Represented By
JONATHAN M. KORN
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info
Defendant
ZERIFY, INC.
Represented By
ROBERT JAMES CAHALL
Mccormick & Priore, P.C.
contact info
Notice Only
PHV ANDREW T. HAMBELTON
Notice Only
PHV JESSICA HERMES
Notice Only
PHV DANIEL E. RHYNHART
Notice Only
PHV ROBERT SCHACTER
Notice Only
PHV JUSTIN M. TARSHIS
Notice Only
PHV ELIZABETH V. YOUNG
Plaintiff
COSTANTINO ZANFARDINO
Represented By
PETER S. PEARLMAN
Cohn, Lifland, Pearlman, Herrmann & Knopf, LLP
contact info
MATTHEW F. GATELY
Cohn, Lifland, Pearlman, Herrmann & Knopf LLP
contact info

GPO Nov 28 2023
OPINION. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 11/28/2023. (ld)

Docket last updated: 90 minutes ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
59 59 service Certificate of Service Fri 05/16 1:57 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re58 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion (GATELY, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
58 58 11 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition of Motion Fri 05/16 1:52 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re55 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (GATELY, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
57 57 misc Letter Fri 05/16 12:54 PM
Letter from Igor Konstankevich, Esq.. (KONSTANKEVICH, IGOR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
56 56 order Text Order Wed 05/14 5:41 PM
TEXT ORDER - The Court has reviewed the May 9, 2025 motion to withdraw as attorney, filed by counsel for Defendant Zerify, Inc. ("Defendant"). [D.E.55 ]. On or before May 19, 2025, Defense Counsel shall submit for in camera review a supplemental declaration that provides more detail about Defendant's current unpaid balance to AME_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is reminded that he shall continue in his role unless and until relieved by the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 5/14/2025. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
55 55 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 05/09 3:38 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ZERIFY, INC.. (CAHALL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]