Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Douglas R Cole
Case #: 1:22-cv-00746
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2022
Terminated:Nov 21, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jun 11, 2023 6:14 AM EDT
Defendant
Rapid Mortgage Funding, Inc.
30700 Telegraph Road Suite 4600
Bingham Farms, MI 48025
Represented By
Jaci L. Overmann
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Arlene Levine Boruchowitz
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Plaintiff
Rapid Mortgage Company
7870 E. Kemper Road Suite 280
Cincinnati, OH 45249
Represented By
Nicole Marie Lundrigan
The Lundrigan Law Group Co., Lpa
contact info
William Kelly Lundrigan
Lundrigan Law Group Co., Lpa
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, November 21, 2024
21 21 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment Thu 11/21 4:04 PM
CONSENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 11/21/24. (sct)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Trademark Settlement and Coexistence Agreement
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
20 20 motion Approve Consent Judgment Tue 11/19 11:13 AM
Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by Plaintiff Rapid Mortgage Company, Defendant Rapid Mortgage Funding, Inc.. (Boruchowitz, Arlene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent Order
Friday, August 09, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 08/09 4:45 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting17 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Expert and Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 11/11/24. Dispositive motions due by 12/9/24. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 8/9/24. (sct)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
19 19 discov Notice to Take Deposition Tue 08/06 3:24 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Rule 30(b)(6) of Rapid Mortgage Funding by Plaintiff Rapid Mortgage Company. (Lundrigan, Nicole)
Related: [-]
18 18 discov Notice to Take Deposition Tue 08/06 3:23 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jonathan Denha by Plaintiff Rapid Mortgage Company. (Lundrigan, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
17 17 motion Extension of Time Mon 08/05 11:25 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 11/11/2024. Motion to Extend Discovery and Dispostive Motion Deadlines by Plaintiff Rapid Mortgage Company. (Lundrigan, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
16 16 order Cincinnati Preliminary Pretrial Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 04/19 1:20 PM
AMENDED CALENDAR ORDER: Plaintiff Primary Experts due by 5/14/24. Defendant Primary Experts due by 6/14/24. Rebuttal Experts due by 7/14/24. Discovery due by 8/13/24. Dispositive motions due by 9/10/24. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 4/19/24. (sct)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
15 15 motion Extension of Time Wed 04/17 9:52 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 5/14/2024. Unopposed Motion to Extend Expert and Discovery Deadlines by Plaintiff Rapid Mortgage Company. (Lundrigan, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 04/05 1:19 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting14 Attorney Jaci L. Overmann's Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant Rapid Mortgage Funding, Inc. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 4/5/24. (sct)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
14 14 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 04/04 8:56 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Rapid Mortgage Funding, Inc.. (Overmann, Jaci)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 12, 2023
13 13 order Cincinnati Preliminary Pretrial Order Thu 10/12 5:56 PM
CALENDAR ORDER: Initial Disclosures due by 10/13/23. Motions directed to pleadings due by 11/30/23. Motions to amend the pleadings and/or add to add additional parties due by 11/30/23. Lay Witnesses due by 1/12/24. Plaintiff Primary Experts due by 4/14/24. Defendant Primary Experts due by 5/15/24. Rebuttal Experts due by 6/14/24. Discovery due by 7/14/24. Dispositive motions due by 8/11/24. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 10/12/23. (sct)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
minutes Telephone Conference Fri 05/26 12:02 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Douglas R. Cole: Telephone Status Conference held on 5/26/23. Nicole Lundrigan appeared for Plaintiff; Jaci Overmann appeared for Defendant. The parties advised the Court that they are still engaged in settlement negotiations and requested the Court to enter a calendar order. The Court directed counsel to confer and email updated dates to chambers. The Court will then enter a Calendar Order. (sct)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
minutes Telephone Conference Fri 04/28 2:45 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Douglas R. Cole: Preliminary Pretrial Conference by telephone held on 4/28/23. Nicole Lundrigan appeared for Plaintiff; Jaci Overmann appeared for Defendant. The parties advised the Court that they are engaged in settlement negotiations. Telephone Status Conference set for 5/26/23 at 11:00 a.m. (sct)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2023
12 12 misc Rule 26(f) Report Fri 04/21 10:46 AM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Rapid Mortgage Company. (Lundrigan, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/15 3:55 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Rapid Mortgage Funding, Inc.. (Overmann, Jaci)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/15 3:51 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Rapid Mortgage Funding, Inc.. (Overmann, Jaci)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/15 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Arlene Levine Boruchowitz for Defendant Rapid Mortgage Funding, Inc. (Boruchowitz, Arlene)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/15 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jaci L. Overmann for Defendant Rapid Mortgage Funding, Inc. (Overmann, Jaci)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 12/14 10:26 AM
Summons Issued as to Rapid Mortgage Funding, Inc., and Rapid Mortgage Funding, Inc. c/o Incorp. Services, Inc. Statutory Agent. (kh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Wed 12/14 9:54 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Rapid Mortgage Company Civil Cover Sheet (Lundrigan, Nicole)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Wed 12/14 8:40 AM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (eh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 12/13 4:35 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Lundrigan, Nicole)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 12/13 4:34 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Lundrigan, Nicole)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 12/13 4:27 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Rapid Mortgage Company. (Lundrigan, Nicole)
Related: [-]
1 1 21 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 12/13 4:22 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Rapid Mortgage Funding, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9179994), filed by Rapid Mortgage Company. (Lundrigan, Nicole)
Related: [-]