North Carolina Middle District Court
Judge:Thomas D Schroeder
Referred: Joe L Webster
Case #: 1:22-cv-01075
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Dec 12, 2022
Terminated:Nov 08, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Jun 10, 2023 6:03 AM EDT
Defendant
GM FINANCIAL
Defendant
SOUTH CHARLOTTE CHEVROLET
Plaintiff
DONOVAN ALEXANDER PEOPLES
1249 PINEY CHURCH ROAD
CONCORD, NC 28025


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
9 9 order Judgment Wed 11/08 12:23 PM
JUDGMENT signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 11/08/2023, that the complaint in this action is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. (Bowers, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
utility Case Referred to Judge Mon 11/06 2:36 PM
CASE REFERRED RE:7 RECOMMENDED RULING - MAGISTRATE JUDGE re2 Complaint filed by DONOVAN ALEXANDER PEOPLES to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. (Marsh, Keah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Mailing Recommendation Thu 10/12 12:28 PM
Notice of Mailing Recommendation: Objections to R&R due by 10/26/2023. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 10/30/2023. (Garland, Leah)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Recommended Ruling - Magistrate Judge Thu 10/12 12:25 PM
ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 10/11/2023, that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entry of this Order and Recommendation. IT IS RECOMMENDED that the Complaint be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. (Garland, Leah)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Application to Proceed IFP Thu 10/12 12:26 PM
ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 10/11/2023, that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entry of this Order and Recommendation. (Garland, Leah)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
utility Case Assigned Fri 12/16 8:59 AM
Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Sheets, Jamie)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Fri 12/16 9:30 AM
Motions Referred to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER RE:1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP. (Sheets, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2022
6 6 notice Notice - Other Tue 12/13 2:14 PM
NOTICE OF CIVIL ACTION TO GM FINANCIAL by DONOVAN ALEXANDER PEOPLES. (Carter, Alexus)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits
5 5 notice Notice - Other Tue 12/13 2:13 PM
NOTICE OF FAULT AFFIDAVIT OF TRUTH by DONOVAN ALEXANDER PEOPLES. (Carter, Alexus)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice - Other Tue 12/13 2:03 PM
NOTICE OF CIVIL ACTION to SOUTH CHARLOTTE CHEVROLET by DONOVAN ALEXANDER PEOPLES. (Carter, Alexus)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 12/13 2:02 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Carter, Alexus)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Tue 12/13 1:51 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by DONOVAN ALEXANDER PEOPLES. (Carter, Alexus)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Application to Proceed IFP Tue 12/13 1:51 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by DONOVAN ALEXANDER PEOPLES. (Carter, Alexus) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/13/2022 to correct attachment.) (Carter, Alexus)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope - Front and Back