California Northern District Court
Judge:Haywood S Gilliam, Jr
Case #: 3:22-cv-08863
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Dec 14, 2022
Last checked: Monday Jun 12, 2023 4:01 AM PDT
Defendant
DSSV, Inc.
Represented By
John David Ellis
Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Sinclaire Parer
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Amanda E. Beckwith
Sheppard Mullin Richter And Hampton LLP
contact info
Annie Lau
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Patricia Melody Jeng
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton
contact info
Plaintiff
Jordan Chalmers
Represented By
Daniel S. Brome
Nichols Kaster, LLP
contact info
Michele Renee Fisher
Nichols Kaster, Pllp
contact info
Charles Scalise
Ross Scalise Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, December 15, 2022
6 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17825067.) filed by Jordan Chalmers.(Fisher, Michele)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
5 5 Summons Issued as to DSSV, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 3/22/202 3. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/29/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 Proposed Summons. (Brome, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against DSSV, Inc., d/b/a Brightwheel ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17824082.). Filed byJordan Chalmers.(Brome, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
3 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/28/2022. (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]