California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referred: Rozella A Oliver
Case #: 2:22-cv-09039
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Dec 14, 2022
Terminated:Aug 09, 2023
Case in other court:Los Angeles Superior Court, 22STCV29679
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 13, 2023 1:58 AM PDT
Defendant
FCA US LLC
Represented By
Hailey Marie Rogerson
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Spencer Peter Hugret
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Ali Azemoon
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Greg Gruzman
Gordon And Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Santa Monica Motor Group
Represented By
Hailey Marie Rogerson
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Spencer Peter Hugret
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Ali Azemoon
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Greg Gruzman
Gordon And Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sean Stephens
Represented By
Tionna Dolin
Strategic Legal Practices Apc
contact info
Sanam Vaziri
Strategic Legal Practices Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, August 24, 2023
38 38 misc Receipt Thu 08/24 5:16 PM
Receipt of REMAND by Los Angeles County Superior Court on 8/15/2023 (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
37 37 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form Wed 08/09 9:33 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California, Stanley Mosk Courthouse. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California, Stanley Mosk Courthouse. (lom)
Related: [-]
36 36 order Remand Case to State Court Wed 08/09 9:29 AM
ORDER REMANDING ACTION FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. For the aforementioned reasons, the court finds that FCA has failed to demonstrate that the amount in controversy exceeds $50,000 as required by the Magnuson-Moss Act. The court, therefore, REMANDS the action to the Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case No. 22STCV29679. All dates and deadlines in this court are VACATED. Defendant FCA's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Dkt.27) is DENIED as MOOT. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (lom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
35 35 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 08/08 3:51 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque counsel for Plaintiff Sean Stephens. Adding Elizabeth A. LaRocque as counsel of record for Sean Stephens for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Sean Stephens. (Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Sean Stephens(pty:pla))(LaRocque, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
34 34 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 08/08 10:19 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OF DEFENDANT FCA US LLC FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (DKT.27 ) UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The court finds that the Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings currently scheduled for hearing on August 11, 2023, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, this motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. The court expects the parties to continue litigating this action diligently, while awaiting the court's ruling on this motion. No appearances are necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
33 33 misc Response Mon 08/07 6:43 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Sean Stephensto Order to Show Cause,,,30 (Law, Daniel)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Response Mon 08/07 12:20 PM
RESPONSE filed by Defendant FCA US LLCto Order to Show Cause,,,30 (Gruzman, Greg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of GG iso FCA's Brief,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to GG Decl,
Att: 3 Exhibit B to GG Decl,
Att: 4 Exhibit C to GG Decl,
Att: 5 Exhibit D to GG Decl,
Att: 6 Exhibit E to GG Decl,
Att: 7 Certificate of Service
Friday, July 28, 2023
31 31 respm Reply (Motion related) Fri 07/28 2:00 PM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to on the Pleadings 27 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC.(Rogerson, Hailey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, July 24, 2023
30 30 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 07/24 2:27 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ACTION SHOULD NOT BE REMANDED FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. The ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE, in writing only, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, why this action should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction because the amount in controversy does not exceed the jurisdictional threshold. The parties are encouraged to submit evidence and/or judicially noticeable facts in response to the court's Order. Responses shall be limited to ten (10) pages in length. The parties should consider this Order to be a two pronged inquiry into the facial and factual sufficiency of Defendants demonstration of jurisdiction. As Defendant is the party asserting federal jurisdiction, Defendant's failure to respond timely and adequately to this Order shall result in dismissal of the action without further notice. (lc)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2023
29 29 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Fri 07/21 10:17 AM
OPPOSITION In Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to on the Pleadings 27 filed by Plaintiff Sean Stephens. (Law, Daniel)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 07/21 10:14 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel A Law counsel for Plaintiff Sean Stephens. Adding Daniel A. Law as counsel of record for Sean Stephens for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Sean Stephens. (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Sean Stephens(pty:pla))(Law, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
27 27 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Tue 06/06 11:49 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to on the Pleadings filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. Motion set for hearing on 8/11/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (Gruzman, Greg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of GG iso MJOP,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to GG Decl,
Att: 3 Exhibit B to GG Decl,
Att: 4 Exhibit C to GG Decl,
Att: 5 Exhibit D to GG Decl,
Att: 6 Exhibit E to GG Decl,
Att: 7 Memorandum F to GG Decl,
Att: 8 Request for Judicial Notice iso MJOP,
Att: 9 Proposed Order,
Att: 10 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
26 26 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Wed 02/01 4:23 PM
Text Only Entry re Order/Referral to ADR (No 1)24 . This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver for settlement proceedings. For scheduling, counsel are directed to contact chambers at RAO_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov at least six (6) weeks prior to the ADR deadline set by the district judge. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dml)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
25 25 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 01/31 1:26 PM
ORDER RE: SCHEDULE OF PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES, TRIAL REQUIREMENTS, AND CONDUCT OF ATTORNEYS AND PARTIES by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha : Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/22/2024 01:00 PM ; Jury Trial set for 4/2/2024 08:30 AM ; Motion in Limine set for hearing on 3/22/2024 at 01:00 PM (SEE DOCUMENT FOR ALL SPECIFIED DEADLINES). (lc)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 1) (Judge) (ADR-12) Tue 01/31 8:42 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 1 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Case ordered to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver for Settlement Conference. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 03/01/2024. (tf)
Related: [-]
23 23 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 01/31 8:41 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report submitted by the parties, and determines that an in-person Scheduling Conference is unnecessary. Accordingly, the court VACATES the February 10, 2023, Scheduling Conference. Order re Jury/Court Trial to issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2023
22 22 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Fri 01/27 3:14 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff Sean Stephens.. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
21 21 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Tue 12/27 12:58 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, re Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only19 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form8 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form10 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only18 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form9 served on December 27, 2022. (Gruzman, Greg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
20 20 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form Wed 12/21 1:27 PM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program13 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. The document is stricken. (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2022
19 19 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Mon 12/19 12:06 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Scheduling Conference set for 2/10/2023 at 01:00 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 12/19 12:04 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Mon 12/19 10:11 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program13 . The following error(s) was/were found: The filing of a Declination Statement of Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge only applies to cases under the "Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program", wherein the initial judge assignment as the presider of the case is assigned to a magistrate judge. This case is not under that program. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rn)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
16 16 notice Appearance Fri 12/16 11:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Hailey Marie Rogerson on behalf of Defendant Santa Monica Motor Group(Rogerson, Hailey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
15 15 notice Appearance Fri 12/16 11:41 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ali Azemoon on behalf of Defendant Santa Monica Motor Group(Azemoon, Ali)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
14 14 notice Appearance Fri 12/16 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant Santa Monica Motor Group(Hugret, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
13 13 misc Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Fri 12/16 11:33 AM
DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant Santa Monica Motor Group.(Gruzman, Greg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
12 12 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 12/16 11:31 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Santa Monica Motor Group, identifying Santa Monica Motor Group dba Santa Monica Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram erroneously sued as Santa Monica Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram.(Gruzman, Greg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
11 11 notice Appearance Fri 12/16 11:29 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Greg Gruzman on behalf of Defendant Santa Monica Motor Group(Gruzman, Greg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
10 10 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 12/14 4:59 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
9 9 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 12/14 4:59 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 12/14 4:58 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (et)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Appearance Wed 12/14 11:38 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ali Azemoon on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC(Attorney Ali Azemoon added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Azemoon, Ali)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
6 6 notice Appearance Wed 12/14 11:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Hailey Marie Rogerson on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC(Attorney Hailey Marie Rogerson added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Rogerson, Hailey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
5 5 notice Appearance Wed 12/14 11:27 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC(Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
4 4 notice Appearance Wed 12/14 11:10 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Greg Gruzman on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC(Gruzman, Greg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 12/14 11:08 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA US LLC; FCA North America Holdings, LLC; FCA Holdco B.V.;Stellantis N.V. (formerly known as Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.).(Gruzman, Greg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 12/14 11:06 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC.(Gruzman, Greg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
1 1 11 pgs notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 12/14 10:52 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 22stcv29679 Receipt No: ACACDC-34474931 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attorney Greg Gruzman added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Gruzman, Greg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of SPH iso Removal,
Att: 2 Declaration of GG iso Removal,
Att: 3 22 pgs Exhibit A iso GG Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit B iso GG Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit C iso GG Declaration,
Att: 6 Exhibit D iso GG Declaration,
Att: 7 Exhibit E iso GG Declaration,
Att: 8 Exhibit F iso GG Declaration,
Att: 9 Exhibit G iso GG Declaration,
Att: 10 Exhibit H iso GG Declaration,
Att: 11 Exhibit I iso GG Declaration,
Att: 12 Exhibit J iso GG Declaration,
Att: 13 Exhibit K iso GG Declaration,
Att: 14 Exhibit L iso GG Declaration,
Att: 15 Exhibit M iso GG Declaration,
Att: 16 Exhibit N iso GG Declaration,
Att: 17 Exhibit O iso GG Declaration,
Att: 18 Exhibit P iso GG Declaration,
Att: 19 Exhibit Q iso GG Declaration,
Att: 20 Exhibit R iso GG Declaration,
Att: 21 Certificate of Service
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Wed 12/14 5:37 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants FCA US LLC, Santa Monica Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, Does 1 through 10, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Sean Stephens. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/12/022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ]. (et)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 12/14 5:45 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Sean Stephens, upon Defendant FCA US LLC served on 9/26/2022, answer due 10/17/2022. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/30/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT L TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ]/ (et)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 12/14 5:50 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Santa Monica Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, upon Defendant Santa Monica Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram served on 9/28/2022, answer due 10/19/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon by substituted service by Elizabeth Bravo, Cashier Department in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/30/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT M TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ]. (et)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Wed 12/14 5:52 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/26/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT N TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ]. (et)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Wed 12/14 6:01 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Santa Monica Motor Group dba Santa Monica Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, erroneously sued as Santa Monica Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/15/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT O TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ].(et)
Related: [-]