Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:20-bk-04501

California Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Margaret M Mann
Case #: 3:22-ap-90063
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2022
Terminated:Oct 25, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Gary Winnick
Represented By
Gary Winnick
contact info
Defendant
GARY WINNICK AND PACIFIC CAPITAL GROUP, INC. (D/B/A WINNICK AND COMPANY)
Represented By
GARY WINNICK AND PACIFIC CAPITAL GROUP, INC. (D/B/A WINNICK AND COMPANY)
contact info
Plaintiffs
Gerald H. Davis, Ch. 7 Trustee
Represented By
Gary B. Rudolph
Sullivan Hill Rez & Engel, Aplc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/26/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
32 32 order Closed Adversary Proceeding Wed 10/25 4:00 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Fearce, K.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
31 31 notice BNC Court Certificate of Notice Thu 08/17 9:10 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 08/17/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 30 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
30 30 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Order)(CSD 3039, 3040, other) Tue 08/15 4:18 PM
Order on Plaintiffs Stipulation of Dismissal of ALL Claims with Prejudice 3:2022-ap-90063-MM . with BNC Service signed on 8/15/2023. (Lewis, L.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
29 29 vCal Virtual Minute Entry - CHAP Thu 08/10 6:20 PM
Virtual Minute Entry. Termination of Hearing DATE: 08/10/2023 , MATTER: PRE-TRIAL STATUS CONFERENCE (fr. 4/20/23). DISPOSITION: Tentative Ruling as issued is the Order of the Court. Appearances excused at hearing held on 08/10/2023. Related [+] (Cruz, L.)
Related: [-] 19 Notice of Pre-Trial Status Conference Hearing
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
28 28 vCal Tentative Ruling - CHAP Tue 08/08 4:19 PM
Tentative Ruling. Department 1: Hearing Date and Time: 08/10/2023 10:00 AM, MATTER: PRE-TRIAL STATUS CONFERENCE (fr. 4/20/23) Related [+] (Cruz, L.)
Related: [-] 19 Notice of Pre-Trial Status Conference Hearing
Monday, August 07, 2023
27 27 misc Stipulation Mon 08/07 12:30 PM
Plaintiff's Stipulation of Dismissal of All Claims with Prejudice filed by Benjamin W. Kadden on behalf of Gerald H. Davis, Ch. 7 Trustee. (Kadden, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
26 26 order Pro Hac Vice Application and Order Thereon (CSD 3005) Wed 05/10 1:25 PM
Pro Hac Vice Application and Order for Applicant Coleman L. Torrans, Lugenbuhl, Wheaton, Peck, Rankin & Hubbard; with BNC Service Receipt Number 145076, Fee Amount 213.00 with BNC Service. Signed on 5/9/2023. (Cary, B.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
25 25 order Schedule/Continue Hearing (Order) Wed 04/26 1:30 PM
Order on Tentative Ruling Adopting Consensual Scheduling Order, with Service by BNC HEARING Scheduled for 8/10/2023 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1, Room 218, Weinberger Courthouse Related [+] signed on 4/26/2023. (Fearce, K.)
Related: [-] 19 Notice of Pre-Trial Status Conference Hearing,22 Certificate of Compliance with Early Conference of Counsel, LBR 7016-1,23 Tentative Ruling (CHAP)
Thursday, April 20, 2023
24 24 vCal Virtual Minute Entry - CHAP Thu 04/20 12:01 PM
Virtual Minute Entry. Termination of Hearing Date and Time 04/20/2023 10:00 AM, MATTER: PRE-TRIAL STATUS CONFERENCE. DISPOSITION: Tentative Ruling as issued is the order of the Court. Appearances excused at hearing held on 4/20/23. Related [+] (Cruz, L.)
Related: [-] 19 Notice of Pre-Trial Status Conference Hearing
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
23 23 vCal Tentative Ruling - CHAP Tue 04/18 3:33 PM
Tentative Ruling. Hearing Date and Time 04/20/2023 10:00 AM, MATTER: PRE-TRIAL STATUS CONFERENCE. Related [+] (Cruz, L.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, April 14, 2023
22 22 misc Certificate of Compliance with Early Conference of Counsel, LBR 7016-1 (CSD 3018) Fri 04/14 2:13 PM
Certificate of Compliance with Early Conference of Counsel, LBR 7016-1 filed by Daniel Centner of Peiffer Wolf on behalf of Gerald H. Davis, Ch. 7 Trustee. (Centner, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
21 21 order Pro Hac Vice Application and Order Thereon (CSD 3005) Wed 04/05 9:42 AM
Pro Hac Vice Application and Order Thereon for Applicant Maurice Mitts; with BNC Service Receipt Number CAS144325, Fee Amount 213.00 with BNC Service signed on 4/5/2023. (Fearce, K.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 02, 2023
20 20 notice BNC Court Certificate of Notice Sat 03/04 9:06 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 03/04/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Notice of Pre-Trial Status Conference Hearing
19 19 notice Hearing, Pre-Trial Status Conference (Notice) (CSD 3019)(BNC) Thu 03/02 1:16 PM
Notice of Pre-Trial Status Conference HEARING Scheduled for 4/20/2023 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1, Room 218, Weinberger Courthouse . Related [+] (Cruz, L.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/28 3:33 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Jeffrey Garfinkle of Buchalter Nemer, A Professional Corp. on behalf of GARY WINNICK AND PACIFIC CAPITAL GROUP, INC. (D/B/A WINNICK AND COMPANY). (Garfinkle, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] []1 Complaint
Monday, February 13, 2023
17 17 notice BNC Court Certificate of Notice Wed 02/15 9:07 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 02/15/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order Extending Time
Sunday, February 12, 2023
16 16 order Extending Time (Order) Mon 02/13 9:50 AM
Order on Second Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint; with Service by BNC. Related [+] signed on 2/12/2023. (Fearce, K.)
Related: [-] 15 Stipulation
Friday, February 10, 2023
15 15 misc Stipulation Fri 02/10 2:03 PM
Second Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Jeffrey Garfinkle on behalf of GARY WINNICK AND PACIFIC CAPITAL GROUP, INC. (D/B/A WINNICK AND COMPANY). Related [+] (Garfinkle, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, January 23, 2023
14 14 notice Special Notice (Request) Mon 01/23 8:50 AM
Request for Special Notice filed by Daniel Centner on behalf of Gerald H. Davis, Ch. 7 Trustee. (Centner, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
13 13 order Stipulated Order Tue 01/17 4:59 PM
Order Regarding Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint; with BNC Service Related [+] Signed on 1/17/2023. (Cary, B.)
Related: [-] 12 Stipulation
Friday, January 13, 2023
12 12 misc Stipulation Fri 01/13 4:20 PM
Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by William Hobbes Forman on behalf of GARY WINNICK AND PACIFIC CAPITAL GROUP, INC. (D/B/A WINNICK AND COMPANY), Gary Winnick. Related [+] (Forman, William)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
11 11 order Pro Hac Vice Application and Order Thereon (CSD 3005) Tue 01/10 4:18 PM
Pro Hac Vice Application and Order Thereon for Applicant Daniel Centner; with BNC Service Receipt Number CAS142686, Fee Amount 426.00 with BNC Service signed on 1/10/2023. (Fearce, K.)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Pro Hac Vice Application and Order Thereon (CSD 3005) Tue 01/10 4:13 PM
Pro Hac Vice Application and Order Thereon for Applicant Benjamin W. Kadden; with BNC Service Receipt Number CAS142686, Fee Amount 426.00 with BNC Service signed on 1/10/2023. (Fearce, K.)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
9 9 crditcrd Auto-docket of credit card Fri 12/16 12:55 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-90063 MM] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Fee Amount 350.00 COURT ACTION: Fee Deferred. Receipt number N/A Related [+]; (Chaco)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Thursday, December 15, 2022
8 8 misc Certificate of Compliance with Early Conference of Counsel, LBR 7016-1 (CSD 3018) Thu 12/15 1:04 PM
[Notice of Compliance Pursuant to Rule 7016-1(a)(1) of the Local Rules of the United States Bankruptcy Court, Southern District of California] Certificate of Compliance with Early Conference of Counsel, LBR 7016-1 [to Andrew Kane, COO] filed by Gary B. Rudolph of Sullivan Hill Rez & Engel, APLC on behalf of Gerald H. Davis, Ch. 7 Trustee. Related [+] (Rudolph, Gary)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,6 Return of Summons Served
Att: 1 Proof of Service
7 7 misc Certificate of Compliance with Early Conference of Counsel, LBR 7016-1 (CSD 3018) Thu 12/15 1:00 PM
[Notice of Compliance Pursuant to Rule 7016-1(a)(1) of the Local Rules of the United States Bankruptcy Court, Southern District of California] Certificate of Compliance with Early Conference of Counsel, LBR 7016-1 [to Gary Winnick] filed by Gary B. Rudolph of Sullivan Hill Rez & Engel, APLC on behalf of Gerald H. Davis, Ch. 7 Trustee. Related [+] (Rudolph, Gary)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,5 Return of Summons Served
Att: 1 Proof of Service
6 6 cmp Return of Summons Served Thu 12/15 12:50 PM
Summons Served on: GARY WINNICK AND PACIFIC CAPITAL GROUP, INC. (D/B/A WINNICK AND COMPANY). Served On 12/15/2022 filed by Gary B. Rudolph on behalf of Gerald H. Davis, Ch. 7 Trustee. (Rudolph, Gary)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Return of Summons Served Thu 12/15 12:44 PM
Summons Served on: Gary Winnick. Served On 12/15/2022 filed by Gary B. Rudolph on behalf of Gerald H. Davis, Ch. 7 Trustee. (Rudolph, Gary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
4 4 order Defer Payment of Fee for filing Complaint (Order) Tue 12/13 3:59 PM
Order APPROVING Application to Defer Payment of Fee for Filing Complaint 3:22-ap-90063 . IT IS ORDERED the Clerk of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court shall cause a copy of this Order to be transmitted to the court of jurisdiction over the underlying bankruptcy case for docketing; and that any deferred filing fees be collected from the estate, if any, created for the underlying case unless otherwise directed by the court. Michael Williams, Clerk of Court signed on 12/13/2022. (Admin)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Defer Payment of Fee for Filing Complaint by Trustee or DIP (Application) (CSD 2017) Tue 12/13 3:59 PM
Application by Trustee or DIP to Defer Payment of Fee for Filing Complaint 3:22-ap-90063. filed by Gary B. Rudolph on behalf of Gerald H. Davis, Ch. 7 Trustee. Related [+] (Rudolph, Gary)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
2 2 court Summons Issued (CSD 2500A) (auto) Tue 12/13 3:57 PM
Summons Issued on Gary Winnick Answer Due 01/12/2023; PACIFIC CAPITAL GROUP, INC. Answer Due 01/12/2023; WINNICK AND COMPANY Answer Due 01/12/2023; with Certificate of Service. (Rudolph, Gary)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 12/13 3:57 PM
Adversary case 22-90063 Complaint by Gerald H. Davis, Ch. 7 Trustee against Gary Winnick, PACIFIC CAPITAL GROUP, INC., WINNICK AND COMPANY. Nature of Suit: 13 Related [+] 14 [COMPLAINT TO AVOID FRAUDULENT TRANSFERS] , Fee Amount $ 350.00 Filed by Gary B. Rudolph on behalf of Gerald H. Davis, Ch. 7 Trustee. (Rudolph, Gary)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other