BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT (US) LLC et al v. ALTICE USA, INC. et al
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodney Gilstrap |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-00471 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Dec 14, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 12, 2023 6:01 AM CDT |
Defendant
ALTICE USA, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CSC HOLDINGS, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
The Honorable Suzanne H Segal
judgesegal@signatureresolutions.com Signature Resolution 633 W. 5th St, Suite 1000
Los Angeles, CA 90071 |
|
Plaintiff
BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT (US) LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CAPITOL RECORDS, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CONCORD BICYCLE ASSETS, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CONCORD MUSIC GROUP, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
UMG RECORDINGS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
173 | 173
3
pgs
order
Order on Sealed Motion Order on Motion for Protective Order
Tue 04/23 11:17 AM
ORDER ON MOTION RE HEARING ON 4/12/2024. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/22/2024. (CH) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
172 | 172
misc
Transcript
Thu 04/18 8:14 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 04/12/2024 before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shawn McRoberts,Telephone number: (903) 923-8546. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 5/9/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2024. (SMM) |
|
171 | 171
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Thu 04/18 4:57 PM
THIRD AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER re162 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/18/2024. (NKL) |
|
170 | 170
3
pgs
order
Order on Sealed Motion
Thu 04/18 4:55 PM
AGREED ORDER ON AGREEMENTS REGARDING DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO COMPEL (DKT re143 Sealed Motion to Compel Production of Document;144 Sealed Motion to Compel Production of Document. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/18/2024. (NKL) |
|
169 | 169
5
pgs
order
Order on Sealed Motion
Thu 04/18 4:53 PM
AGREED ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS TO COMPEL re139 Sealed Motion to Compel Custodial Documents, Deposition Testimony, and Information Regarding Cequel;140 Sealed Motion to Compel Interrogatory Responses and Motion for an Order Regarding Requests for Admission;141 Sealed Motion to Compel Production of Documents. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/18/2024. (NKL) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
168 | 168
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 04/17 9:18 PM
AGREED MOTION FOR ENTRY OF AGREED ORDERS by BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT (US) LLC, CAPITOL RECORDS, LLC, CONCORD BICYCLE ASSETS, LLC, CONCORD MUSIC GROUP, INC., UMG RECORDINGS, INC..(Fink, Rudolph) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
167 | 167
misc
Transcript/Digital Audio Recording Request
Wed 04/17 10:17 AM
PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT (US) LLC, CAPITOL RECORDS, LLC, CONCORD BICYCLE ASSETS, LLC, CONCORD MUSIC GROUP, INC., UMG RECORDINGS, INC. for proceedings held on 04/12/24 Motions Hearing before Judge J. Rodney Gilstrap. (Forwarded to Shawn McRoberts on 4/17/24) (Davis, William) Modified on 4/17/2024 (bga) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
166 | 166
misc
Transcript/Digital Audio Recording Request
Tue 04/16 5:33 PM
PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by ALTICE USA, INC. for proceedings held on 04/12/2024 Discovery Motions Heaing before Judge J. Rodney Gilstrap. (Anderson, Sean) |
|
165 | 165
misc
Redacted Document
Tue 04/16 4:52 PM
REDACTION to156 Sealed Response to Motion, Motion to Compel (March 25, 2024) by BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT (US) LLC, CAPITOL RECORDS, LLC, CONCORD BICYCLE ASSETS, LLC, CONCORD MUSIC GROUP, INC., UMG RECORDINGS, INC..(Davis, William) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit/Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A-D Sealed, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
164 | 164
misc
Redacted Document
Tue 04/16 4:49 PM
REDACTION to155 Sealed Response to Motion, Motion to Compel Regarding Rightscorp by BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT (US) LLC, CAPITOL RECORDS, LLC, CONCORD BICYCLE ASSETS, LLC, CONCORD MUSIC GROUP, INC., UMG RECORDINGS, INC..(Davis, William) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit/Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
162 | 162
motion
Amend/Correct
Mon 04/15 2:16 PM
AGREED MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT (US) LLC, CAPITOL RECORDS, LLC, CONCORD BICYCLE ASSETS, LLC, CONCORD MUSIC GROUP, INC., UMG RECORDINGS, INC..(Fink, Rudolph) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |