Colorado District Court
Judge:Daniel D Domenico
Referred: Kristen L Mix
Case #: 1:22-cv-03223
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331w - Fed. Question: Wrongful Termination of Employment
Case Filed:Dec 14, 2022
Terminated:Apr 12, 2023
Case in other court:Denver District Court, CO, 2021cv30754
Last checked: Monday Jun 12, 2023 5:04 AM MDT
Counter Claimant
Iterate Studio Inc.
Represented By
Joel S. Neckers
Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP
contact info
Raymond W. Martin
Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Andrew Wichern
Represented By
Madeline A. Collison
Benezra & Culver, P.C.
contact info
John A. Culver
Benezra & Culver P.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Joanne Wichern
Represented By
Madeline A. Collison
Benezra & Culver, P.C.
contact info
John A. Culver
Benezra & Culver P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Iterate Studio Inc.
Represented By
Joel S. Neckers
Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP
contact info
Raymond W. Martin
Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP
contact info
William P. Sowers, Jr
Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP
contact info
Matthew Vian Rotbart
Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jon Nordmark
Represented By
Joel S. Neckers
Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP
contact info
Raymond W. Martin
Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP
contact info
William P. Sowers, Jr
Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP
contact info
Matthew Vian Rotbart
Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP
contact info
Defendant
Brian Sathianathan
Represented By
Joel S. Neckers
Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP
contact info
Raymond W. Martin
Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP
contact info
William P. Sowers, Jr
Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP
contact info
Matthew Vian Rotbart
Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrew Wichern
Represented By
Madeline A. Collison
Benezra & Culver, P.C.
contact info
John A. Culver
Benezra & Culver P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Joanne Wichern
Represented By
Madeline A. Collison
Benezra & Culver, P.C.
contact info
John A. Culver
Benezra & Culver P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
35 35 utility Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC Wed 04/12 6:45 PM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the34 Stipulated Notice of Dismissal of Case With Prejudice filed in this case on 04/12/2023. Text Only Entry (athom, )
Related: [-]
34 34 misc Stipulation Wed 04/12 4:19 PM
STIPULATION Stipulated Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of All Claims and Counterclaims Between Plaintiffs and Defendants with Prejudice by Counter Claimant Iterate Studio Inc., Defendants Iterate Studio Inc., Jon Nordmark, Brian Sathianathan. (Neckers, Joel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
33 33 misc Supplement/Amendment Wed 03/08 3:18 PM
SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to32 Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Andrew Wichern, Joanne Wichern, Counter Defendants Andrew Wichern, Joanne Wichern. (Collison, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
32 32 order Scheduling Order Wed 02/22 3:09 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/22/23. (lgale, )
Related: [-]
31 31 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 02/22 3:07 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Kristen on 2/22/2023. Discovery due by 10/20/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 12/8/2023. FTR: KLM Courtroom A401. (lgale, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Discovery Procedures and Requirements of Practice
Thursday, February 16, 2023
30 30 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Thu 02/16 12:31 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Andrew Wichern, Joanne Wichern. (Collison, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
29 29 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Wed 02/15 2:23 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs Andrew Wichern, Joanne Wichern All parties do not consent.. (Collison, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
28 28 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 01/24 7:28 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to9 Amended Complaint Second Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by Iterate Studio Inc., Jon Nordmark, Brian Sathianathan.(Neckers, Joel)
Related: [-]
27 27 answer Answer/Reply to Counterclaim Tue 01/24 5:46 PM
Plaintiffs-Counterclaim Defendants ANSWER/REPLY to10 Counterclaim by Defendant-Counterclaimant Iterate Studio, Inc's First Amended Counter Complaint by Andrew Wichern, Joanne Wichern.(Collison, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Wed 01/18 10:00 AM
ORDER granting25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re9 Amended Complaint . Defendants' answer is due on January 24, 2023 by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 1/18/2023. Text Only Entry (dddlc6, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
25 25 motion Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Tue 01/17 8:03 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re9 Amended Complaint by Defendants Iterate Studio Inc., Jon Nordmark, Brian Sathianathan.(Martin, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
23 23 motion Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Tue 01/17 2:12 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Defendant-Counterclaim Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Andrew Wichern, Joanne Wichern. (Collison, Madeline)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Tue 01/17 2:35 PM
ORDER granting23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Defendant-Counterclaim Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Andrew Wichern answer due 1/24/2023; Joanne Wichern answer due 1/24/2023. byJudge Daniel D. Domenico on 1/17/2023. Text Only Entry (dddlc6, ) Modified on 1/17/2023 to correct Judge signature (angar, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
22 22 2 pgs order Order Wed 01/11 2:43 PM
PRE-SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 01/11/2023. (alave, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2023
21 21 3 pgs order Order Fri 01/06 9:10 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 01/05/2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/15/2023. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 2/22/2023 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (alave, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Continuation of Main Document,
Att: 2 Continuation of Main Document,
Att: 3 Continuation of Main Document
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
20 20 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 01/04 8:31 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance as counsel for Plaintiffs and Counterclaim Defendants Andrew and Joanne Wichern by John A. Culver on behalf of Andrew Wichern, Joanne WichernAttorney John A. Culver added to party Andrew Wichern(pty:pla), Attorney John A. Culver added to party Andrew Wichern(pty:cc), Attorney John A. Culver added to party Joanne Wichern(pty:cc), Attorney John A. Culver added to party Joanne Wichern(pty:pla) (Culver, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
19 19 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Tue 01/03 3:50 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance od Madeline A Collison for Plaintiffs and Counterclaim Defendants by Madeline A. Collison on behalf of Andrew Wichern, Joanne WichernAttorney Madeline A. Collison added to party Andrew Wichern(pty:pla), Attorney Madeline A. Collison added to party Andrew Wichern(pty:cc), Attorney Madeline A. Collison added to party Joanne Wichern(pty:cc), Attorney Madeline A. Collison added to party Joanne Wichern(pty:pla) (Collison, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Tue 12/27 2:41 PM
NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendants Iterate Studio Inc., Jon Nordmark, Brian Sathianathan(Rotbart, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Docket Sheet Ex A - State Court Docket (Register of Actions),
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex B - Joint Stipulation Regarding Motions and Deadlines
Friday, December 16, 2022
17 17 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Fri 12/16 1:53 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William P. Sowers, Jr on behalf of Iterate Studio Inc., Jon Nordmark, Brian SathianathanAttorney William P. Sowers, Jr added to party Iterate Studio Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney William P. Sowers, Jr added to party Jon Nordmark(pty:dft), Attorney William P. Sowers, Jr added to party Brian Sathianathan(pty:dft) (Sowers, William)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Fri 12/16 1:47 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew Vian Rotbart on behalf of Iterate Studio Inc., Jon Nordmark, Brian SathianathanAttorney Matthew Vian Rotbart added to party Iterate Studio Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Vian Rotbart added to party Jon Nordmark(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Vian Rotbart added to party Brian Sathianathan(pty:dft) (Rotbart, Matthew)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Fri 12/16 1:28 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Raymond W. Martin on behalf of Iterate Studio Inc., Jon Nordmark, Brian SathianathanAttorney Raymond W. Martin added to party Iterate Studio Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney Raymond W. Martin added to party Iterate Studio Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Raymond W. Martin added to party Jon Nordmark(pty:dft), Attorney Raymond W. Martin added to party Brian Sathianathan(pty:dft) (Martin, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2022
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Thu 12/15 6:53 PM
NOTICE Notice of Filing of State Court Documents by Defendants Iterate Studio Inc., Jon Nordmark, Brian Sathianathan(Neckers, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex A-1 - 2021-03-04 - State Court - Complaint w Jury Demand (2021CV30772),
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex A-2 - 2021-03-04 - State Court - District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet (2021CV30772),
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex A-3 - 2021-03-04 - State Court - District Court Summons (2021CV30772),
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex A-4 - 2021-03-04 - State Court - Reduction Delay Order (2021CV30772),
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex A-5 - 2021-03-15 - State Court - Waiver and Acceptance of Service (2021CV30772),
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex A-6 - 2021-03-22 - State Court - Motion to Consolidate or Dismiss Second Action (2021CV30772),
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex A-7 - 2021-03-29 - State Court - Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (2021CV30772),
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex A-8 - 2021-03-30 - State Court - Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (2021CV30772),
Att: 9 Exhibit Ex A-9 - 2021-04-12 - State Court - Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Motion to Consolidate or Dismiss Separate Action (2021CV30772),
Att: 10 Exhibit Ex A-10 - 2021-04-15 - State Court - Answer to Complaint (2021CV30772),
Att: 11 Exhibit Ex A-11 - 2021-04-19 - State Court - Pre Trial Order (2021CV30772),
Att: 12 Exhibit Ex A-12 - 2021-04-19 - State Court - Reply in Support of Motion to Consolidate or Dismiss Second Action (2021CV30772),
Att: 13 Exhibit Ex A-13 - 2021-04-29 - State Court - Notice to Set Jury Trial and Case Management Conference (2021CV30772),
Att: 14 Exhibit Ex A-14 - 2021-05-07 - State Court - Notice of Case Management Conference and Trial (2021CV30772),
Att: 15 Exhibit Ex A-15 - 2021-05-10 - State Court - Order Deferring Ruling on Motion to Consolidate or Dismiss to Courtroom (2021CV30772),
Att: 16 Exhibit Ex B-1 - 2021-03-03 - State Court - Complaint and Jury Demand (2021CV30754),
Att: 17 Exhibit Ex B-2 - 2021-03-03 - State Court - District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet (2021CV30754),
Att: 18 Exhibit Ex B-3 - 2021-03-04 - State Court - Entry of Appearance (2021CV30754),
Att: 19 Exhibit Ex B-4 - 2021-03-08 - State Court - Delay Reduction Order (2021CV30754),
Att: 20 Exhibit Ex B-5 - 2021-03-08 - State Court - Pre Trial Order And Discovery Protocol (2021CV30754),
Att: 21 Exhibit Ex B-6 - 2021-03-08 - State Court - Webex Procedures Judge Ross B H Buchanan (2021CV30754),
Att: 22 Exhibit Ex B-7 - 2021-03-22 - State Court - Motion to Consolidate or Dismiss Second Action (2021CV30754),
Att: 23 Exhibit Ex B-8 - 2021-03-22 - State Court - Waiver and Acceptance of Service (2021CV30754),
Att: 24 Exhibit Ex B-9 - 2021-03-24 - State Court - Entry of Appearance (2021CV30754),
Att: 25 Exhibit Ex B-10 - 2021-04-06 - State Court - Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (2021CV30754),
Att: 26 Exhibit Ex B-11 - 2021-04-07 - State Court - Entry of Appearance (2021CV30754),
Att: 27 Exhibit Ex B-12 - 2021-04-07 - State Court - Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint (2021CV30754),
Att: 28 Exhibit Ex B-13 - 2021-04-08 - State Court - Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (2021CV30754),
Att: 29 Exhibit Ex B-14 - 2021-04-12 - State Court - Defendants Response in Opposition to Motion to Consolidate or Dismiss Separate Action (2021CV30754),
Att: 30 Exhibit Ex B-15 - 2021-04-19 - State Court - Reply in Support of Motion to Consolidate or Dismiss Second Action (2021CV30754),
Att: 31 Exhibit Ex B-16 - 2021-04-21 - State Court - Amended Complaint and Jury Demand (2021CV30754),
Att: 32 Exhibit Ex B-17 - 2021-05-05 - State Court - Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint and Jury Demand (2021CV30754),
Att: 33 Exhibit Ex B-18 - 2021-05-19 - State Court - Declaration of Leung In Support of Special Motion To Dismiss Amended Complaint (2021CV30754),
Att: 34 Exhibit Ex B-19 - 2021-05-19 - State Court - Defendants Notice Of Motion Under CRS 13 20-1101 Et Seq Colorado's Anti Slapp Statute (2021CV30754),
Att: 35 Exhibit Ex B-20 - 2021-05-19 - State Court - Defendants Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Special Motion To Dismiss (2021CV30754),
Att: 36 Exhibit Ex B-21 - 2021-05-19 - State Court - Defendants Special Motion To Dismiss Certain Allegations in Amended Complaint (2021CV30754),
Att: 37 Exhibit Ex B-22 - 2021-05-19 - State Court - Exhibit C & D to the Declaration of Tao Y Leung ISO Special Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 38 Exhibit Ex B-23 - 2021-05-24 - State Court - Order re Plaintiffs Motion To Consolidate Or Dismiss Second Action (2021CV30754),
Att: 39 Exhibit Ex B-24 - 2021-05-24 - State Court - Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss (2021CV30754),
Att: 40 Exhibit Ex B-25 - 2021-06-01 - State Court - Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss (2021CV30754),
Att: 41 Exhibit Ex B-26 - 2021-06-04 - State Court - Plaintiffs Response to Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint (2021CV30754),
Att: 42 Exhibit Ex B-27 - 2021-06-07 - State Court - Notice of Consolidation (2021CV30754),
Att: 43 Exhibit Ex B-28 - 2021-06-07 - State Court - Plaintiffs Answer to Defendant Iterate's Counterclaims (2021CV30754),
Att: 44 Exhibit Ex B-29 - 2021-06-10 - State Court - Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Special Motion to Dismiss (2021CV30754),
Att: 45 Exhibit Ex B-30 - 2021-06-11 - State Court - Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint (2021CV30754),
Att: 46 Exhibit Ex B-31 - 2021-06-16 - State Court - Plaintiffs Motion for Second Extension of Time to File Response to Special Motion to Dismiss (2021CV30754),
Att: 47 Exhibit Ex B-32 - 2021-06-17 - State Court - Plaintiffs Response to Special Motion to Dismiss Certain Allegations in Amended Complaint (with Exhibits),
Att: 48 Exhibit Ex B-33 - 2021-06-18 - State Court - Order Granting Plaintiffs Mot for Ext of Time to File Response to Special Mot to Dismiss (2021CV30754),
Att: 49 Exhibit Ex B-34 - 2021-06-18 - State Court - Order re Plaintiffs Mot for Second Ext of Time to File Response to Special Motion to Dismiss (2021CV30754),
Att: 50 Exhibit Ex B-35 - 2021-06-21 - State Court - Defendants Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Special Motion to Dismiss (2021CV30754),
Att: 51 Exhibit Ex B-36 - 2021-06-23 - State Court - Order Granting Mot for Ext of Time to File Reply in Supp of Special Mot to Dismiss (2021CV30754),
Att: 52 Exhibit Ex B-37 - 2021-06-23 - State Court - Tao Y Leung Affidavit (2021CV30754),
Att: 53 Exhibit Ex B-38 - 2021-06-23 - State Court - Tao Y Leung's Verified Motion Requesting Pro Hac Vice Admission (2021CV30754),
Att: 54 Exhibit Ex B-39 - 2021-06-25 - State Court - From Atty Reg Office re Mot For Admission Pro Hac Vice by Leung (2021CV30754),
Att: 55 Exhibit Ex B-40 - 2021-06-30 - State Court - Order Granting Out of State Counsel's Verified Motion Requesting Pro Hac Vice (2021CV30754),
Att: 56 Exhibit Ex B-41 - 2021-07-01 - State Court - Declaration of Jon Nordmark (with Exhibits),
Att: 57 Exhibit Ex B-42 - 2021-07-01 - State Court - Declaration of Tao Y Leung ISO Reply to Special Motion to Dismiss (with Exhibits),
Att: 58 Exhibit Ex B-43 - 2021-07-01 - State Court - Reply in Support of Special Motion to Dismiss Certain Allegations in Amended Complaint (2021CV30754),
Att: 59 Exhibit Ex B-44 - 2021-07-22 - State Court - Notice of Hearing re Special Motion to Dismiss (2021CV30754),
Att: 60 Exhibit Ex B-45 - 2021-10-27 - State Court - Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (2021CV30754),
Att: 61 Exhibit Ex B-46 - 2021-10-27 - State Court - Second Amended Complaint (2021CV30754),
Att: 62 Exhibit Ex B-47 - 2021-11-17 - State Court - Response to Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (with Ex A),
Att: 63 Exhibit Ex B-48 - 2022-01-31 - State Court - Notice of Change of Contact Info (2021CV30754),
Att: 64 Exhibit Ex B-49 - 2022-02-04 - State Court - Notice of Withdrawal of Eleanor D Kasper (2021CV30754),
Att: 65 Exhibit Ex B-50 - 2022-02-11 - State Court - Entry of Appearance of Jessica Black Livingston (2021CV30754),
Att: 66 Exhibit Ex B-51 - 2022-02-23 - State Court - Notice of Change of Address, Change of Law Firm, and Withdrawal as Attorney of Record (2021CV30754),
Att: 67 Exhibit Ex B-52 - 2022-07-05 - State Court - Notice of Substitution of Counsel (2021CV30754),
Att: 68 Exhibit Ex B-53 - 2022-07-07 - State Court - Notice of Withdrawal (2021CV30754),
Att: 69 Exhibit Ex B-54 - 2022-08-24 - State Court - Entry of Appearance for Plaintiff Counterclaim Defendants (2021CV30754),
Att: 70 Exhibit Ex B-55 - 2022-08-24 - State Court - Plaintiff Counterclaim Defendants Mot to Lift Stay of Discovery and for CMC (2021CV30754),
Att: 71 Exhibit Ex B-56 - 2022-09-14 - State Court - Motion for Ext of Time to Respond to Mot to Lift Stay and for CMC (2021CV30754),
Att: 72 Exhibit Ex B-57 - 2022-09-16 - State Court - Order Granting Mot for Ext of Time to Respond to Mot to Lift Stay and for CMC (2021CV30754),
Att: 73 Exhibit Ex B-58 - 2022-09-28 - State Court - Opposition to Motion to Lift Stay (2021CV30754),
Att: 74 Exhibit Ex B-59 - 2022-10-04 - State Court - Motion for Ext of Time to File Reply ISO Motion to Lift Stay of Discovery & CMC (2021CV30754),
Att: 75 Exhibit Ex B-60 - 2022-10-04 - State Court - Returned Envelope (Eleanor Degolian Kasper) Order for Unopposed Mot For Ext Of Time (2021CV30754),
Att: 76 Exhibit Ex B-61 - 2022-10-06 - State Court - Order Granting Unopposed EOT to File Reply ISO Mot to Lift Stay of Disc and CMC (2021CV30754),
Att: 77 Exhibit Ex B-62 - 2022-10-12 - State Court - Reply ISO Motion to Lift Stay of Discovery & Case Management Conference (2021CV30754),
Att: 78 Exhibit Ex B-63 - 2022-11-07 - State Court - Returned Envelope (Eleanor Degolian Kasper) Motion for Extension of Time (2021CV30754),
Att: 79 Exhibit Ex B-64 - 2022-12-06 - State Court - Defendants' Notice of Substitution of Counsel,
Att: 80 Exhibit Ex B-65 - 2022-12-13 - State Court - Counter-Claim Plaintiff's First Amended Counter Complaint and Jury Demand,
Att: 81 Exhibit Ex B-66 - 2022-12-13 - State Court - Joint Stipulation Regarding Motions and Deadlines,
Att: 82 Exhibit Ex B-67 - 2022-12-13 - State Court - Notice of Lis Pendens - 321 Kearney
12 12 1 pgs misc Memorandum Returning Case Thu 12/15 1:25 PM
MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-03223-DDD. (athom, )
Related: [-]
order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 12/15 1:58 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 12/15/2022. Text Only Entry. (rkeec)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
11 11 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Thu 12/15 10:13 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (tgall, )
Related: [-]
10 10 cmp Counterclaim Thu 12/15 10:10 AM
First Amended Counter Complaint And Jury Demand against Iterate Studio Inc., Jon Nordmark, Brian Sathianathan, filed by Andrew Wichern, Joanne Wichern.(tgall, )
Related: [-]
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 12/15 10:08 AM
Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint against Iterate Studio Inc., Jon Nordmark, Brian Sathianathan, filed by Andrew Wichern, Joanne Wichern.(tgall, )
Related: [-]
8 8 5 pgs misc Order - State Court Thu 12/15 10:03 AM
STATE COURT ORDER Granting Motion To Consolidate Or Dismiss Second Action. By Ross B. H. Buchanan, Denver District Court Judge, on 05/24/2021.(tgall, )
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 12/14 4:32 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Neckers, Joel)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 12/14 4:29 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joel S. Neckers on behalf of All Defendants (Neckers, Joel)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 12/14 3:38 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jon Nordmark, Iterate Studio Inc., Brian Sathianathan from Denver District Court, CO, Case Number 21cv30754 (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8832510), filed by Jon Nordmark, Iterate Studio Inc., Brian Sathianathan.(Neckers, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Exhibit A - Joint Stipulation,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - First Amended Counter Complaint and Jury Demand,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Motion to Dismiss or Consolidate Action,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Order re Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate,
Att: 5 18 pgs Exhibit E - Wicherns' Second Amended Complaint,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Iterate v. Wicherns All Case Filings,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Wicherns v. Iterate All Case Filings,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Advisory Attorney Noncompliance 2 Thu 12/15 9:18 AM
ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re:1 Notice of Removal, filed by attorney Joel S. Neckers. Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must include A Full signature Block with the affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents. Full Signature Block Needed (Text Only Entry). (tgall, )
Related: [-]
misc Administrative Notice Thu 12/15 9:25 AM
Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Notice of Removal case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1, and 28 U.S.C. § 1446(a). Each of the state court documentsshall be individual PDFs. See Appendix B Notice of Removal, in the User Guide - Attorney Case Opening Procedures document. (Text Only Entry). (tgall, )
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases Thu 12/15 9:55 AM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry). (tgall, )
Related: [-]
misc Case Assigned to Judge Thu 12/15 9:59 AM
Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
Related: [-]