New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael E Wiles
Case #: 1:22-bk-11671
Case Filed:Dec 14, 2022
Terminated:Aug 12, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Jun 20, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Floss Bar, Inc.
40 Wall St
New York, NY 10005-1304
Represented By
Vincent J. Roldan
Mandelbaum Salsburg PC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014


Docket last updated: 12/13/2022 7:00 PM EST
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Wed 12/14 9:08 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 22-11671 ) [misc,824] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16024860. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1
1 1 29 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 12/14 9:00 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 03/14/2023. Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Status Conference To Be Held Before 02/13/2023. Filed by Vincent J. Roldan of Mandelbaum Salsburg PC on behalf of Floss Bar, Inc.. (Roldan, Vincent)
Related: [-]