Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:22-mj-03012
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Dec 15, 2022 1:19 AM CST
Defendant
Joseph Dominic Brady (1)
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 12/15/2022 2:27 AM CST
Thursday, December 08, 2022
Arrest of Joseph Dominic Brady (drda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
Warrant Returned Executed as to Joseph Dominic Brady. (drda)
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to USA as to Joseph Dominic Brady. (drda)
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Joseph Dominic Brady (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Joseph Dominic Brady (1).By Judge Victor R. Garcia. (drda)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia as to Joseph Dominic Brady. (drda)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Victor R. Garcia as to Joseph Dominic Brady. (drda)
Related: [-]
3 3 Proceedings held before Judge Victor R. Garcia:Initial Appearance as to Joseph Dominic Brady held on 12/13/2022 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 12/27/2022 10:30AM before Judge Collis White, Interpreter NOT required as to Joseph Dominic Brady (Court Reporter FTR GOLD - CLEVRIE.) (drda)
Related: [-]