Original Case: 3:15-md-02672

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv-16898
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2022
Terminated:Apr 16, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Dec 15, 2022 12:32 AM PST
In re: VOLKSWAGEN "CLEAN DIESEL" MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES, AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Defendant - Appellee
VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By
Robert J. Giuffra Jr.
Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP
contact info
William Brian Monahan
Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP
contact info
Diane Lee McGimsey
Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP
contact info
Sharon Nelles
Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP
contact info
Objector - Appellant
WESLEY VINCENT LOCHRIDGE, class member
Represented By
Robert Clore
Bandas Law Firm, PC
contact info
Timothy R. Hanigan
Lang, Hanigan & Carvalho, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
SETTLEMENT CLASS REPRESENTATIVES AND SETTLEMENT CLASS COUNSEL
Represented By
Kevin R. Budner
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
David S. Stellings
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Phong-Chau Gia Nguyen
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Wilson M. Dunlavey
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 9:47 AM PDT
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Wesley Vincent Lochridge Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/20/2022. Transcript ordered by 01/10/2023. Transcript due 02/10/2023. Appellant Wesley Vincent Lochridge opening brief due 03/20/2023. Appellees Settlement Class Representatives and Settlement Class Counsel and Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. answering brief due 04/20/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12609192] (RT) [Entered: 12/13/2022 11:16 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule
Att: 2 2 pgs Notice to All Parties and Counsel
Att: 3 1 pgs Mediation Letter
Att: 4 2 pgs Mediation Questionnaire
Att: 5 22 pgs Case Opening Packet