California Northern District Court
Judge:Susan Van Keulen
Case #: 5:22-cv-08907
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Dec 15, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 13, 2023 2:13 AM PDT
Defendant
Deputy Jesse Burkleo
Monterey County Sheriff's Dept 1414 Natividad Road
Salinas, CA 93906
Represented By
Marina S. Pantchenko
County Of Monterey, Office Of The County Counsel
contact info
Defendant
County of Monterey
Represented By
Marina S. Pantchenko
County Of Monterey, Office Of The County Counsel
contact info
Defendant
Deputy Richard Geng
Monterey County Sheriff 1414 Natividad Road
Salinas, CA 93906
Represented By
Marina S. Pantchenko
County Of Monterey, Office Of The County Counsel
contact info
Defendant
Deputy Ricardo Mendez
Monterey County Sheriff's Dept 1414 Natividad Road
Salinas, CA 93906
Represented By
Marina S. Pantchenko
County Of Monterey, Office Of The County Counsel
contact info
Defendant
Sergeant Brandon Smith
Monterey County Sheriff's Dept 1414 Natividad Road
Salinas, CA 93906
Represented By
Marina S. Pantchenko
County Of Monterey, Office Of The County Counsel
contact info
Plaintiff
Wes White
Represented By
David W. Balch
Balch Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, August 24, 2023
25 25 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 08/24 4:00 PM
ORDER granting 24 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 8/24/2023. (svklc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 08/24 3:42 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Jesse Burkleo, County of Monterey, Richard Geng, Ricardo Mendez, Brandon Smith. (Pantchenko, Marina)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
23 23 1 pgs order Order Mon 08/14 4:18 PM
Order to Show Cause re Settlement. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on August 14, 2023. (svklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2023
22 22 minutes Settlement Conference Thu 06/29 5:43 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Further Settlement Conference held on 6/29/2023. Case settled, subject to ratification by Sheriff's Department expected by 7/7/2023. Dismissal anticipated within 30 days. David Balch, with client White, plaintiff. Marina Pantchenko, Janet Holmes, with county rep. Cecilia Merillana, for defendants. (Not reported.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/29/2023)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
21 21 minutes Settlement Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 06/15 6:09 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Settlement Conference held on 6/15/2023. Discussion continues to next conference set for 6/29/2023, at 02:00 PM by Zoom. No new statements required. David Balch, with client White, plaintiff. Marina Pantchenko, Janet Holmes, with county rep. Cecilia Merillana, for defendants. (Not reported.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/15/2023)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
20 20 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Tue 06/13 6:13 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RE: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE . Please take notice the Settlement Conference set for 6/15/2023, at 09:30 AM before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins will be held via Zoom meeting. Meeting Access: All counsel may access the meeting information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/nc] Please click subheading +Join Non-Public Hearings. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
19 19 1 pgs order Order Setting Settlement Conference Wed 04/12 11:42 AM
NOTICE AND ORDER SETTING Settlement Conference for 6/15/2023 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 4/12/2023.(lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order
18 18 order Case Management Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Wed 04/12 10:43 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 4/12/23. (jhf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
17 17 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial Tue 04/11 10:09 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/11/2023 via Zoom. CMO to issue. Digital Recording Time: Zoom 9:35-9:44am (9 mins). Plaintiff Attorney: David Balch. Defendant Attorney: Marina Pantchenko. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/11/2023)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/05 3:30 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand DEFENDANTS COUNTY OF MONTEREY, RICHARD GENG, BRANDON SMITH, RICARDO MENDEZ, JESSE BURKLEO ANSWER TO COMPLAINT byJesse Burkleo, County of Monterey, Richard Geng, Ricardo Mendez, Brandon Smith. (Pantchenko, Marina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
15 15 misc Joint Case Management Statement Tue 04/04 4:35 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Jesse Burkleo, County of Monterey, Richard Geng, Ricardo Mendez, Brandon Smith. (Pantchenko, Marina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2023
14 14 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Thu 03/30 4:04 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Pantchenko, Marina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
13 13 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 03/28 4:29 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jesse Burkleo, County of Monterey, Richard Geng, Ricardo Mendez, Brandon Smith.. (Pantchenko, Marina)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
12 12 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 03/27 11:06 AM
ORDER by Judge Susan van Keulen granting 11 Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (svklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2023
11 11 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 03/24 4:05 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re1 Complaint, JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT filed by Jesse Burkleo, County of Monterey, Richard Geng, Ricardo Mendez, Brandon Smith. (Pantchenko, Marina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 02, 2023
oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Thu 02/02 2:25 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2023 is continued to 4/11/2023 09:30 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Case Management Statement due by 4/4/2023. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.g ov/svk] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
9 9 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 01/31 6:26 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Wes White.. (Balch, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Tue 01/17 8:43 AM
2ND AND FINAL CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff(s) shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 1/31/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 30, 2022
oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Fri 12/30 9:52 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff(s) shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 1/13/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. The re is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 29, 2022
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 12/29 4:44 PM
Summons Issued as to Jesse Burkleo, County of Monterey, Richard Geng, Ricardo Mendez, Brandon Smith. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 23, 2022
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 12/23 5:09 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/14/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2023 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (ecg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2022
4 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/29/2022. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Thu 12/15 1:17 PM
Proposed Summons. (Balch, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 12/15 1:16 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by Wes White . (Balch, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/15 1:15 PM
COMPLAINT against COUNTY OF MONTEREY, a political subdivision of the State of California;, Richard Geng, Brandon Smith, Ricardo Mendez, Jesse Burkleo ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17826446.). Filed byWes White. (Balch, David)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 12/15 1:28 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/29/2022. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]