New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Joan M Azrack
Referred: James M Wicks
Case #: 2:22-cv-07636
Nature of Suit330 Torts - Personal Injury - Federal Employers’ Liability
Cause45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Case Filed:Dec 15, 2022
Terminated:Jul 18, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 13, 2023 5:11 AM EDT
Defendant
Long Island Rail Road Company
Represented By
Christopher J Pogan
Long Island Rail Road
contact info
Ronald Rizzo
Long Island Rail Road
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicole Hobin
Represented By
Valerie J. Lauriello
Flynn & Lauriello PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, August 26, 2024
order Order(Other) Mon 08/26 10:00 AM
ORDER re19 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Long Island Rail Road Company. The stipulation is So Ordered. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 8/26/2024. (LP)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
19 19 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 08/23 10:09 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Long Island Rail Road Company (Rizzo, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
order Order Dismissing Case Thu 07/18 9:58 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The Court having been advised that this matter has settled, the case is dismissed, subject to reinstatement at the request of any party within 45 days. The Court retains jurisdiction to So Order any settlement documents if they are submitted within this period. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 7/18/2024. (LP)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Thu 07/18 12:46 PM
ORDER. In light of the parties' representation that the case has settled (ECF No.18 ) and Judge Joan M. Azrack's dismissal of the case, the Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for July 22, 2024 is CANCELLED . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 7/18/2024. (HM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
18 18 motion Adjourn Conference Wed 07/17 3:36 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference /CASE SETTLED by Nicole Hobin. (Lauriello, Valerie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
17 17 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 02/29 11:38 AM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks: CIVIL CAUSE FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. Counsel for Plaintiff: Valerie J. Lauriello. Counsel for Defendant: Ronald Rizzo. Status Conference held on 2/29/2024 at 8:30 AM. The parties represented that they are not on track to meet the March 1, 2024 fact discovery deadline. Upon demonstrating good cause, the Court extended the deadline for all discovery (including experts) to on or before June 14, 2024 . In addition, the last date to take the first steps in summary judgment motion practice shall be on or before June 28, 2024 . These extensions are final and no further requests for an extension will be granted. A Final Pretrial Conference has been scheduled for July 22, 2024 at 9:00 AM via the Court's Video Zoom. The Court will email the Zoom invitation closer to the conference date. This conference is a public proceeding, and all are welcome to attend via telephone or via video. If you would like to receive the Zoom invitation, please contact Judge Wicks' Courtroom Deputy at (631) 712-5625. A joint proposed pretrial order ("JPTO") in compliance with the Individual Practice Rules of the Hon. Joan M. Azrack, signed by counsel for each party, must be filed on ECF at least five (5) business days prior to this conference. If a motion for summary judgment is pending, the final pretrial conference will be cancelled and filing of the JPTO will be held in abeyance. THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. (FTR Log #8:34-8:40 (Video).) (DF)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 31, 2023
order Scheduling Order Sun 12/31 9:58 AM
ORDER. In light of the parties' status report (ECF No.16 ) requesting a status conference, a status conference has been scheduled for February 29, 2024 at 8:30 AM via the Court's Zoom before the undersigned. The Court will email the Zoom invitation closer to the conference date. This conference is a public proceeding, and all are welcome to attend via telephone or via video. If you would like to receive the Zoom invitation, please contact Judge Wicks's Courtroom Deputy at (631) 712-5625. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 12/31/2023. (HM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
16 16 misc Status Report Thu 12/28 2:54 PM
STATUS REPORT OF THE PARTIES by Nicole Hobin (Lauriello, Valerie)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
15 15 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 10/30 10:45 AM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks: CIVIL CAUSE FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. Counsel for Plaintiff: Valerie J. Lauriello. Counsel for Defendant: Ronald Rizzo. Status Conference held on 10/30/2023 at 9:30 AM. The parties advised the Court that paper discovery has been completed but parties need additional time to complete depositions. Thus, the parties represented that they are not on track to meet the November 3, 2023 fact discovery deadline. The fact discovery deadline is hereby extended to March 1, 2024 . In the interim, the parties are directed to file a joint status letter on or before December 28, 2023 outlining the status of depositions and outstanding paper discovery, including status of Plaintiffs medical condition per discussion on the record. THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. (FTR Log #9:30-9:35 (Video).) (DF)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
14 14 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 08/18 4:11 PM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks: CIVIL CAUSE FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. Counsel for Plaintiff: Michael D. Flynn. Counsel for Defendant: Ronald Rizzo. Status Conference held on 8/18/2023 at 3:00 PM. The parties advised the Court of the status of this case. The parties represented that fact discovery is progressing, but they are not on track to meet the September 29, 2023 fact discovery deadline. The fact discovery deadline is hereby extended to November 3, 2023. All other dates and deadlines are held in abeyance including the Final Pretrial Conference originally scheduled for January 22, 2024. Remaining discovery deadlines and dates will be discussed and set at the next Status Conference scheduled for October 30, 2023 at 9:30 AM via the Court's Video Zoom. The Court will email the Zoom invitation closer to the conference date. This conference is a public proceeding, and all are welcome to attend via telephone or via video. If you would like to receive the Zoom invitation, please contact Judge Wicks' Courtroom Deputy at (631) 712-5625. THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. (FTR Log #3:01-3:16 (Video).) (DF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/16 12:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Flynn on behalf of Nicole Hobin (aty to be noticed) (Flynn, Michael)
Related: [-]
order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Scheduling Order Wed 08/16 5:51 PM
ORDER. Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the status conference originally set for 10:00 AM on August 18, 2023 has been MOVED to 3:00 PM on August 18, 2023 before the undersigned. An updated Zoom link will be sent to the parties. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 8/16/2023. (HM)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 09, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/09 3:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald Rizzo on behalf of Long Island Rail Road Company (aty to be noticed) (Rizzo, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
11 11 order Scheduling Order Thu 04/13 9:35 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Please See Order for Further Details. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 4/12/2023. (DF)
Related: [-]
10 10 minutes Initial Conference Hearing Thu 04/13 9:33 AM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks: CIVIL CAUSE FOR INITIAL CONFERENCE. Counsel for Plaintiff: Valerie J. Lauriello. Counsel for Defendant: Christopher J. Pogan. Initial Conference Hearing held on 4/12/2023 at 10:30 AM. Following discussion with counsel and review of the submitted worksheet, the Court adopted a Scheduling Order which is attached at DE11 . The Court advised that the parties are welcome to request a settlement conference before the Court at any time by contacting chambers. A Status Conference has been scheduled for August 18, 2023 at 10:00 AM via the Court's Video Zoom. The Court will email the Zoom invitation closer to the conference date. This conference is a public proceeding, and all are welcome to attend via telephone or via video. If you would like to receive the Zoom invitation, please contact Judge Wicks' Courtroom Deputy at (631) 712-5625. A Final Pretrial Conference has been scheduled for January 22, 2024 at 10:00 AM via the Court's Video Zoom. The Court will email the Zoom invitation closer to the conference date. This conference is a public proceeding, and all are welcome to attend via telephone or via video. If you would like to receive the Zoom invitation, please contact Judge Wicks' Courtroom Deputy at (631) 712-5625. If Judge Joan M. Azrack requires one, a joint proposed pretrial order in compliance with Judge Azrack's requirements and signed by counsel for each party must be received by the undersigned 5 business days prior to this conference. THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. (FTR Log #10:31-10:35 (Video).) (DF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
9 9 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Thu 04/06 5:08 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Long Island Rail Road Company (Pogan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Thu 04/06 4:54 PM
ORDER. The parties were directed to submit a Proposed 26(f) Scheduling Order no later than April 5, 2023. To date, no Proposed Schedule has been filed. The parties are further directed to complete the provided Proposed 26(f) Scheduling Order and electronically file same with the Court no later than April 10, 2023. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 4/6/2023. (JR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
8 8 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/23 5:29 PM
INITIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference via Zoom will be held April 12, 2023, at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. The Court will email the Zoom invitation closer to the conference date. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Proposed 26(f) Scheduling Order and electronically file same with the Court no later than April 5, 2023. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 2/23/2023. (DF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Rule 26(f) Scheduling Order,
Att: 2 JMW Individual Practice Rules
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/21 5:55 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Long Island Rail Road Company. (Pogan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/21 5:53 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Long Island Rail Road Company identifying Corporate Parent MTA, Other Affiliate MTA New York City Transit Authority, Other Affiliate MTA Staten Island Railway, Other Affiliate MTA Bus Company, Other Affiliate MTA Bridges and Tunnels, Other Affiliate MTA Metro North Commuter Railroad, Other Affiliate MTA Capital Construction Company for Long Island Rail Road Company. (Pogan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/21 5:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J Pogan on behalf of Long Island Rail Road Company (aty to be noticed) (Pogan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2023
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 01/23 11:28 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicole Hobin. Long Island Rail Road Company served on 1/20/2023, answer due 2/10/2023. (Lauriello, Valerie)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 12/16 9:51 AM
Summons Issued as to Long Island Rail Road Company. (CL)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Fri 12/16 9:48 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (CL)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 12/16 9:46 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (CL)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 12/16 9:48 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/15 4:44 PM
COMPLAINT against Long Island Rail Road Company filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16233702 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Nicole Hobin. (Lauriello, Valerie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons