California Central District Court
Judge:Monica Ramirez Almadani
Referred: Charles F Eick
Case #: 2:22-cv-09116
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2022
Terminated:May 03, 2024
Case in other court:Ventura County Superior Court, 56-02022-00571838
Last checked: Thursday Jun 15, 2023 1:58 AM PDT
Defendant
La Quinta Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey Y Choi
Snyder Burnett Egerer LLP
contact info
Megan J McMahon
Snyder Burnett Egerer LLP
contact info
Defendant
Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey Y Choi
Snyder Burnett Egerer LLP
contact info
Megan J McMahon
Snyder Burnett Egerer LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Gerard Crudele
Represented By
Dustin Eric Thordarson
Alderlaw PC
contact info
C Michael Alder
Alderlaw PC
contact info
Guyane Saroian
Alderlaw PC
contact info
Ike Sherman
Cunningham And Sherman LLP
contact info
Mark George Cunningham
Cunningham And Sherman LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 03, 2024
38 38 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form Fri 05/03 12:41 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California, County of Ventura. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California, County of Ventura. (lom)
Related: [-]
37 37 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 05/03 12:35 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO REMAND CASE TO VENTURA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT36 by Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani. This Court hereby orders that this action be REMANDED to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Ventura. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
36 36 stip Remand Case to State Court Wed 05/01 1:38 PM
STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Gerard Crudele.(Thordarson, Dustin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 04, 2024
35 35 22 pgs order Order Thu 04/04 1:33 PM
CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani. See order for details. (gga)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
34 34 order Substitute Attorney Tue 03/26 3:01 PM
ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY by Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani: granting33 Request to Substitute Attorney Dustin Eric Woods for La Quinta Holdings, Inc, Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC. as attorney of record instead of Attorneys Jeffrey Y Choi and Megan J Stone of Snyder Burnett Egerer LLP. (lom)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
33 33 motion Substitute Attorney (G-01) Mon 03/25 1:47 PM
REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Dustin E. Woods in place of attorney Jeffrey Y. Choi filed by Defendant La Quinta Holdings, Inc.. (Choi, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
32 32 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 03/19 4:04 PM
ORDER MODIFYING PRETRIAL SCHEDULE AFTER CASE REASSIGNMENT AND GRANTING SECOND STIPULATION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER[ECF NO. 9] by Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani. The Court hereby GRANTS the Stipulation. Accordingly, all pretrial deadlines in this matter are continued by 45 days through the Final Pretrial Conference (FPTC) date, which the Court hereby sets on October 10, 2024, at 3:00 p.m. The deadline to hear non-discovery motions is July 25, 2024, and the deadline to hear Daubert motions is August 15, 2024. The parties shall file motions in limine at least four (4) weeks before the FPTC, with the opposing party having one week to respond. The parties shall comply with the Court's forthcoming Civil Standing Order Regarding Jury Trial. See order for details. (lom)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
31 31 misc Miscellaneous Document Wed 03/13 5:27 PM
Joint Case Management Statement filed by Defendants La Quinta Holdings, Inc., Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC (Choi, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
30 30 stip Amend/Correct Wed 03/13 5:21 PM
Second STIPULATION to AMEND Stipulation to Amend/Correct,26 filed by defendants La Quinta Holdings, Inc., Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC.(Choi, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Second Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Jeffrey Y. Choi in support of Second Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
29 29 4 pgs order Order Tue 02/27 8:33 PM
REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani. See Order for details. (gga)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
28 28 cs_rasgn Chief District Judge Transferring Case Fri 02/23 7:04 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#24-040) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani, this case is transferred from Judge Otis D. Wright, II to the calendar of Monica Ramirez Almadani for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-09116 MRA(Ex). (cbr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
27 27 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 02/01 4:27 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: On February 1, 2024, the parties filed a joint stipulation to modify the scheduling order and continue the trial date26 . The following dates and deadlines shall supersede those previously set in this matter. The Court is unlikely to grant further extensions. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/29/2024 01:30 PM ; Jury Trial set for 8/20/2024 09:00 AM ; Motion in Limine set for hearing on 8/12/2024 at 01:30 PM (SEE DOCUMENT FOR ALL SPECIFIED DEADLINES). (lc)
Related: [-]
26 26 stip Amend/Correct Thu 02/01 10:42 AM
First STIPULATION to Amend filed by Defendant La Quinta Holdings, Inc..(Choi, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER ON STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER,
Att: 2 Declaration DECLARATION OF JEFFREY Y. CHOI IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER
Monday, March 13, 2023
25 25 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Mon 03/13 11:51 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: La Quinta Holdings, Inc., Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC's Notice (Other)23 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 03/13 11:15 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Gerard Crudele Gerard Crudele,(Thordarson, Dustin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Friday, March 10, 2023
23 23 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/10 4:43 PM
Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants La Quinta Holdings, Inc., Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC.(Choi, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
22 22 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Wed 03/08 10:47 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: ORDER (to Defendant) to File Amended Notice of Interested Parties; ORDER (to Plaintiff) to FileNotice of Interested Parties NO LATER THAN MARCH 13, 2023. Failure to do so may lead to sanctions up to and including monetary sanctions and/or dismissal of the case or the striking of the Answer. (lc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
21 21 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) Tue 03/07 4:23 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. (lc)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 03/07 4:21 PM
SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (JURY TRIAL) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IS VACATED. Jury Trial set for 5/14/2024 09:00 AM; Motion in Limine set for hearing on 5/6/2024 01:30 PM ; Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/22/2024 01:30 PM (SEE DOCUMENT FOR ALL SPECIFIED DEADLINES). (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2023
19 19 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Mon 03/06 7:15 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 days, filed by Plaintiff Gerard Crudele.. (Saroian, Guyane)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2023
18 18 misc Disclosure Fri 03/03 3:41 PM
INITIAL DISCLOSURE filed by Plaintiff Gerard Crudele (Thordarson, Dustin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
17 17 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 02/24 10:39 AM
MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers): Order DISCHARGING Order to Show Cause re: Subject Matter Jurisdiction11 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. The Court received and reviewed Defendant's Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause re: Subject Matter Jurisdiction, Related [+], and Plaintiff's Reply thereto,. The Court is satisfied at this time that subject matter jurisdiction exists based on diversity jurisdiction and accordingly DISCHARGES the Order to Show Cause. See minute order for details. (lom)
Related: [-] sp., ECF No. 12ply, ECF No. 14
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
16 16 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Tue 02/21 10:38 AM
MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers): Order STRIKING Declaration15 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. The Declaration primarily consists of legal arguments made in response to Plaintiff's reply brief, rather than personal observations made by the declaring attorney. The Declaration is therefore a reply brief in disguise. But the Court never ordered or requested Defendants' reply to Plaintiffs' filing, nor did Defendants request permission to file the same. Accordingly, the Declaration is ordered STRICKEN. (ECF No. 15.) (lom)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2023
15 15 misc Declaration Fri 02/17 2:43 PM
DECLARATION of Megan J. Stone re Reply (Motion related)14 filed by Defendants La Quinta Holdings, Inc., Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC.(Egerer, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Thursday, February 16, 2023
14 14 respm Reply (Motion related) Thu 02/16 5:21 PM
REPLY Guyane Saroian, Esq. filed by Plaintiff Gerard Crudele.(Thordarson, Dustin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 POS
Friday, February 10, 2023
13 13 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Fri 02/10 10:10 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Miscellaneous Document12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Document linked incorrectly to the wrong document/docket entry. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Response. Due to incorrect event: docket entry incomplete; no link to party filer; no link to the OSC to which it responds. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 09, 2023
12 12 misc Miscellaneous Document Thu 02/09 2:44 PM
(Choi, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration 1 - Declaration,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
Thursday, January 26, 2023
11 11 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 01/26 12:08 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: Subject Matter Jurisdiction. The Court has reviewed Defendant's Notice of Removal, and it is not clear that the Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this action under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a). In particular, and without limitation, the Court notes that the Notice of Removal's allegations and evidence regarding the amount in controversy are unconvincing. Accordingly, Defendant, as the party asserting subject matter jurisdiction, is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE, in writing only, to be received by the Court no later than February 9, 2023, why this action should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiffmay, but is not required to, file a reply to Defendant's response no later than February 16, 2023. Briefs shall not exceed ten (10) pages. The parties should understand this Order to be a dual-pronged inquiry into both the facial sufficiency of Defendant's jurisdictional allegations as well as the factual sufficiency of Defendant's demonstration of diversity jurisdiction, which theCourt now calls on Defendant to make. The parties are accordingly encouraged to submit declarations and other evidence in support of their contentions. Defendant's failure to timely respond to this order shall result in a remand without further warning. (lc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
10 10 attorney Association of Counsel Tue 01/17 9:46 AM
NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Dustin Thordarson, Esq. on behalf of Plaintiff Gerard Crudele. Filed by Plaintiff Gerard Crudele (Attorney Dustin Eric Thordarson added to party Gerard Crudele(pty:pla))(Thordarson, Dustin)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
9 9 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Mon 01/09 12:59 PM
ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for March 13, 2023 at 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II. (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
8 8 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Wed 12/21 8:44 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. EFFECTIVE IMMEDIATELY- No mandatory chambers copies required, EXCEPT FOR MSJs. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 12/20 9:46 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 12/20 9:45 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 12/20 9:45 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 12/16 10:14 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, identifying Gerard Crudele, La Quinta Holdings Inc., Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC.(Choi, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 12/16 10:09 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants La Quinta Holdings, Inc., Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC.(Choi, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
2 2 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/16 10:08 AM
ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by defendants La Quinta Holdings, Inc., Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC.(Choi, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
1 1 3 pgs notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 12/16 10:06 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ventura County Superior Court, case number 56-2022 00571838 Receipt No: ACACDC-34488432 - Fee: $402, filed by defendant Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC, La Quinta Holdings, Inc.. (Attorney Jeffrey Y Choi added to party La Quinta Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Y Choi added to party Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC(pty:dft))(Choi, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Exhibit 1 - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Statement of Damages,
Att: 3 Proof of Service
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Tue 12/20 9:54 AM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants La Quinta Holdings, Inc., Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC., Does 1 to 100, filed by Plaintiff Gerard Crudele. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/2/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ]. (et)
Related: [-]