Kentucky Western District Court
Judge:Charles R Simpson, III
Referred: Colin H Lindsay
Case #: 3:22-cv-00662
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1332rp Diversity-Real Property
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2022
Terminated:Sep 05, 2024
Case in other court:Jefferson Circuit Court, 22-CI-006026
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 14, 2023 4:47 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Circle K. Stores, Inc.
Represented By
Nicholas John Davis
O'Bryan, Brown & Toner, PLLC
contact info
Andrew P. Pullen
O'Bryan, Brown & Toner, PLLC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Mac's Convenient Stores, LLC
Represented By
Nicholas John Davis
O'Bryan, Brown & Toner, PLLC
contact info
Andrew P. Pullen
O'Bryan, Brown & Toner, PLLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Al Cat, LLC
Represented By
J. Bruce Miller
J. Bruce Miller Law Group
contact info
Alan J. Statman
Statman Harris & Eyrich, Llc - Cincinnati
contact info
Counter Defendant
Thieneman Multifamily Properties, LLC
Represented By
J. Bruce Miller
J. Bruce Miller Law Group
contact info
Alan J. Statman
Statman Harris & Eyrich, Llc - Cincinnati
contact info
Defendant
Circle K. Stores, Inc.
Represented By
Nicholas John Davis
O'Bryan, Brown & Toner, PLLC
contact info
Andrew P. Pullen
O'Bryan, Brown & Toner, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Mac's Convenient Stores, LLC
Represented By
Nicholas John Davis
O'Bryan, Brown & Toner, PLLC
contact info
Andrew P. Pullen
O'Bryan, Brown & Toner, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Al Cat, LLC
Represented By
J. Bruce Miller
J. Bruce Miller Law Group
contact info
Alan J. Statman
Statman Harris & Eyrich, Llc - Cincinnati
contact info
Plaintiff
Thieneman Multifamily Properties, LLC
Represented By
J. Bruce Miller
J. Bruce Miller Law Group
contact info
Alan J. Statman
Statman Harris & Eyrich, Llc - Cincinnati
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, September 05, 2024
57 57 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 09/05 4:57 PM
ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 9/5/24: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (DN28 ) is DENIED as moot and all claims and counterclaims in this action are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own attorney fees and costs. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is hereby DIRECTED to strike this matter from the active docket of the Court. This is a final and appealable Order there being no just cause for delay in its entry. cc: Counsel (DJT)
Related: [-]
56 56 minutes Show Cause Hearing Status Conference Thu 09/05 11:10 AM
ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay: Status Conference and Show Cause Hearing held on 9/4/2024. Based on Statman's representations during the hearing, the Court's show cause order is SET ASIDE. Given that the Parties have filed an agreed order of dismissal (DN54 ), the undersigned will schedule no further conferences at this time. (Court Reporter Becky Boyd) cc: counsel (KDY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
55 55 order Order - TEXT ONLY Tue 09/03 3:45 PM
TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 9/3/2024. While the Parties have filed an agreed order of dismissal (DN 54), this case REMAINS SET for a status conference and show cause hearing on September 4, 2024, at 11:30 AM ET in person. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (TLB)
Related: [-]
54 54 motion Proposed Agreed Order Tue 09/03 12:14 PM
Proposed Agreed Order Agreed Order of Dismissal by Circle K. Stores, Inc.. (Pullen, Andrew)
Related: [-]