North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Max O Cogburn, Jr
Referred: David Keesler
Case #: 3:22-cv-00673
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 14, 2023 4:52 AM EDT
Defendant
Fedora Security, LLC
Represented By
Jeremy V. Farrell
Tucker Arensberg, P.C.
contact info
Grant B. Osborne
Ward And Smith, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Tara S. Gist
Represented By
Philip J. Gibbons, Jr.
Gibbons Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Corey Michael Stanton
Gibbons Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Ethan Lev Willner Slabosky
Gibbons Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
18 18 2 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 11/07 3:55 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Tara S. Gist (All Claims Dismissed. Case to be Closed). (Stanton, Corey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 09/27 9:42 AM
ORDER denying as moot 10 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 9/26/2023. (ams)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
16 16 order Scheduling Order Mon 03/20 12:15 PM
Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: Three to Five (3-5 days). Discovery due by 12/4/2023. Motions due by 1/12/2024. Mediation deadline set for 12/18/2023. Jury Trial set for 4/15/2024 09:30 AM in Courtroom #5A, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Max O. Cogburn Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/20/23. (mga)
Related: [-]
15 15 discov Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference and Discovery Plan Mon 03/20 9:37 AM
Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Stanton, Corey)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2023
notice Notice to Conduct Initial Attorneys Conference Mon 03/06 8:42 AM
NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The[LINK:Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference] , and if applicable, the[LINK:Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge] , should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 3/27/2023. (ams)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2023
14 14 11 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 02/27 5:28 PM
ANSWER to13 Amended Complaint by Fedora Security, LLC.(Osborne, Grant)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2023
13 13 8 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Mon 02/13 8:41 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Fedora Security, LLC, filed by Tara S. Gist.(Stanton, Corey)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Mon 02/13 8:40 PM
NOTICE of Filing Amended Complaint by Tara S. Gist (Stanton, Corey)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2023
11 11 15 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 01/30 5:54 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re10 MOTION to Dismiss by Fedora Security, LLC. (Osborne, Grant)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Dismiss Mon 01/30 5:52 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Fedora Security, LLC. Responses due by 2/13/2023 (Osborne, Grant)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 01/30 5:51 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fedora Security, LLC. (Osborne, Grant)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/30 2:58 PM
ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Jeremy V. Farrell for Fedora Security, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/30/23. (mga)
Related: [-]
notice Notice - Out of State Counsel Mon 01/30 3:00 PM
Notice to Jeremy V. Farrell: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account[LINK:Link] . (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 2/6/2023. (mga)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2023
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty Fri 01/27 5:59 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jeremy V. Farrell Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5919232. by Fedora Security, LLC. (Osborne, Grant)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/27 5:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Grant B. Osborne on behalf of Fedora Security, LLC (Osborne, Grant)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 01/09 7:47 AM
ORDER granting 4 Defendant Fedora Security, LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. Fedora Security, LLC answer due 1/30/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/6/23. (mga)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2023
4 4 motion Extension of Time Fri 01/06 3:06 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re:1 Complaint by Fedora Security, LLC. (Osborne, Grant)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Friday, December 30, 2022
3 3 service Affidavit of Service Fri 12/30 2:10 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Tara S. Gist. Fedora Security, LLC served on 12/19/2022, answer due 1/9/2023.(Slabosky, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Return Receipt
Friday, December 16, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 12/16 3:11 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Fedora Security, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (cjs)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 12/16 3:01 PM
COMPLAINT against Fedora Security, LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5870002), filed by Tara Gist.(Stanton, Corey)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 12/16 3:08 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (cjs)
Related: [-]