Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Michael R Barrett
Referred: Stephanie K Bowman
Case #: 1:22-cv-00752
Nature of Suit870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause26:7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2022
Terminated:Dec 08, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 14, 2023 4:48 AM EDT
Defendant
Fifth Third Bank, National Association
3366 Riverside Drive, Suite 103
Upper Arlington, OH 43221
Represented By
Ann Marie Johnson
Sikora Law LLC
contact info
Kyle Edward Timken
Manley Deas & Kochalski LLC
contact info
Matthew J Richardson
Manley, Deas & Kochalski LLC
contact info
Angela D. Kirk
Manley Deas Kochalski, LLC
contact info
Michael E. Carleton
Manley Deas Kochalski, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Hamilton County Auditor
138 East Court Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202
Defendant
Laura S. Hopkins
3624 Victoria Lane
Cincinnati, OH 45208
Defendant
Rick A. Hopkins
3624 Victoria Lane
Cincinnati, OH 45208
Defendant
State of Ohio, Department of Taxation
4485 Northland Ridge Blvd.
Columbus, OH 43229
Represented By
Cory David Steinmetz
Ohio Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
P.O. Box 55
Washington, DC 20044
Represented By
Kimberly Parke
Doj-Tax
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, June 20, 2024
22 22 misc Satisfaction of Judgment Thu 06/20 10:46 AM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re20 Judgment,,, entered In favor of United States of America Against Rick A. Hopkins, In favor of United States of America Against Laura S. Hopkins by Plaintiff United States of America. (Parke, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Monday, December 11, 2023
notice Notice Terminating Deadlines/Hearings Mon 12/11 4:38 PM
NOTICE TERMINATING DEADLINES/HEARINGS - The Status Conference set for 12/13/2023 is hereby terminated. (kkz)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
21 21 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 12/08 4:59 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff United States of America. (Parke, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 12/12 12:20 PM
***Civil Case Terminated per doc.21 . (eh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 10/12 11:25 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 7/12/2023; Kimberly Parke appeared for the plaintiff; Defendant Rick A. Hopkins appeared; Matthew Richardson appeared for Defendant Fifth Third Bank; case matters discussed; a follow up Status Conference is set for 12/13/2023 at 3:00 PM by Teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett. NOTE: parties shall refer to the entry on 5/18/2023 for conferencing instructions. (kkz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 07/12 1:13 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 7/12/2023; Kimberly Parke appeared for the plaintiff; Defendant Rick A. Hopkins appeared; Matthew Richardson appeared for Defendant Fifth Third Bank; case matters discussed; a follow up Status Conference is set for 10/12/2023 at 10:30 AM by Teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett. NOTE: parties shall refer to the entry on 5/18/2023 for conferencing instructions. (kkz)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2023
20 20 order Judgment Mon 06/26 4:43 PM
OPINION AND ORDER- 1) Judgment in favor of the United States and against Defendant Rick A. Hopkins for unpaid income taxes, penalties, and interest for tax years 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, and 2014 in the amount of $120,444.38, plus statutory additions from and after November 15, 2022, including interest pursuant 26 U.S.C. §§ 6601, 6621, and 6622, and 28 U.S.C. § 1961(c), until the judgment is satisfied; 2) Judgment in favor of the United States and against Defendant Laura S. Hopkins f/k/a Laura L. Stokes for unpaid income taxes, penalties, and interest for tax years 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, and 2011 in the amount of $41,688.52, plus statutory additions from and after November 15, 2022, including interest pursuant to 26 U.S.C. §§ 6601, 6621, and 6622, and 28 U.S.C. § 1961(c), until the judgment is satisfied. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 6/26/2023. (md)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
misc Notice of Corrective Docket Entry Thu 06/22 9:59 AM
Notice of Correction: Please disregard [FORMER DOC. 18] Consent MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) - incomplete pdf attached. See doc.19 for corrected filing. (eh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
19 19 motion Judgment under Rule 54(b) Wed 06/21 5:11 PM
Consent MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) by Plaintiff United States of America. (Parke, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Executed Consent Judgment
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
18 18 motion Judgment under Rule 54(b) Tue 06/20 9:58 AM
Consent MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) by Plaintiff United States of America. (Parke, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
17 17 misc Status Report Thu 02/23 4:39 PM
STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff United States of America. (Parke, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
16 16 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 02/21 9:43 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Laura S. Hopkins on 2/15/2023, answer due 4/17/2023. (Parke, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 02/21 9:43 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Rick A. Hopkins on 2/15/2023, answer due 4/17/2023. (Parke, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2023
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/20 8:22 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint filed by State of Ohio, Department of Taxation. (Steinmetz, Cory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/17 2:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Laura S. Hopkins. Laura S. Hopkins served on 1/14/2023, answer due 2/6/2023. (md)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certified Mail Receipt Return
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/17 2:52 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Rick A. Hopkins. Rick A. Hopkins served on 1/14/2023, answer due 2/6/2023. (md)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certified Mail Receipt Return
Thursday, January 12, 2023
11 11 notice Clerks Notice to Pro Hac Vice Attorney Thu 01/12 3:45 PM
Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorneys Matthew P. Curry, Carla M. Allen, Kimberly D. Fulkerson, and Justin M. Ritch (bjc)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 01/12 12:16 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Fifth Third Bank, National Association. (Richardson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Note,
Att: 2 Exhibit Mortgage
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 01/12 12:12 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Fifth Third Bank, National Association, Fifth Third Financial Corporation, Fifth Third Bancorp identifying Corporate Parent Fifth Third Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Fifth Third Bancorp for Fifth Third Bank, National Association.. (Richardson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
8 8 misc Certificate of Clerk Wed 01/11 11:59 AM
Certificate of Mailing: Certified mailing of summons and complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (bjc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelopes
Monday, January 09, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/09 6:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J Richardson for Defendant Fifth Third Bank, National Association (Richardson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/04 6:32 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant State of Ohio, Department of Taxation. State of Ohio, Department of Taxation served on 12/22/2022, answer due 1/12/2023. (Parke, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/04 6:31 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Fifth Third Bank, National Association. Fifth Third Bank, National Association served on 12/22/2022, answer due 1/12/2023. (Parke, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/04 6:30 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Hamilton County Auditor. Hamilton County Auditor served on 12/28/2022, answer due 1/18/2023. (Parke, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 28, 2022
3 3 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 12/28 9:27 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Michael R. Barrett for all further proceedings. Judge Matthew W. McFarland no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 12/28/2022. (kaf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
misc Docket Annotation Wed 12/21 3:10 PM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (kaf)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 12/16 4:50 PM
Summons Issued as to Fifth Third Bank, National Association, Hamilton County Auditor, Laura S. Hopkins, Rick A. Hopkins, State of Ohio, Department of Taxation. (tla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons as to Laura Hopkins,
Att: 2 Summons as to Fifth Third Bank,
Att: 3 Summons as to Hamilton County Auditor,
Att: 4 Summons as to State of Ohio, Department of Taxation
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 12/16 3:20 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Parke, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Form,
Att: 3 Summons Form,
Att: 4 Summons Form,
Att: 5 Summons Form,
Att: 6 Summons Form