Texas Southern District Court
Judge:Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Referred: Jason B Libby
Case #: 2:22-cv-00298
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 14, 2023 4:08 AM CDT
Defendant
Rene Gaza
5906 Woodmere Dr
Corpus Christi, TX 78414
Represented By
Michael A McCauley
Ostarch Hilmy & Mccauley
contact info
Defendant
Rosario Gaza
5906 Woodmere Dr
Corpus Christi, TX 78414
Represented By
Michael A McCauley
Ostarch Hilmy & Mccauley
contact info
Defendant
Streamline Energy Services LLC
5906 Woodmere Dr
Corpus Christi, TX 78414
Represented By
Michael A McCauley
Ostarch Hilmy & Mccauley
contact info
Plaintiff
Superior NDT LLC
Represented By
Keith Anderson Cothroll
The Law Firm Of Keith A. Cothroll
contact info

GPO Mar 07 2024
MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 31 AMENDED 25 MOTION MOTION for Summary Judgment. Objections to M&R due by 3/21/2024.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(LeticiaGarza, 2)
GPO Apr 08 2024
ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: 32 Memorandum and Recommendations and granting in part and denying in part 31 AMENDED MOTION for 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified. (lg2)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.