Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Case #: 1:22-cr-00426
Case Filed:Dec 14, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Dec 17, 2022 2:35 AM EST
Defendant
Scott E. Boone (1)
Represented By
Lisa A. Mathewson
Mathewson Law LLC
contact info
Defendant
Rebecca J. Davis (4)
Represented By
Sarah Hyser-Staub
Mcnees Wallace & Nurick LLC
contact info
Defendant
Thomas E. Lauer (3)
Represented By
S. Wesley Gorman
contact info
Defendant
Daniel E. McGuire (2)
Represented By
Efrem M. Grail
Reed, Smith, Shaw & Mcclay LLP
contact info
Interested Party
U.S. Probation - Harrisburg Office
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Ravi R. Sharma
United States Attorney'S Office, Mdpa
contact info

GPO Mar 03 2025
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) as to Scott E. Boone, Daniel E. McGuire, Thomas E. Lauer, Rebecca J. Davis re 74 MOTION for Order Applying the Crime-Fraud Exception filed by USA. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 3/3/2025. (ve)MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) as to Scott E. Boone, Daniel E. McGuire, Thomas E. Lauer, Rebecca J. Davis re 74 MOTION for Order Applying the Crime-Fraud Exception filed by USA. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 3/3/2025. (ve)MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) as to Scott E. Boone, Daniel E. McGuire, Thomas E. Lauer, Rebecca J. Davis re 74 MOTION for Order Applying the Crime-Fraud Exception filed by USA. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 3/3/2025. (ve)MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) as to Scott E. Boone, Daniel E. McGuire, Thomas E. Lauer, Rebecca J. Davis re 74 MOTION for Order Applying the Crime-Fraud Exception filed by USA. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 3/3/2025. (ve)

Docket last updated: 04/21/2025 10:04 PM EDT
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
1 1 37 pgs INDICTMENT as to Scott E. Boone (1) counts 1, 2-6, 7, & 8, Daniel E. McGuire (2) counts 1, 2-6, 7, & 8, Thomas E. Lauer (3) counts 1, 2-6, 7, & 8, Rebecca J. Davis (4) counts 1, & 2-6. FORFEITURE ALLEGATIONS (rw)
Related: [-]
2 2 Criminal Cover Sheet (Access Restricted to Court Users) - First Defendant: Boone. (rw)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs PRAECIPE to issue a summons as to Scott E. Boone. (rw)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs PRAECIPE to issue a summons as to Daniel E. McGuire. (rw)
Related: [-]
5 5 PRAECIPE to issue a summons as to Thomas E. Lauer. (rw)
Related: [-]
6 6 PRAECIPE to issue a summons as to Rebecca J. Davis. (rw)
Related: [-]