South Dakota District Court
Case #: 5:22-cr-50192
Case Filed:Nov 17, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Dec 17, 2022 1:53 AM CST
Defendant
Francis White Lance (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kelsey C. Blair
U.S. Attorney'S Office (rapid City, Sd)
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/17/2022 2:24 AM CST
Monday, November 07, 2022
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Francis White Lance (1). NOTICE REGARDING COOPERATOR INFORMATION: All plea agreements and sentencing memoranda contain a sealed supplement which includes either a statement there was cooperation or a statement there was no cooperation. It is not possible to determine from examination of docket entries whether a defendant did or did not cooperate with the government. (SLT) [5:22-mj-00214-JLV]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
3 3 Motion and ORDER to Seal Case as to Francis White Lance. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Daneta Wollmann on 11/8/2022. (SC) EMAILED to AUSA on 11/9/2022 (SAC). [5:22-mj-00214-JLV]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 14, 2022
4 4 Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney as to USA. Attorney Kelsey C. Blair added. Attorney Eric D. Kelderman terminated. (KLE) [5:22-mj-00214-JLV]
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to Francis White Lance. (KLE) [5:22-mj-00214-JLV]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 15, 2022
6 6 Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Francis White Lance.(KLE) [5:22-mj-00214-JLV]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Sealed Rule 5 Docs; District of Nebraska Omaha
7 7 ORDER granting5 Motion to Unseal Case as to Francis White Lance (1). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Daneta Wollmann on 11/15/2022. Case Unsealed.Mailed/Emailed to AUSA on 11/15/2022. (SC) [5:22-mj-00214-JLV]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 17, 2022
8 8 INDICTMENT (personal identifiers redacted) as to Francis White Lance (1) count(s) 1, 2. NOTICE REGARDING COOPERATOR INFORMATION: All plea agreements and sentencing memoranda contain a sealed supplement which includes either a statement there was cooperation or a statement there was no cooperation. It is not possible to determine from examination of docket entries whether a defendant did or did not cooperate with the government. (SKK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Sealed Charging Document