California Central District Court
Judge:Josephine L Staton
Referred: Margo A Rocconi
Case #: 2:22-cv-09162
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2022
Terminated:Sep 21, 2023
Case in other court:Superior Court for the County of Los Angeles, 22GDCV00760
Last checked: Thursday Jun 15, 2023 2:32 AM PDT
Defendant
Charles Schwab and Co., Inc.
Represented By
Diana Tabacopoulos
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Angelina T Evans
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Defendant
DOES
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Jan F Schau
Represented By
Jan Frankel Schau
Adr Services
contact info
Plaintiff
Jay Shek
Represented By
Johnny Rundell
Hershey Law PC
contact info
Elias K. Fakhoury
Hershey Law PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 45 minutes ago
Thursday, September 21, 2023
28 28 2 pgs order Dismissing Case Thu 09/21 3:02 PM
ORDER Re Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice of Entire Action (ECF No.27 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton that case number Case No. 2:22-cv-09162-JLS-MAR, and all causes and actions contained therein shall be dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
27 27 stip Dismiss Case Tue 09/19 5:32 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure,Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendant Charles Schwab Bank, SSB (erroneously sued as Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.) Charles Schwab and Co., Inc..(Evans, Angelina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order for Dismissal With Prejudice of Entire Action
Thursday, August 31, 2023
26 26 1 pgs adr Mediation Report (ADR-3) Completely Settled Thu 08/31 2:14 PM
MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Jan F Schau: Mediation held on August 21, 2023 and the case has been completely settled. With the filing of this Report, the parties are advised that they must notify the trial judge's deputy courtroom clerk of the fact of settlement and to promptly file documents regarding the final disposition of the case. Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link:[LINK:MediationParticipantSurvey] (lst)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
25 25 order Protective Order Wed 07/05 4:11 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi re Stipulation for Protective Order23 . (See document for further details). (et)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2023
24 24 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Mon 06/26 7:53 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Stipulation for Protective Order23 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): Pursuant to L.R. 52-4.1, a proposed order shall be e-filed as a separate attachment to any document seeking Court approval, or as a Notice of Lodging with the proposed order attached to the notice. According to Procedures of Judge Staton: All discovery motions in civil cases are to be calendared before the magistrate judge. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (es)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2023
23 23 stip Protective Order Fri 06/23 3:18 PM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Charles Schwab and Co., Inc..(Evans, Angelina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
22 22 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form Tue 05/30 8:11 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Jan F Schau has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
21 21 adr Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2) Thu 05/25 2:51 PM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Jan Schau may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. All parties and the Panel Mediator have agreed that the mediation will be held on 8/21/2023 and counsel will submit mediation statements seven (7) calendar days before the session. Filed by Plaintiff Jay Shek(Fakhoury, Elias)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
20 20 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12) Mon 04/03 6:08 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 2/2/2024. (vv)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Mon 04/03 6:06 PM
CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton. (vv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
18 18 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Hearings Thu 03/23 12:49 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report. (Doc. 16.) On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for hearing March 24, 2023 is VACATED and the following schedule is set. Last Day to File a Motion to Add Parties or Amend Pleadings: May 19, 2023; Fact Discovery Cutoff: December 1, 2023;Last Day to File Motions (Excluding Daubert Motions and all other Motions in Limine): December 15, 2023; Last Day to Serve Initial Expert Reports: December 15, 2023; Last Day to Serve Rebuttal Experts: January 12, 2024; Expert Discovery Cutoff: February 9, 2024; Last Day to Conduct Settlement Proceedings: February 2, 2024; Last Day to File Daubert Motions: February 16, 2024; Last Day to File Motions in Limine: July 8, 2024; Final Pretrial Conference (10:30 a.m.): August 9, 2024; Preliminary Trial Estimate:1 4-5 Days. (lom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
17 17 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 03/21 5:14 PM
TEXT ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING NOTICE VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court, on its own motion, hereby VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for March 24, 2023. The Court will issue a separate Scheduling Order pursuant to the parties Joint 26(f) Report. No appearances are necessary.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Tue 03/21 4:43 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Amended ; estimated length of trial 4-5 days, filed by Defendant Charles Schwab and Co., Inc... (Evans, Angelina)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
15 15 motion Appear Fri 03/17 4:56 PM
REQUEST for Leave of Diana Tabacopolous to Appear for Remotely of Lead Counsel at Scheduling Conference on March 24, 2023 filed by Defendant Charles Schwab and Co., Inc.. (Evans, Angelina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Diana Tabacopolus,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Friday, March 10, 2023
14 14 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Fri 03/10 3:36 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4-5 days, filed by Defendant Charles Schwab and Co., Inc... (Evans, Angelina)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2023
13 13 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 01/27 9:25 AM
ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference is set for Friday, March 24, 2023 at 10:30 AM. See attached Order for details. (hc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
12 12 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 01/17 3:06 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (hc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
11 11 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 12/20 12:18 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
10 10 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 12/20 12:18 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 12/20 12:17 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
8 8 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 12/16 7:23 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT CHARLES SCHWAB BANK, SSB, re Corporate Disclosure Statement3 , Declaration,4 , Declaration6 , Declaration5 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties7 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 served on December 16, 2022. (Tabacopoulos, Diana)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 12/16 7:21 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT CHARLES SCHWAB BANK, SSB, identifying The Charles Schwab Corporation. (Tabacopoulos, Diana)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Declaration Fri 12/16 7:19 PM
DECLARATION of KRISTOPHER R. TATE re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant CHARLES SCHWAB BANK, SSB. (Tabacopoulos, Diana)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Declaration Fri 12/16 7:17 PM
DECLARATION of GURUNATH BISWANATH re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant CHARLES SCHWAB BANK, SSB. (Tabacopoulos, Diana)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Declaration Fri 12/16 7:14 PM
DECLARATION of DIANA TABACOPOULOS re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant CHARLES SCHWAB BANK, SSB.(Tabacopoulos, Diana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT C,
Att: 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT D,
Att: 3 Exhibit EXHIBIT E,
Att: 4 Exhibit EXHIBIT F,
Att: 5 Exhibit EXHIBIT G
3 3 2 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/16 7:07 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant CHARLES SCHWAB BANK, SSB identifying The Toronto-Dominion Bank as Corporate Parent. (Tabacopoulos, Diana)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 12/16 7:05 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant CHARLES SCHWAB BANK, SSB. (Tabacopoulos, Diana)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 12/16 7:03 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California for the County of Los Angeles, case number 22GDCV00760 Receipt No: ACACDC-34493887 - Fee: $402, filed by DEFENDANT CHARLES SCHWAB BANK, SSB. (Attorney Diana Tabacopoulos added to party CHARLES SCHWAB BANK, SSB(pty:dft))(Tabacopoulos, Diana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 28 pgs Exhibit EXHIBIT A,
Att: 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Tue 12/20 11:24 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Jay Shek in Los Angeles Superior Court on 10/26/2022, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Tue 12/20 11:26 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Charles Schwab and Co., Inc. in Los Angeles Superior Court on 12/132022, attached as Exhibit B. (jtil)
Related: [-]