Original Case: 2:19-cv-10374

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv-56176
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Case Filed:Dec 15, 2022
Terminated:Mar 28, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 17, 2022 12:22 AM PST
Defendant
AUCTION BROTHERS, INC., DBA Amazzia
Defendant - Appellee
TP LINK USA CORPORATION
Represented By
Prashanth Chennakesavan
LTL Attorneys, LLP
contact info
David Ammons
LTL Attorneys, LLP
contact info
Kevin Brian Kelly
LTL Attorneys, LLP
contact info
Heather F. Auyang
LTL Attorneys LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
THIMES SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By
Randolph Gaw
Gaw Poe LLP
contact info
Mark Schlachet
Law Offices of Mark Schlachet
contact info
Mark Poe
Gaw Poe LLP
contact info
Victor Meng
Gaw Poe LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/28/2024 9:54 AM PDT
Thursday, December 15, 2022
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Thimes Solutions, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/22/2022. Transcript ordered by 01/12/2023. Transcript due 02/13/2023. Appellant Thimes Solutions, Inc. opening brief due 03/23/2023. Appellee TP Link USA Corporation answering brief due 04/24/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12611843] (JBS) [Entered: 12/15/2022 03:47 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule
Att: 2 2 pgs Notice to All Parties and Counsel
Att: 3 1 pgs Mediation Letter
Att: 4 22 pgs Case Opening Packet