Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Matthew F Leitman
Referred: Anthony P Patti
Case #: 2:22-cv-13065
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2022
Case in other court:Oakland County Circuit Court, 22-197408-CB
Last checked: Saturday Jun 17, 2023 5:41 AM EDT
Defendant
Metal-Matic, LLC, MN 55414
Represented By
Robert C. Tice
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Metal-Matic, Inc.
Represented By
Robert C. Tice
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
R.V.M Associates, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph J. Shannon, III
Bodman
contact info
Rebecca El Badaoui
Bodman PLC
contact info

GPO Dec 21 2023
ORDER on Status Conference. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
GPO Mar 14 2024
ORDER Staying All Filings Until Further Order of the Court. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
GPO Jun 04 2024
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION (ECF No. 52) TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ECF No. 47). Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (KBro)
GPO Sep 03 2024
ORDER (1) Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff R.V.M. Associates, Inc.'s 46 Motion for Summary Judgment, (2) Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant Metal-Matic, LLC's 47 Motion for Summary Judgment, and (3) Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant Metal-Matic, LLC's 48 Motion to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Plaintiff's Proffered Expert Jeffrey A. Silagy. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
GPO Oct 30 2024
ORDER Terminating Defendants' 53 Motion to Extend Response Deadline as Moot. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
GPO Jan 15 2025
ORDER Resolving Defendants' 88 Motion in Limine and Defendants' Objections. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
GPO Feb 05 2025
ORDER Adjourning Deadlines for the Filing of Post-Trial Motions. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)

Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
136 136 motion Judgment Fri 04/25 10:49 PM
Renewed MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant To Rule 50 by All Defendants. (Pioch, Neil)
Related: [-]
135 135 motion Attorney Fees Fri 04/25 4:32 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees , Court Costs, Statutory Damanges and Entry of Judgment by R.V.M Associates, Inc.. (Shannon, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11,
Att: 13 Exhibit 12,
Att: 14 Exhibit 13,
Att: 15 Exhibit 14
Thursday, April 24, 2025
134 134 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Thu 04/24 9:21 AM
ORDER Granting Defendants'133 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Brief in Support of Renewed Rule 50 Motion in Excess of Twenty-Five Pages. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
133 133 motion File Excess Pages Wed 04/23 7:24 PM
Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Renewed Rule 50 Motion by All Defendants. (Pioch, Neil)
Related: [-]