New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael A Shipp
Referred: Lois H Goodman
Case #: 3:22-cv-07394
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petiti
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2022
Terminated:Feb 14, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Jun 17, 2023 5:34 AM EDT
Defendant
YA-MEI CHEN
Represented By
MARGARET ANN MAHONEY
Office Of The Us Attorney
contact info
Defendant
UR MENDOZA JADDOU
Represented By
MARGARET ANN MAHONEY
Office Of The Us Attorney
contact info
Defendant
UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By
MARGARET ANN MAHONEY
Office Of The Us Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
PADMA KATAPALLI
Represented By
RUSS NESEVICH
contact info
Plaintiff
MADHUSUDHAN R. PANTULA
Represented By
RUSS NESEVICH
contact info


Docket last updated: 61 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
7 7 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Tue 02/14 2:24 PM
ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL with prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 2/14/2023. (jal, )
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (aty) Tue 02/14 9:34 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by PADMA KATAPALLI, MADHUSUDHAN R. PANTULA (NESEVICH, RUSS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
4 4 misc Letter Wed 01/04 4:27 PM
Letter from parties requesting an extension of time to respond.(MAHONEY, MARGARET)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/03 10:03 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARGARET ANN MAHONEY on behalf of All Defendants (MAHONEY, MARGARET)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 12/20 9:33 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to YA-MEI CHEN, UR MENDOZA JADDOU, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (kht)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/19 5:25 PM
COMPLAINT against YA-MEI CHEN, UR MENDOZA JADDOU, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13906594), filed by PANTULA R. MADHUSUDHAN, PADMA KATAPALLI.(NESEVICH, RUSS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons USCIS,
Att: 3 Summons Jaddou,
Att: 4 Summons Local USCIS,
Att: 5 Summons Att. General,
Att: 6 Summons US Att.
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 12/20 9:24 AM
Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (kht)
Related: [-]