California Central District Court
Judge:Hernan D Vera
Referred: Shashi H Kewalramani
Case #: 5:22-cv-02222
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2022
Case in other court:Los Angeles Superior Court, 22STCV37045
Last checked: Saturday Jun 17, 2023 2:37 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Northrop Grumman Corporation
Represented By
Whitney Nonnette Perry
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Samantha C Grant
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Karina Lo
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Branden Riley Carter
Represented By
Aarin A Zeif
Gould Law Firm Apc
contact info
Michael A Gould
Gould Law Firm Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
24 24 stip Dismiss Case Wed 01/10 9:03 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant Northrop Grumman Corporation.(Grant, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
23 23 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 07/26 2:39 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
22 22 order Substitute Attorney Tue 07/25 2:32 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'SCOUNSELS' REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY21 by Judge Hernan D. Vera. Under Local Rule 83-2.3.2, an attorney may not withdraw as counsel except by leave of court, upon notice to the parties, and only upon a showing of good cause. Plaintiff's counsel has not complied with these requirements, and for that reason the Request is DENIED, without prejudice to it being properly filed as a noticed motion. (lom)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
21 21 motion Substitute Attorney (G-01) Thu 07/20 11:26 AM
REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Aarin A. Zeif and Michael A. Gould of the Gould Law Firm as counsel of record filed by Plaintiff Branden Riley Carter. (Zeif, Aarin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, July 10, 2023
20 20 misc Statement Mon 07/10 1:11 PM
STATEMENT Joint Case Management Conference Statement filed by Plaintiff Branden Riley Carter (Zeif, Aarin)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2023
19 19 3 pgs order Order Fri 06/23 1:10 PM
REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera: Please refer to Order for complete details. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
18 18 cs_rasgn Chief District Judge Transferring Case Wed 06/21 11:47 AM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#23-083) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Hernan D. Vera, this case is transferred from Judge Andre Birotte Jr to the calendar of Judge Hernan D. Vera for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:22-cv-02222-HDV-SHKx. (rn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
17 17 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/16 8:56 PM
ORDER RE: JURY/COURT TRIAL: I. SCHEDULE; II. TRIAL PREPARATION; III. CONDUCT OF ATTORNEYS AND PARTIES by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Jury Trial set for 6/11/2024 08:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions In Limine set for 5/24/2024 11:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Last Date to Hear Motion to Amend Pleadings/Add Parties 4/7/2023. Non-Expert Discovery cut-off 1/26/2024. Last Date to Hear Motions 3/1/2024. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference 3/15/2024. Trial Filings (first round): Motions In Limine, Memoranda of Contentions of Fact and Law, Witness Lists, Joint Exhibit List, Joint Status Report Regarding Settlement due by 5/3/2024. Trial Filings (second round): Oppositions to Motions In Limine, Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order due by 5/10/2024. See document for further details. (gk)
Related: [-]
16 16 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 03/16 8:34 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report submitted by the parties, and determines that an in-person Scheduling Conference is unnecessary. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the March 17, 2023, Scheduling Conference. Order re Jury/Court Trial to issue. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dbe)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 03/15 8:52 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Karina Lo counsel for Defendant Northrop Grumman Corporation. Adding Karina Lo as counsel of record for Northop Grumman Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Northrop Grumman Corporation. (Attorney Karina Lo added to party Northrop Grumman Corporation(pty:dft))(Lo, Karina)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2023
14 14 adr Request for ADR Procedure No. 1 - (ADR-1) Mon 03/06 4:00 PM
REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 1 filed. Parties request to Appear Before Magistrate Judge for settlement proceedings. Filed by Defendant Northrop Grumman Corporation.(Grant, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2023
13 13 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Fri 03/03 7:42 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Defendant Northrop Grumman Corporation.. (Grant, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 22, 2022
12 12 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Thu 12/22 11:55 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation (erroneously sued and served as Northrop Grumman Corporation) Northrop Grumman Corporation, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only10 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form9 , Notice of Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form,7 served on December 21, 2022. (Grant, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
11 11 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Wed 12/21 9:55 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 3/17/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 12/21 9:54 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
9 9 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 12/20 5:44 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
8 8 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 12/20 5:43 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
7 7 transfer Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form Tue 12/20 5:43 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:22-cv-02222 AB (SHKx). (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Tue 12/20 12:21 PM
Notice filed by Defendant Northrop Grumman Corporation. * Northrop Grumman Systems Corporations (erroneously sued and served as Northrop Grumman Corporation) Notice of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. § 1446(D) re Removal * (Nonnette Perry, Whitney)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2022
5 5 misc For Judicial Notice Mon 12/19 5:51 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE * Defendant Northrop Grumman Systems Corporations Request For Judicial Notice in Support of Removal * filed by Defendant Northrop Grumman Corporation. (Nonnette Perry, Whitney)
Related: [-]
4 4 13 pgs notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 12/19 5:28 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 22STCV37045 Receipt No: ACACDC-34501904 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Northrop Grumman Corporation.(Nonnette Perry, Whitney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 52 pgs Declaration of Whitney Nonnette Perry,
Att: 2 Declaration of Tiffany King,
Att: 3 Declaration of Karen Heinze
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 12/19 4:58 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Northrop Grumman Corporation, identifying Defendant Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation is a wholly owned subsidiary of Northrop Grumman Corporation, a publicly traded company. There is no other publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock.. (Attorney Whitney Nonnette Perry added to party Northrop Grumman Corporation(pty:dft))(Nonnette Perry, Whitney)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 12/19 4:55 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Northrop Grumman Corporation identifying Northrop is a wholly owned subsidiary of Northrop Grumman Corporation, a publicly traded company. There is no other publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock. as Corporate Parent. (Nonnette Perry, Whitney)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 12/19 4:45 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Northrop Grumman Corporation. (Nonnette Perry, Whitney)
Related: [-]
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Tue 12/20 5:18 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Branden Riley Carter in Los Angeles Superior Court, attached to Perry Decl. as Exhibit A. (jtil)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Tue 12/20 5:22 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Northrop Grumman Corporation in Los Angeles Superior Court on 12/6/2022, attached to Perry Decl as Exhibit E.(jtil)
Related: [-]