Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:22-cv-25134
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Jun 18, 2023 6:25 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
RICKEY HUNTER
Represented By
NICHOLAS SCOTT CLEVENGER
Peterson & Associates Pc - Kansas City Mo
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
misc Docket Annotation Tue 12/27 3:30 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: NOTICE TO COUNSEL - Please use the updated 3M Master Short Form Complaint for any future filed complaints, found on the clerk's website, www.flnd.uscourts.gov, under Attorneys, then Important Documents. re: Magistrate Judge Hope T. Cannon added to the complaints. (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/20 3:30 PM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7609431.), filed by RICKEY HUNTER. (CLEVENGER, NICHOLAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet