New York Western District Court
Judge:Elizabeth A Wolford
Referred: Colleen D Holland
Case #: 6:22-cv-06567
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 14, 2023 4:49 AM EDT
Defendant
Mrs. Sarah Ainsworth
Represented By
Frank W. Miller
The Law Firm Of Frank W. Miller
contact info
Defendant
Mr. Frank Barber
Represented By
Frank W. Miller
The Law Firm Of Frank W. Miller
contact info
Defendant
City of Corning
Represented By
Meghan M Hayes
Webster Szanyi, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Corning Painted Post High School
Represented By
Frank W. Miller
The Law Firm Of Frank W. Miller
contact info
Defendant
Corning Painted Post Middle School
Represented By
Frank W. Miller
The Law Firm Of Frank W. Miller
contact info
Defendant
Corning-Painted Post Area School District
Represented By
Frank W. Miller
The Law Firm Of Frank W. Miller
contact info
Defendant
Ms. Kerry Elsasser
Represented By
Frank W. Miller
The Law Firm Of Frank W. Miller
contact info
Defendant
New York State Education Department
Represented By
Michele Romance Crain
New York State Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Mr. Gregory Stone
Corning Painted Post Middle School Teacher 48 Orchard Dr
Big Flats, NY 14814
Defendant
Town of Corning
Represented By
Meghan M Hayes
Webster Szanyi, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Village of Painted Post
Represented By
Meghan M Hayes
Webster Szanyi, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
D.J.
Represented By
Steven M. Cohen
Tiveron Law PLLC
contact info
Shari Jo Reich
Reich/emerson LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
90 90 misc Proposed Pretrial Order Mon 05/12 3:26 PM
Proposed Pretrial Order by D.J..(Penberthy, BrittanyLee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement
Friday, May 09, 2025
utility E-Filing Notification Fri 05/09 9:38 AM
E-Filing Notification89 MOTION to appear pro hac vice: Please note, an applicant seeking admission pro hac vice must fully complete all documentation required by Local Rule of Civil Procedure 83.1. This includes the Admission Petition Form, Admission Sponsor Affidavit, Attorneys Oath, Civility Principles and Guidelines Oath, and the Attorney Database and Electronic Registration Form. (JLH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
89 89 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/07 12:11 PM
MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-5476737.) by Corning-Painted Post Area School District, Frank Barber.(Miller, Frank)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix