PARKER v. HAALAND et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Gerald J Pappert |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-05049 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 14, 2022 |
Terminated: | Apr 04, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 12, 2023 7:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
GREGORY A ADAMS
|
|
Defendant
KIMBERLY G ALTMAN
|
|
Defendant
INGER ANDERSON
|
|
Defendant
AUDREY AZOULAY
|
|
Defendant
Anthony Ted Freeman, Beneficiary ANTHONY TED FREEMAN, BENEFICIARY
|
|
Defendant
Augusta Moore Estate, Beneficiary AUGUSTA MOORE ESTATE, BENEFICIARY
|
|
Defendant
SIMA SAMI BAHOUS
|
|
Defendant
JOCELYN BENSON
|
|
Defendant
JOSEPH ROBINETTE BIDEN
|
|
Defendant
ANTONY JOHN BLINKEN
|
|
Defendant
ROBERTS BRETT
|
|
Defendant
ZENELL B BROWN
|
|
Defendant
ROBERT BRUTINEL
|
|
Defendant
BAILEY CHELSEA BRYN
|
|
Defendant
MICHAEL BUCCINNA
|
|
Defendant
Billie Parker Estate, Beneficiary BILLIE PARKER ESTATE, BENEFICIARY
|
|
Defendant
DAVID R CASPER
|
|
Defendant
MARK HOWARD COHEN
|
|
Defendant
CLINT COONS
|
|
Defendant
SEAN FRANCIS COX
|
|
Defendant
Cynthia Anne Stepherson, Beneficiary CYNTHIA ANNE STEPHERSON, BENEFICIARY
|
|
Defendant
ELIZABETH L DISANTO
|
|
Defendant
ERIC DIXON
|
|
Defendant
QU DONGYU
|
|
Defendant
NANCY G EDMONDS
|
|
Defendant
RYAN KEVIN ELSEY
|
|
Defendant
KURT ROBERT ERSKINE
|
|
Defendant
BARBARA L ESPEY
|
|
Defendant
LARRY N ESPEY
|
|
Defendant
PAT ESSER
|
|
Defendant
KINIKIA D ESSIX
|
|
Defendant
RACHAEL EUBANKS
|
|
Defendant
LAJUANA FELLS
|
|
Defendant
DENISE FITZHUGH
|
|
Defendant
MERRICK BRIAN GARLAND
|
|
Defendant
KRISTALINA GEORGIEVA
|
|
Defendant
TEDROS ADHANOM GHEBREYESUS
|
|
Defendant
WILLIAM L GLENN
|
|
Defendant
FILIPPO GRANDI
|
|
Defendant
REBECA GRYNSPAN
|
|
Defendant
JEFFREY B GULDNER
|
|
Defendant
ANTONIO GUTERRES
|
|
Defendant
Ginger Sharee Hampton Estate, Beneficiary GINGER SHAREE HAMPTON ESTATE, BENEFICIARY
|
|
Defendant
DEBRA ANNE HAALAND
|
|
Defendant
HOULIN HAO
|
|
Defendant
BRIDGET MARY HATHAWAY
|
|
Defendant
THOMAS MJ HATHAWAY
|
|
Defendant
RON L HAYWOOD
|
|
Defendant
JAIME HERNANDEZ
|
|
Defendant
JAMIE HERNANDEZ
|
|
Defendant
KATIE HOBBS
|
|
Defendant
DENISE HOLLIDAY
|
|
Defendant
MICHAEL J HSU
|
|
Defendant
ANDREW M. HULL
|
|
Defendant
GILBERT F HUONGBO
|
|
Defendant
Imani Monique Parker Estate, Beneficiary IMANI MONIQUE PARKER ESTATE, BENEFICIARY
|
|
Defendant
COURTNEY L JOHNSON
|
|
Defendant
Jamal Darius Parker Estate , Beneficiary JAMAL DARIUS PARKER ESTATE, BENEFICIARY
|
|
Defendant
Jamal Darius Parker Jr Estate, Beneficiary JAMAL DARIUS PARKER Jr ESTATE, BENEFICIARY
|
|
Defendant
Jamal El Estate, Beneficiary JAMAL EL ESTATE, BENEFICIARY
|
|
Defendant
Jameya Justine Maat Parker Estate, Beneficiary JAMEYA JUSTINE MAAT PARKER ESTATE, BENEFICIARY
|
|
Defendant
Jamillia Christine Isis Parker Estate, Beneficiary JAMILLIA CHRISTINE ISIS PARKER ESTATE, BENEFICIARY
|
|
Defendant
TIMOTHY M. KENNEY
|
|
Defendant
PHILLIPE LAZZARINI
|
|
Defendant
STEVEN LOCHIBILER
|
|
Defendant
ENRIGUE LORES
|
|
Defendant
DEBRA D LUCAS
|
|
Defendant
GEOFF LUNDFELT
|
|
Defendant
DAVID R MALPASS
|
|
Defendant
DONNA MARTIN
|
|
Defendant
ANDREW T MATHIS
|
|
Defendant
ALEJANDRO NICHOLAS MAYORKAS
|
|
Defendant
KATHLEEN M MCCARTHY
|
|
Defendant
MASAHIKO METOKI
|
|
Defendant
JESSICA CELINA MORRIS
|
|
Defendant
Mark Anthony Stepherson Sr Estate, Beneficiary MARK ANTHONY STEPHERSON Sr ESTATE, BENEFICIARY
|
|
Defendant
Mark Anthony Stepherson jr Estate, Beneficiary MARK ANTHONY STEPHERSON JR., BENEFICIARY
|
|
Defendant
Mary Bertha Goins Estate, Beneficiary MARY BERTHA GOINS ESTATE, BENEFICIARY
|
|
Defendant
Myrtle Alexander Estate, Beneficiary MYRTLE ALEXANDER ESTATE, BENEFICIARY
|
|
Defendant
DANA NESSEL
|
|
Defendant
STACIE NEVALO
|
|
Defendant
ANDREW NGUYEN
|
|
Defendant
Ophelia Hampton Estate, Beneficiary OPHELIA HAMPTON ESTATE, BENEFICIARY
|
|
Defendant
DESIREE PEAGLER
|
|
Defendant
PAUL PENZONE
|
|
Defendant
ERICA PEREZ
|
|
Defendant
CHRISTOPHER JOHN PETRIDES
|
|
Defendant
JAMES DOUGLAS QUEEN, II
|
|
Defendant
CHARLES PAUL RETTIG
|
|
Defendant
STEPHEN RICHER
|
|
Defendant
DOUGLAS ANTHONY ROSCOE, JR
|
|
Defendant
MICHAEL TYLER ROSS
|
|
Defendant
Rhondal Lee Hampton, Beneficiary RHONDAL LEE HAMPTON, BENEFICIARY
|
|
Defendant
MARK T SALAVENS
|
|
Defendant
JUAN CARLOS SALAZAR
|
|
Defendant
ANDREW MARSHALL SAUL
|
|
Defendant
MATTHEW R SCHLABACK
|
|
Defendant
KLAUS SCHWAB
|
|
Defendant
MARK ANTHONY SCOTT
|
|
Defendant
MILLICENT D SHERMAN
|
|
Defendant
MILAN DALE SMITH, JR
|
|
Defendant
WALT SMITH
|
|
Defendant
GRANT MURRAY SNOW
|
|
Defendant
RAQUEL SOTO
|
|
Defendant
JAMES SPROSS
|
|
Defendant
ACHIM STEINER
|
|
Defendant
Sharee Lakiesha Yazmine Briscoe Estate, Beneficiary SHAREE LAKIESHA YAZMINE BRISCOE, BENEFICIARY Traci Ciearra Parker Estate, Beneficiary TRACI CIEARRA PARKER ESTATE, BENEFICIARY
|
|
Defendant
TAMMY TANG-HYNES
|
|
Defendant
Torrey Brown Estate, Beneficiary TORREY BROWN ESTATE, BENEFICIARY inmate trust # 291581, chippewa correctional facility of Michigan
|
|
Defendant
LAWRENCE VANDKYE
|
|
Defendant
ANTONIO VITORINO
|
|
Defendant
LIZ VNGUIEN
|
|
Defendant
RAPHAEL WASHINGTON
|
|
Defendant
JAMES WHITE
|
|
Defendant
GRETCHEN ESTHER WHITMER
|
|
Defendant
KIM WORTHY
|
|
Defendant
JANET LOUISE YELLEN
|
|
Plaintiff
JAMAL DARIUS PARKER
PHOENIX, AZ 85051
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 04/04 2:07 PM
ORDERED that:1. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute.2. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to CLOSE this case. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 4/4/2023. 4/4/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 03/16 11:38 AM
ORDERED that:1. If Parker seeks to proceed with this case, he must, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, either (1) pay $402 (the $350 filing fee and $52 administrative fee) to the Clerk of Court, or (2) file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. 2. The Clerk of Court shall provide Parker with an appropriate non-prisoner application to proceed in forma pauperis, bearing the civil action number of this case. Parker may use this form to seek leave to proceed in forma pauperis if he cannot afford to pay the fees to commence this case. 3. If Parker fails to comply with this Order, his case may be dismissed without further notice for failure to prosecute.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 3/16/2023. 3/16/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE WITH IFP APPLICATION.(sg) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
appeal
USCA Order
Fri 02/24 9:53 AM
ORDER of USCA as to7 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by JAMAL DARIUS PARKER, ORDERED that the above-captioned case is hereby dismissed for failure totimely prosecute insofar as appellant failed to pay the requisite fee as directed. It isFURTHER ORDERED that a certified copy of this order be issued in lieu of aformal mandate. (sg) |
|
Tuesday, January 31, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
trial
Exhibit
Tue 01/31 1:32 PM
ORIGINAL PROOF OF CONSIDERATION by JAMAL DARIUS PARKER..(bw) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 COVER LETTER | ||
11 | 11
trial
Exhibit
Tue 01/31 1:30 PM
PROOF OF CONSIDERATION by JAMAL DARIUS PARKER..(bw) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix, | ||
Att: 2 COVER LETTER | ||
10 | 10
trial
Exhibit
Tue 01/31 11:51 AM
EXHIBIT - USPS TRANKING INFO by JAMAL DARIUS PARKER..(bw) |
|
Att: 1 COVER LETTER | ||
9 | 9
trial
Exhibit
Tue 01/31 11:19 AM
EXHIBIT(S) by JAMAL DARIUS PARKER..(bw) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 COVER LETTER | ||
Monday, January 30, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
appeal
USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
Mon 01/30 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re7 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by JAMAL DARIUS PARKER. USCA Case Number 23-1182 (fdc) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
appeal
Notice of Interlocutory Appeal
Fri 01/27 10:40 AM
NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL by JAMAL DARIUS PARKER. (FEE NOT PAID)(bw) |
|
Att: 1 COVER LETTER | ||
5 | 5
trial
Exhibit
Thu 01/26 7:01 AM
EXHIBIT - Bill Of Exceptions by JAMAL DARIUS PARKER..(bw) |
|
Att: 1 COVER LETTER | ||
Friday, January 20, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
trial
Exhibit
Thu 01/26 9:03 AM
EXHIBIT by JAMAL DARIUS PARKER.. (bw) |
|
Thursday, January 05, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
order
Pro Se Civil Admin Order 5
Thu 01/05 12:45 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF HAVING FILE A COMPLAINT WITH THE COURT WITHOUT EITHER PAYING THE FEES TO COMMENCE A CIVIL ACTION OR FILING A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, PLAINTIFF MUST, WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER PAY $402 TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. IF PLAINTIFF FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, THE CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 1/5/2023. 1/5/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO PRO SE.(sg) |
|
Wednesday, December 28, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
trial
Exhibit
Wed 12/28 2:07 PM
EXHIBITS by JAMAL DARIUS PARKER..(sg) |
|
Att: 1 EMAIL | ||
Tuesday, December 20, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines
Tue 12/20 3:03 PM
PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (sg) |
|
Wednesday, December 14, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 12/20 3:00 PM
COMPLAINT against GREGORY A ADAMS, KIMBERLY G ALTMAN, INGER ANDERSON, AUDREY AZOULAY, Anthony Ted Freeman, Beneficiary ANTHONY TED FREEMAN, BENEFICIARY, Augusta Moore Estate, Beneficiary AUGUSTA MOORE ESTATE, BENEFICIARY, SIMA SAMI BAHOUS, JOCELYN BENSON, JOSEPH ROBINETTE BIDEN, ANTONY JOHN BLINKEN, ROBERTS BRETT, ZENELL B BROWN, ROBERT BRUTINEL, BAILEY CHELSEA BRYN, MICHAEL BUCCINNA, Billie Parker Estate, Beneficiary BILLIE PARKER ESTATE, BENEFICIARY, DAVID R CASPER, MARK HOWARD COHEN, CLINT COONS, SEAN FRANCIS COX, Cynthia Anne Stepherson, Beneficiary CYNTHIA ANNE STEPHERSON, BENEFICIARY, ELIZABETH L DISANTO, ERIC DIXON, QU DONGYU, NANCY G EDMONDS, RYAN KEVIN ELSEY, KURT ROBERT ERSKINE, BARBARA L ESPEY, LARRY N ESPEY, PAT ESSER, KINIKIA D ESSIX, RACHAEL EUBANKS, LAJUANA FELLS, DENISE FITZHUGH, MERRICK BRIAN GARLAND, KRISTALINA GEORGIEVA, TEDROS ADHANOM GHEBREYESUS, WILLIAM L GLENN, FILIPPO GRANDI, REBECA GRYNSPAN, JEFFREY B GULDNER, ANTONIO GUTERRES, Ginger Sharee Hampton Estate, Beneficiary GINGER SHAREE HAMPTON ESTATE, BENEFICIARY, DEBRA ANNE HAALAND, HOULIN HAO, BRIDGET MARY HATHAWAY, THOMAS MJ HATHAWAY, RON L HAYWOOD, JAIME HERNANDEZ, JAMIE HERNANDEZ, KATIE HOBBS, DENISE HOLLIDAY, MICHAEL J HSU, ANDREW M. HULL, GILBERT F HUONGBO, Imani Monique Parker Estate, Beneficiary IMANI MONIQUE PARKER ESTATE, BENEFICIARY, COURTNEY L JOHNSON, Jamal Darius Parker Estate, Beneficiary JAMAL DARIUS PARKER ESTATE, BENEFICIARY, Jamal Darius Parker Jr Estate, Beneficiary JAMAL DARIUS PARKER Jr ESTATE, BENEFICIARY, Jamal El Estate, Beneficiary JAMAL EL ESTATE, BENEFICIARY, Jameya Justine Maat Parker Estate, Beneficiary JAMEYA JUSTINE MAAT PARKER ESTATE, BENEFICIARY, Jamillia Christine Isis Parker Estate, Beneficiary JAMILLIA CHRISTINE ISIS PARKER ESTATE, BENEFICIARY, TIMOTHY M. KENNEY, PHILLIPE LAZZARINI, STEVEN LOCHIBILER, ENRIGUE LORES, DEBRA D LUCAS, GEOFF LUNDFELT, DAVID R MALPASS, DONNA MARTIN, ANDREW T MATHIS, ALEJANDRO NICHOLAS MAYORKAS, KATHLEEN M MCCARTHY, MASAHIKO METOKI, JESSICA CELINA MORRIS, Mark Anthony Stepherson Sr Estate, Beneficiary MARK ANTHONY STEPHERSON Sr ESTATE, BENEFICIARY, Mark Anthony Stepherson jr Estate, Beneficiary MARK ANTHONY STEPHERSON JR., BENEFICIARY, Mary Bertha Goins Estate, Beneficiary MARY BERTHA GOINS ESTATE, BENEFICIARY, Myrtle Alexander Estate, Beneficiary MYRTLE ALEXANDER ESTATE, BENEFICIARY, DANA NESSEL, STACIE NEVALO, ANDREW NGUYEN, Ophelia Hampton Estate, Beneficiary OPHELIA HAMPTON ESTATE, BENEFICIARY, DESIREE PEAGLER, PAUL PENZONE, ERICA PEREZ, CHRISTOPHER JOHN PETRIDES, JAMES DOUGLAS QUEEN, II, CHARLES PAUL RETTIG, STEPHEN RICHER, DOUGLAS ANTHONY ROSCOE, JR, MICHAEL TYLER ROSS, Rhondal Lee Hampton, Beneficiary RHONDAL LEE HAMPTON, BENEFICIARY, MARK T SALAVENS, JUAN CARLOS SALAZAR, ANDREW MARSHALL SAUL, MATTHEW R SCHLABACK, KLAUS SCHWAB, MARK ANTHONY SCOTT, MILLICENT D SHERMAN, MILAN DALE SMITH, JR, WALT SMITH, GRANT MURRAY SNOW, RAQUEL SOTO, JAMES SPROSS, ACHIM STEINER, Sharee Lakiesha Yazmine Briscoe Estate, Beneficiary SHAREE LAKIESHA YAZMINE BRISCOE, BENEFICIARY Traci Ciearra Parker Estate, Beneficiary TRACI CIEARRA PARKER ESTATE, BENEFICIARY, TAMMY TANG-HYNES, Torrey Brown Estate, Beneficiary TORREY BROWN ESTATE, BENEFICIARY inmate trust # 291581, chippewa correctional facility of Michigan, LAWRENCE VANDKYE, ANTONIO VITORINO, LIZ VNGUIEN, RAPHAEL WASHINGTON, JAMES WHITE, GRETCHEN ESTHER WHITMER, KIM WORTHY, JANET LOUISE YELLEN, filed by JAMAL DARIUS PARKER.(sg) |
|
Att: 1 EXHIBITS, | ||
Att: 2 EMAIL |