Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:22-cv-04555
Nature of Suit385 Torts - Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability
Cause28:1442 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2022
Case in other court:Massachusetts, 1:22-cv-12025
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 14, 2023 4:54 AM EDT
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Represented By
Jessica C. Jeffrey
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, LLC
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899
Defendant
The Ansul Company
141 Junny Road
Angier, NC 27501
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
Kiddie P.L.C., Inc.
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Defendant
E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company
Defendant
Dynax Corp.
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-49
Defendant
Deep Water Chemicals. Inc.
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932
Defendant
3M Company
Defendant
AGC Chemical Americas, Inc.
Defendant
AGC Inc
Defendant
Angus Fire
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Protection Co.
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Represented By
Jessica C. Jeffrey
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
Defendant
Clariant Corp.
Plaintiff
Town of Tewksbury
Represented By
Christina Cossich
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info
Brandon J Taylor
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info
Carla Burke Pickrel
Baron & Budd, P.C.
contact info
Scott Summy
Baron & Budd PC
contact info
Andrew J Cvitanovic
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info
Cary L McDougal
Baron And Budd PC
contact info
Luana N Smith
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info
Philip F Cossich
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info
Darren D Sumich
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info
Richard M. Sandman
Rodman Rodman & Sandman
contact info
David A Parsiola
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
16 16 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 05/16 12:19 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice between Plaintiffs and Tyco, Chemguard, ChemDesign, and Released Parties by Tyco Fire Products LP.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Dukes, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Case List
Thursday, May 15, 2025
15 15 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 05/15 6:03 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by BASF Corp.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
14 14 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 07/17 3:06 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by The 3M Company, 3M Company, The, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.). Associated Cases)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Bulger, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, January 06, 2023
13 13 service Summons Issued Fri 01/06 2:44 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
11 11 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Massachusetts (associated as of 12/16/2022), 1:22-cv-12025, Town of Tewksbury v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-04555-RMG (sshe, )
Related: [-]
9 9 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Tue 12/20 11:32 AM
Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:22-cv-12025. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
8 8 Case transferred to the District of South Carolina pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 12/16/2022. Case file electronically extracted to the Clerk in that district. (Danieli, Chris) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/20/2022.]
Related: [-]
7 7 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 112 in MDL Case 2873 received from District of South Carolina requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings (Danieli, Chris) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/20/2022.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
6 6 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting5 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading to Complaint . (Gaudet, Jennifer) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/20/2022.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
5 5 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading to Complaint by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP.(Jeffrey, Jessica) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/20/2022.]
Related: [-]
4 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Currie, Haley) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/20/2022.]
Related: [-]
3 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/20/2022.]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2022
2 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CHEMGUARD INC., Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Jeffrey, Jessica) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/20/2022.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CHEMGUARD INC., Tyco Fire Products, LP ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9604845 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Jeffrey, Jessica) (Currie, Haley). Modified on 11/29/2022: Ex A separated from main document and moved to attachment in the entry (Currie, Haley). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/20/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Form
Att: 3 (11/29/2022) Exhibit A