Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Brian S Miller
Case #: 3:22-cv-00319
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2022
Terminated:Nov 14, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jun 18, 2023 6:13 AM CDT
Defendant
Southwest Steel Processing LLC
Represented By
E. Jonathan Mader
Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC
contact info
Steven W. Quattlebaum
Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Conxtech Inc
Represented By
Adam Lee Hopkins
Rose Law Firm, A Professional Association
contact info
David M. Powell
Rose Law Firm
contact info

GPO Aug 28 2023
ORDER granting 22 motion to stay this case pending arbitration. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/28/2023. (jak)
GPO Nov 14 2024
JUDGMENT: Consistent with 25 order entered today, this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/14/2024. (ljb)

Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, November 14, 2024
26 26 order Judgment Thu 11/14 3:45 PM
JUDGMENT: Consistent with25 order entered today, this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/14/2024. (ljb)
Related: [-]
25 25 1 pgs order Order Thu 11/14 3:42 PM
ORDER that the parties have filed a24 stipulation of dismissal. This case is dismissed with prejudice. The parties will bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/14/2024. (ljb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
24 24 2 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 11/13 9:31 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Conxtech Inc. (Larkin, Glenn)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
23 23 1 pgs order Order Staying Case Mon 08/28 11:37 AM
ORDER granting22 motion to stay this case pending arbitration. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/28/2023. (jak)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
22 22 2 pgs motion Stay Fri 08/25 3:55 PM
MOTION to Stay Action by Conxtech Inc(Powell, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Document Arbitration Agreement
Friday, July 28, 2023
21 21 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Fri 07/28 4:58 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting20 motion to withdraw filed by Southwest Steel Processing LLC. Attorney E. Jonathan Mader terminated. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/28/2023. (ljb)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 07/28 10:19 AM
First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney E. Jonathan Mader by All Defendants (Mader, E.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2023
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Thu 06/08 12:25 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part10 Southwest Steel Processing LLC's motion to compel arbitration and dismiss litigation. ConXtech's claim for breach of the Equipment Use Agreement, Count 2, is dismissed because the parties expressly agreed to resolve any disputes arising under that agreement by arbitration. ConXtech may proceed with its breach of contract and breach of warranty claims relating to the Long Term Agreement. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/8/2023. (ljb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2023
utility Notice of Docket Correction Thu 05/18 3:42 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re18 Final Scheduling Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the trial date as 9/9/2024 as marked on the Order. (jak)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
18 18 order Scheduling Order Wed 05/17 8:38 AM
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for sometime during the week of 9/4/2024 at 9:30 a.m. in Jonesboro Courtroom #324 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Joinder of Parties due by 3/18/2024; Discovery due by 4/17/2024; Motions due by 5/13/2024; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 8/9/2024. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 5/17/2023. (ljb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
17 17 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 05/15 2:59 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Conxtech Inc. (Powell, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
16 16 order Initial Scheduling Order Wed 03/01 5:55 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 5/9/2023; Rule 26(f) Report due by 5/22/2023; Bench Trial proposed for sometime during the week of 9/9/2024 at 9:30 a.m. in Jonesboro Courtroom #324 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 3/1/2023. (ljb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
15 15 8 pgs respm Response to Motion Tue 02/28 2:35 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re10 MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration and Brief in Support filed by Conxtech Inc. (Powell, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 02/07 5:36 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Response due by 2/28/2023. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/7/2023. (rmg)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 02/07 5:02 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to10 MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration by Conxtech Inc (Hopkins, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2023
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Mon 01/30 12:18 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Southwest Steel Processing LLC (Mader, E.)
Related: [-]
11 11 8 pgs brief Brief in Support Mon 01/30 12:18 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re10 Motion to Compel Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration filed by Southwest Steel Processing LLC. (Mader, E.)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Compel Mon 01/30 12:16 PM
MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration by Southwest Steel Processing LLC (Mader, E.)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/30 12:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by E. Jonathan Mader on behalf of Southwest Steel Processing LLC (Mader, E.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2023
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Thu 01/19 4:20 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Conxtech Inc. Southwest Steel Processing LLC served on 12/29/2022.(Hopkins, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - return receipt
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
7 7 order Order on Motion to Extend Time Tue 01/17 4:48 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting6 Motion to Extend Time. Southwest Steel Processing LLC's answer due by 2/6/2023. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/17/2023. (rmg)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Extend Time Tue 01/17 9:54 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Southwest Steel Processing LLC (Quattlebaum, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 22, 2022
5 5 misc Deficiency Letter Thu 12/22 9:56 AM
DOCKET ENTRY FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD. (kdr) (Docket text modified on 12/22/2022 to indicate the entry was filed in error.)(cmn)
Related: [-]
utility Notice of Docket Correction Thu 12/22 12:49 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re2 Corporate Disclosure Statement and5 Deficiency Letter. CORRECTION: The docket text for2 docket entry was modified as, "Corporate and Diversity Disclosure Statement" and the docket text for5 docket entry was modified to indicate the document was filed in error due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. (cmn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
4 4 utility Notice of Docket Correction Wed 12/21 4:00 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet and2 Corporate Disclosure Statement. CORRECTION: The original documents were submitted without original signature. The correct documents were added to docket entries1 and2 and are attached hereto for service/review by the parties.(cmn)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/21 2:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Lee Hopkins on behalf of Conxtech Inc (Hopkins, Adam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Wed 12/21 9:24 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Conxtech Inc. (kdr) (cmn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (12/21/2022) Main Document - Correct
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/21 9:22 AM
COMPLAINT against Southwest Steel Processing LLC, filed by Conxtech Inc. Filing Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT313. Summons issued.(kdr) (cmn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Att: 2 (12/21/2022) Main Document - Correct,
Att: 3 (12/21/2022) Civil Cover Sheet - Correct