California Central District Court
Judge:James V Selna
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 8:22-cv-02286
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Dec 21, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 20, 2023 1:41 AM PDT
Counter Claimant
Community Roots Academy
Represented By
Tyler Z. Bernstein
Sheppard Mullin Richter And Hampton LLP
contact info
Aaron J Malo
Sheppard Mullin Richter And Hampton LLP
contact info
Jason A Weiss
Sheppard Mullin Richter And Hampton LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Futures Education, LLC
Counter Defendant
Stepping Stones Group, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey M Goldman
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
contact info
A. Christopher Young
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
contact info
Sevana Haroutunian
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
contact info
Defendant
Community Roots Academy
Represented By
Tyler Z. Bernstein
Sheppard Mullin Richter And Hampton LLP
contact info
Aaron J Malo
Sheppard Mullin Richter And Hampton LLP
contact info
Jason A Weiss
Sheppard Mullin Richter And Hampton LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Stepping Stones Group, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey M Goldman
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
contact info
A. Christopher Young
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
contact info
Sevana Haroutunian
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, March 25, 2024
65 65 stip Dismiss Case Mon 03/25 3:10 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by plaintiff and counter-defendant Stepping Stones Group, LLC.(Goldman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
64 64 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines Wed 03/20 4:19 PM
ORDER GRANTING FURTHER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIMANT COMMUNITY ROOTS ACADEMY'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS63 by Judge James V. Selna. [NOTE: CHANGES HAVE BEEN MADE TO THIS DOCUMENT] Accordingly, the hearing for CRA's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is continued to April 29, 2024 at 1:30 p.m. (es)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
63 63 stip Continue Tue 03/19 4:36 PM
STIPULATION to Continue Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings from March 25, 2024 to April 22, 2024 filed by plaintiff and counter-defendant Stepping Stones Group, LLC.(Goldman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order