Case Filed:Dec 20, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Dec 22, 2022 2:39 AM EST
Defendant
Timothy Blake Parsons (1)
Represented By
Wesley P. Page
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Willard Clinton Carte
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Julie M. White
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 6:32 PM EDT
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
1 1 1 pgs SEALED MOTION by United States of America to Seal as to Timothy Blake Parsons. (tmr)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs SEALED ORDER as to Timothy Blake Parsons; granting1 Motion to Seal; upon receipt of the executed Arrest Warrant, all shall be unsealed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 11/29/2022. (cc: Judge, USA) (tmr)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Timothy Blake Parsons. (Attachment: #1 Affidavit). (tmr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
CASE UNSEALED as to Timothy Blake Parsons per chambers request. (tmr)
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION by United States of America for Detention Hearing as to Timothy Blake Parsons. (White, Julie)
Related: [-]
6 6 CJA 23 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Timothy Blake Parsons. (mfo)
Related: [-]
7 7 INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Timothy Blake Parsons held by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 11/30/2022; Court Reporter: Court Smart. (kab)
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER as to Timothy Blake Parsons, re: hearing held 11/30/2022; directing that the Office of the Federal Public Defender is appointed to represent the defendant; granting the5 MOTION by United States of America for Detention Hearing; a Preliminary and Detention Hearing is set for 12/5/2022 at 2:00 PM in Huntington before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert; the defendant is remanded to the custody of the United States Marshal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 11/30/2022. (cc: Judge, USP, USM, counsel of record, deft) (lca)
Related: [-]
9 9 DUE PROCESS PROTECTIONS ACT ORDER TO ALL COUNSEL REGARDING BRADY OBLIGATIONS as to Timothy Blake Parsons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 11/30/2022. (cc: Judge, counsel of record) (lca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 01, 2022
10 10 1 pgs WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED in case as to Timothy Blake Parsons. Defendant arrested on 11/30/2022. (tmr)
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Willard Clinton Carte APPEARING FOR Timothy Blake Parsons (Carte, Willard)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 02, 2022
12 12 PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT as to Timothy Blake Parsons. (Browning, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2022
13 13 PRELIMINARY HEARING as to Timothy Blake Parsons held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 12/5/2022; DETENTION HEARING as to Timothy Blake Parsons held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 12/5/2022; Court Reporter: Courtsmart. (cla)
Related: [-]
14 14 WAIVER by Timothy Blake Parsons of Right to a Preliminary Hearing. (cla)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs WITNESS LIST as to Timothy Blake Parsons for Detention Hearing held 12/5/2022. (cla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
16 16 PRELIMINARY HEARING ORDER as to Timothy Blake Parsons; upon hearing held 12/5/2022; directing that Defendant shall pay the CJA Fund $200.00 per month for as long as the case is active; defendant waived his right to a preliminary hearing; therefore finding probable cause; directing the Probation Officer to perform a home inspection of the proposed residence to determine its suitability for pretrial release and electronic monitoring; defendant remanded to the custody of the United States Marshal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 12/6/2022. (cc: Judge, USA, USP, USM, counsel, deft) (tmr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
CASE as to Timothy Blake Parsons assigned to Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
Related: [-]
17 17 2 pgs INDICTMENT as to Timothy Blake Parsons count 1. (tmr)
Related: [-]
18 18 INDICTMENT - Unredacted Copy for Court Users Only as to Timothy Blake Parsons. (tmr)
Related: [-]